JAWAD v. HAGEL et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00811

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2016 at 1:38 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MOHAMMED JAWAD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL PRACTICE GROUP WORLDWIDE SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Sebastian Montalvo +1 202 862 4360 emontalvo@fedpractice.com
v.
No Logo BANTZ CRADDOCK, Defendant
No Logo BRUCE VARGO, Defendant
No Logo CHUCK HAGEL, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL MCNEILL, Defendant
No Logo David, Thomas, Defendant
No Logo DONALD H. RUMSFIELD, Defendant
No Logo ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, Defendant
No Logo FRANK SWEIGART, Defendant
No Logo GEOFFREY D. MILLER, Defendant
No Logo GORDON R. ENGLAND, Defendant
No Logo HARRY B. HARRIS, Defendant
No Logo JAMES G. STAVRIDIS, Defendant
No Logo JAMES M. MCGARRAH, Defendant
No Logo JAMES T. HILL, Defendant
No Logo JAY HOOD, Defendant
No Logo JOHN M. MCHUGH, Defendant
No Logo MARK H. BUZBY, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL BUMGARNER, Defendant
No Logo NELSON CANNON, Defendant
No Logo PAUL RESTER, Defendant
No Logo PAUL WOLFOWITZ, Defendant
No Logo PETER PACE, Defendant
No Logo RAYMOND EDWIN MABUS, JR., Defendant
No Logo RICHARD MEYERS, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jean Marie Cunningham +1 202 616 4164 +1 202 616 4314 jean.cunningham@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
No Logo Wade, Dennis, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Appeal Record Sent to Federal Circuit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Surreply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Surreply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUMMONS (25) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MARK H. BUZBY, NELSON CANNON, BANTZ CRADDOCK, WADE DENNIS, GORDON R. ENGLAND, ROBERT M. GATES, CHUCK HAGEL, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAMES T. HILL, JAY HOOD, RAYMOND EDWIN MABUS, JR, JAMES M. MCGARRAH, JOHN M. MCHUGH, RICHARD MEYERS, GEOFFREY D. MILLER, PETER PACE, PAUL RESTER, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD H. RUMSFIELD, JAMES G. STAVRIDIS, FRANK SWEIGART, DAVID THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, PAUL WOLFOWITZ. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by MOHAMMED JAWAD filed by MOHAMMED JAWAD. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Supplement, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons, # 21 Summons, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons, # 24 Summons, # 25 Summons, # 26 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          COMPLAINT Mohammed Jawad against All Defendants with Jury Demand Chuck Hagel, et. al. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3717365) filed by MOHAMMED JAWAD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons, # 21 Summons, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons, # 24 Summons, # 25 Summons, # 26 Summons, # 27 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?