Backhaut et al v. Apple Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:14-cv-02285
District Judge Lucy H. Koh, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Lucy H. Koh
Last Updated February 22, 2018 at 6:40 PM EST (7.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Adam Backhaut, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William M. Audet +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 waudet@audetlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr. +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 mburton@audetlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore H. Chase +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 tchase@audetlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonas Palmer Mann +1 415 982 1776 +1 415 568 2556 jmann@audetlaw.com
No Logo Bouakhay Joy Backhaut, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Morris, Plaintiff
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (152) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
REPLY (re 127 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs ) Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion Requesting Review of Clerks Order on Defendants Requested Bill of Costs filed byAdam Backhaut, Bouakhay Joy Backhaut, Kenneth Morris. (Ezrin, Joshua) (Filed on 4/27/2016) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
Proposed Order re 129 Opposition/Response to Motion (Corrected Proposed Order) by Apple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 4/20/2016) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE (re 127 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 4/20/2016) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Review of Taxation of Costs
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Adam Backhaut, Kenneth Morris. Responses due by 4/20/2016. Replies due by 4/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ezrin, Joshua) (Filed on 4/6/2016) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Costs Taxed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Objection
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Bill of Costs
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None USCA Case Number
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
USCA Case Number 15-17523 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 117 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kenneth Morris, Bouakhay Joy Backhaut, Adam Backhaut. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/31/2015. Transcript ordered by 01/22/2016. Transcript due 02/22/2016. Appellants Adam Backhaut and Kenneth Morris opening brief due 04/01/2016. Appellee Apple Inc. answering brief due 05/02/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
BILL OF COSTS by Apple Inc.. Objections due by 12/28/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tiffany Cheung in Support of Apple's Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit B-1)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 12/14/2015) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott B. Murray in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion fo File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B-1)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 12/14/2015) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 95 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, 93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS RENEWED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5(b)-(d), 85 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing Unredacted and Revised Redacted Documents per Court Order (ECF No. 112) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PUBLIC, # 2 Exhibit A - SEALED, # 3 Exhibit B - PUBLIC, # 4 Exhibit B - SEALED, # 5 Exhibit C - PUBLIC, # 6 Exhibit C - SEALED, # 7 Exhibit D - PUBLIC, # 8 Exhibit D - SEALED, # 9 Exhibit E - PUBLIC, # 10 Exhibit E - SEALED, # 11 Exhibit F - PUBLIC, # 12 Exhibit F - SEALED, # 13 Exhibit G - PUBLIC, # 14 Exhibit H - PUBLIC, # 15 Exhibit H - SEALED, # 16 Exhibit I - PUBLIC, # 17 Exhibit I - SEALED, # 18 Exhibit J - PUBLIC, # 19 Exhibit J - SEALED, # 20 Exhibit K - PUBLIC, # 21 Exhibit K - SEALED, # 22 Exhibit L - PUBLIC, # 23 Exhibit L - SEALED[, # 24 Exhibit M - PUBLIC, # 25 Exhibit M - SEALED, # 26 Exhibit N - PUBLIC, # 27 Exhibit N - SEALED, # 28 Exhibit O - PUBLIC, # 29 Exhibit O - SEALED, # 30 Exhibit P - PUBLIC, # 31 Exhibit P - SEALED, # 32 Exhibit Q - PUBLIC, # 33 Exhibit Q - SEALED, # 34 Exhibit R - PUBLIC, # 35 Exhibit R - SEALED, # 36 Exhibit S - PUBLIC, # 37 Exhibit S - SEALED, # 38 Exhibit T - PUBLIC, # 39 Exhibit T - SEALED, # 40 Exhibit U - PUBLIC, # 41 Exhibit U - SEALED, # 42 Exhibit V - PUBLIC, # 43 Exhibit W - PUBLIC, # 44 Exhibit W - SEALED, # 45 Exhibit X - PUBLIC, # 46 Exhibit X - SEALED, # 47 Exhibit Y - PUBLIC, # 48 Exhibit Y - SEALED, # 49 Exhibit Z - PUBLIC, # 50 Exhibit Z - SEALED, # 51 Exhibit AA - PUBLIC, # 52 Exhibit AA - SEALED, # 53 Exhibit BB - PUBLIC, # 54 Exhibit BB - SEALED, # 55 Exhibit CC - PUBLIC, # 56 Exhibit CC - SEALED, # 57 Exhibit DD - PUBLIC, # 58 Exhibit DD - SEALED, # 59 Exhibit EE - PUBLIC)(Related document(s) 95 , 101 , 93 , 85 , 106 ) (Walsh, David) (Filed on 12/9/2015) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Document E-Filed Under Seal (Internal Use Only)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
**CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this Notice, the 9/2/2015 Case Management Conference ("CMC") is hereby continued to 12/3/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. This new date and time coincides with the hearing on the pending motion for summary judgment. Pursuant to Civil L.R. 16-10(d), the parties must jointly file an updated Case Management Statement 7-days before the next scheduled CMC date. (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification Murray Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Ex. A Redacted, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Ex A UnRedacted, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Reply UnRedacted, # 4 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 78 ) (Walsh, David) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Amended Murray Decl ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit A - Ex 19 Redacted, # 3 Exhibit A - Ex 19 UNRedacted, # 4 Exhibit B - Kohlman Redacted, # 5 Exhibit - Kohlman UNRedacted, # 6 Exhibit C - Ex 1 Redacted, # 7 Exhibit C - Ex 1 UNRedacted, # 8 Exhibit D - Ex 11 Redacted, # 9 Exhibit D - Ex 11 UNRedacted, # 10 Exhibit E-Opposition Redacted, # 11 Exhibit E-Oppostion UnRedacted, # 12 Proposed Order)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 50 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Murray Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-16 Redacted, # 2 Exhibit 1-16 UNRedacted, # 3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 50 ) (Walsh, David) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS RENEWED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5(b)-(d) filed by Adam Backhaut, Bouakhay Joy Backhaut, Kenneth Morris. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Docket No. 50 Exhibits B-I Highlighted, # 4 Exhibit Docket No. 50 Exhibits M, O-T Highlighted, # 5 Exhibit Docket No. 50 Exhibits X-BB, DD Highlighted, # 6 Exhibit Docket No. 50 Motion for Class Certification Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit Docket No. 78 Exhibit A (Kelly Depo Excerpts) Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit Docket No. 78 Exhibit B (Meldal Depo Excerpts) Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit Docket No. 78 Reply Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit Docket No. 50 Exhibits B-I Redacted, # 11 Exhibit Docket No. 50 Exhibits M, O-T Redacted, # 12 Exhibit Docket No. 50 Exhibits X-BB, DD Redacted, # 13 Exhibit Docket No. 50 Motion for Class Certification Redacted, # 14 Exhibit Docket No. 78 Reply Redacted, # 15 Exhibit Docket No. 78 Exhibit A (Kelly Depo Excerpts) Redacted, # 16 Exhibit Docket No. 78 Exhibit B (Meldal Depo Excerpts) Redacted)(Ezrin, Joshua) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
**CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THURSDAY'S HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the pending class certification motion (ECF No. 69 ) suitable for decision without oral argument and hereby VACATES the hearing set for August 13, 2015 at 1:30PM. The Case Management Conference is continued and shall now be held on Wednesday, September 2, 2015 at 2:00PM. (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 8/6/2015) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
**CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING THE DATE/TIME OF THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this Notice, the next Case Management Conference is set for Thursday, August 13, 2015 at 1:30pm. This new date/time coincides with the hearing date on the pending class certification motion. 7-days prior to the CMC date, the parties shall jointly file a Case Management Statement. (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/27/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/27/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/27/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Tiffany Cheung, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 REDACTED Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Cheung Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Cheung Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Cheung Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Cheung Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Cheung Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Cheung Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Cheung Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 19 to Cheung Declaration, # 13 Declaration Jeffrey Kohlman, # 14 Exhibit 1 to Kohlman Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 2 to Kohlman Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 3 to Kohlman Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 4 to Kohlman Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 5 to Kohlman Declaration)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 6/26/2015) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Motion Hearing held on 6/9/2015 (67 in 5:14-cv-02269-LHK--Adrienne Moore v. Apple, Inc.) and (61 in 5:14-cv-02285-LHK--Adam Backhaut, et al. v. Apple, Inc.) re MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Apple Inc. The court grants motions to compel in part. The court strikes paragraph 25 of Mr. Green's expert report and the 2 footnotes of Mr. Dwyer. Any reference to the disputed deposition transcript in either expert report whether in footnotes or paragraphs is stricken. Parties to amend expert reports accordingly within 7 days. Plaintiffs to produce phones that are in dispute within 72 hours. Mrs. Backhaut's phone to also be produced. Parties to abide by email protocol. Experts who had access to disputed transcripts are not to make any use of the information gained in transcripts outside the course of this litigation. The court denies any further relief. Court Reporter Name: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Time in Court: (12:51 to 1:29). Plaintiff Attorney(s) present: Roy Katriel and Joshua Ezrin. Defendant Attorney present: Tiffany Cheung. