System For Converting Tv Content To Interactive Tv Game Program Operated With A Standard Remote Control And Tv Set-top Box

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10463949
Examiner Nnenna Ngozi Ekpo, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Nnenna Ngozi Ekpo
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Wistendahl, Douglass A., Applicant

Represented by McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAWRENCE AARONSON +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Anderson +1 312 913 3342
Space Jeffrey Armstrong +1 312 913 0001
Space Alison Baldwin +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Baniak +1 312 460 5000
Space Paul Berghoff +1 312 913 0001
Space Denis Berntsen +1 312 671 2813
Space Isadora Bielsky +1 312 913 0001
Space Daniel Boehnen +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Borella +1 312 913 0001
Space Christopher Butts +1 312 913 2124
Space S. Carden +1 312 913 0001
Space Christopher Cavan +1 312 913 0001
Space Yijan Chang +1 650 467 5096
Space Yean-Nian Chen +1 312 935 2351
Space Nathaniel Chongsiriwatana +1 312 913 0001
Space David Ciesielski +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Clifford +1 312 913 0001
Space James DeGiulio +1 312 913 2109
Space Grantland Drutchas +1 312 913 0001
Space Sarah Duda +1 312 913 0001
Space Thomas Fairhall +1 312 913 0001
Space Sarah Fendrick +1 312 913 3369
Space David Frischkorn +1 312 913 0001
Space Paula Fritsch +1 312 913 0001
Space Jori Fuller +1 312 913 0001
Space Abdelkader Gacem +1 312 321 4299
Space Michael Gannon +1 312 913 0001
Space Patrick Gattari +1 312 913 0001
Space David Grabelsky +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Greenfield +1 312 913 0001
Space James Gumina +1 312 913 0001
Space DAVID S. HARPER +1 312 913 0001
Space Joseph Herndon +1 312 913 0001
Space Lisa Hillman +1 312 913 0001
Space A Hughes +1 319 913 3200
Space Bradley Hulbert +1 312 913 0001
Space Paul Kafadar +1 312 913 0001
Space Nicole Keenan +1 312 913 0001 keenan@mbhb.com
Space Andrea Klock +1 312 913 3363
Space Sydney Kokjohn +1 312 913 3304
Space Alan Krantz +1 312 913 0001
Space Jennifer Kurcz +1 312 913 0001
Space George Lee +1 312 913 0001
Space Jelena Libby +1 312 913 0001
Space Timothy Long +1 312 913 0001
Space Thomas Loos +1 312 913 0001
Space Richard Machonkin +1 312 913 0001
Space James McCarthy +1 312 913 0001
Space John McDonnell +1 312 913 0001
Space Michelle Mcmullen-tack +1 312 913 0001 mcmullen-tack@mbhb.com
Space Hersh Mehta +1 312 913 0001
Space Kwame Mensah +1 312 913 0001
Space EMILY MIAO +1 312 913 0001
Space Scott Miller +1 312 913 3350
Space Eric Moran +1 312 913 0001
Space Jeremy Noe +1 312 913 0001
Space Kevin Noonan +1 312 913 0001
Space Sherri Oslick +1 312 913 0001
Space Anthoula Pomrening +1 312 913 0001 +1 312 913 0002 pomrening@mbhb.com
Space Nicole E. Reifman +1 312 913 0001
Space Joshua Rich +1 312 913 0001
Space Cole Richter +1 312 913 0001
Space Kurt Rohde +1 312 913 0001
Space Matthew Sampson +1 312 913 0001
Space Steven Sarussi +1 312 913 0001
Space John Schafer +1 312 935 2353
Space Lisa Schoedel +1 312 913 3391
Space Rory Shea +1 312 913 0001
Space Amir Shenouda +1 312 913 3359
Space Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. +1 312 913 0001 +1 312 913 0002 sigmond@mbhb.com
Space John Smith +1 312 913 3367
Space James Suggs +1 312 913 0001
Space Sean Sullivan +1 312 913 0001
Space Anita Terpstra +1 312 913 0001
Space Kirsten Thomson +1 312 913 3329
Space Marcus Thymian +1 312 913 0001
Space Paul Tully +1 312 913 0001
Space Dmitriy Vinarov +1 608 262 0459
Space Sandra Weiss +1 312 913 0001
Space Thomas Wettermann +1 312 913 0001
Space Andrew Williams +1 312 913 0001
Space Daniel Williams +1 312 913 0001
Space Cato Yang +1 312 913 3390 yang@mbhb.com
Space Donald Zuhn +1 312 913 0001
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Wistendahl, Douglass A., Bellport, NY (US)
Filing Date June 16, 2003
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 08-473-US-CIP3
Confirmation Number 3738
Group Art Unit 2425
Class / Sub-Class 725 / 113
Timeline
  Entries (135) Tab Overlap Assignments (5) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None 1 - COCOUT
Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Record a Petition Decision of Granted for Patent Term Adjustment after Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Record a Petition Decision of Granted for Patent Term Adjustment after Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Adjustment of PTA Calculation by PTO
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.DEC.COCI
Petition Decision routed to Certificate of Correction (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None 1 - COCOUT
Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered for C of C
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Decision - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.PTA
Patent Term Adjustment Petition (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.PTA.RCAL
Request for PTA recalculation in view of Wyeth (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF
Issue Notification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/23/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Document Verification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/23/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition to Revive Application - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Revive Application - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.DEC.TC
Petition decision routed to the Technology Center to act on the decision or continue prosecution (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - 136A
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - RCEX
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - AMSB
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.OP
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - R3.73B
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (40 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - NTC.A.NONCPL
Notice to the applicant regarding a non-compliant or non-responsive amendment (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM.NE
Claim-Amendment Not Entered (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A.I.
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - NTC.A.NONCPL
Notice to the applicant regarding a non-compliant or non-responsive amendment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
New or Additional Drawing Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment after Examiner Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM.NE
Claim-Amendment Not Entered (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A.I.
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement considered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Cleared by OIPE CSR
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (29 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?