Integrated Battery Service System

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10460652
Examiner Edward Raymond, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Edward Raymond
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Thibedeau, Dennis G., Applicant

Represented by Hershikovitz & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared Barsky +1 703 370 4800
Space Brian Hearn +1 540 899 6218
Space ABRAHAM HERSHKOVITZ +1 703 370 4800
Space Jae Youn Kim +1 703 370 4800
Space Dinh Nguyen +1 703 370 4800
Space Harold Novick +1 703 546 8554
Space EUGENE RZUCIDLO +1 703 370 4800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Thibedeau, Dennis G., Franklin, WI (US)
Filing Date June 13, 2003
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number P68393
Confirmation Number 3493
Group Art Unit 2857
Class / Sub-Class 702 / 63
Timeline
  Entries (156) Tab Overlap Assignments (4) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Printer Rush- No mailing
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - XRUSH
Internal Response to Printer Query from TC (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Pubs Case Remand to TC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - RUSH
Printer Query form, used by Office of Publications (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/10/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - XRUSH
Internal Response to Printer Query from TC (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner's Amendment
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner's Amendment Communication
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - RUSH
Printer Query form, used by Office of Publications (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Withdrawal of Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Response to 312 Amendment (PTO-271)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Response to Amendment under Rule 312
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - M327
Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NA
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - M327
Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NA
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Claims PTO
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLMPTO
Complete Marked Up Copy of Claims Prepared by USPTO (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Affidavit(s) (Rule 131 or 132) or Exhibit(s) Received
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow incoming amendment IFW
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (30 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (14 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (84 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (24 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (5 Pages)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Payment of additional filing fee/Preexam
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Applicant has submitted new drawings to correct Corrected Papers problems
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Cleared by OIPE CSR
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
New or Additional Drawing Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - FRPR
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (31 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 7 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?