Purisima v. City of New York ("City") et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-05245
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 28, 2016 at 5:59 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anton Purisima, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anton Purisima

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anton Purisima
v.
No Logo City of New York ("City"), Defendant
No Logo Does 1-50, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: that this case be dismissed for failure to effectuate service of process, Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), and failure to prosecute, Fed. R. Civ. P. 4l(b). Copy Mailed By Chambers (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/27/2012) (cd) Modified on 11/30/2012 (cd). (Entered: 11/28/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit a letter to the Court no later than 11/26/2012, showing good cause why service has not been effectuated within 120 days of the commencement of this action. Failure to do so could result in the Court dismissing Plaintiff's action without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) for failure to effectuate service of process Rule 41(b) for failure to prosecute. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/8/2012) (mt) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to City of New York ("City"). Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 9/28/2012. Document filed by Anton Purisima. (ft) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff's claims against Mayor Bloomberg are dismissed as to all counts. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Summons in this action as to the City of New York, and Plaintiff is directed to serve the Summons and Complaint upon each Defendant within 120 days. If service has not been made within the 120 days, and Plaintiff has not requested an extension of time to serve within that timeframe, the Complaint may be dismissed for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/24/2012) (cd) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without payment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/11/2012) (js) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, City of New York ("City"), Does 1-50. Document filed by Anton Purisima.(lmb) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Anton Purisima.(lmb) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 119 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?