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/9/2015) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part (63) in case 5:14-cv-02285-LHK (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Shorten Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/30/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 50 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 59 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tiffany Cheung, # 2 Exhibit A - F to Declaration of Tiffany Cheung, # 3 Proposed Order)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 5/29/2015) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/30/2015, Entered: None Shorten Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
MOTION to Shorten Time on 61 Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel and For Sanctions ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tiffany Cheung, # 2 Exhibit A - B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 5/29/2015) Modified on 6/1/2015 linking entry to document #61 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING JULY 7, 2015 MOTION HEARING, resetting 61 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions: Due to the court's unavailability, the 7/7/2015 Motion Hearing is reset to 7/21/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
**CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING THE 5/20/2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this Notice, the 5/20/2015 CMC is hereby CONTINUED to 8/12/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the new CMC date, the parties shall jointly file an updated Case Management Statement. (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Joinder
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
Joinder JOINDER IN 43 ADRIENNE MOORES MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Adam Backhaut, Bouakhay Joy Backhaut, Kenneth Morris. (Ezrin, Joshua) (Filed on 3/18/2015) Modified on 3/19/2015 linking entry to document #43 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to ( 32 MOTION to Compel Depositions ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of T. Cheung, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 2/3/2015) Modified text on 2/4/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE ADDRESSING THE TIME OF THE DECEMBER 17, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The start-time of the December 17, 2014 Case Management Conference is set for 2:00pm (not 1:30pm). (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2014 from 1:50-3:14pm. See Moore Doc. 30 and Backhaut 27 for a Case Management Order detailing all relevant dates, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Representing Plaintiff Moore: Roy Arie Katriel. Representing Plaintiff Backhaut: William Audet and Joshua Caleb Ezrin. Representing Defendant in both cases: Tiffany Cheung and David Michael Walsh. (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2014 from 1:50-3:14pm. See Moore Doc. 30 and Backhaut 27 for a Case Management Order detailing all relevant dates, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Representing Plaintiff Moore: Roy Arie Katriel. Representing Plaintiff Backhaut: William Audet and Joshua Caleb Ezrin. Representing Defendant in both cases: Tiffany Cheung and David Michael Walsh. (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/16/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE- Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument and accordingly VACATES the hearing on this motion set for November 13, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. The case management conference remains as set on November 13, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. ***THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. *** (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
REPLY (re 12 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byApple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 10/21/2014) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to ( 12 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Adam Backhaut. (Chase, Theodore) (Filed on 9/22/2014) Modified text on 9/23/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING IN 14-CV-02285 TO DATE SET FOR MOTION HEARING IN 14-CV-02269 AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES IN BOTH CASES TO THE DATE OF MOTION HEARING Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/2/2014. Replies due by 9/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration of Andre Boule, # 3 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of Andre Boule, # 4 Declaration of Kai S. Bartolomeo, # 5 Exhibit 1-4 to Declaration of Kai S. Bartolomeo, # 6 Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Walsh, David) (Filed on 8/18/2014) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference to date of Case Management Conference in related case. Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2014 02:00 PM. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 6/10/2014) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Walsh, Esq , Tiffany Cheung and Kai S. Bartolomeo (Walsh, David) (Filed on 6/10/2014) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
SUMMONS Executed by Kenneth Morris, Bouakhay Joy Backhaut, Adam Backhaut. Apple Inc. served on 5/20/2014, answer due 6/10/2014. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adam Backhaut, Bouakhay Joy Backhaut, Kenneth Morris re 5 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint (Chase, Theodore) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RELATING CASE. This case is related to 14-cv-02269. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/3/14. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
Case assigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (svS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
Proposed Summons. (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8624087.). Filed byKenneth Morris, Bouakhay Joy Backhaut, Adam Backhaut. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Audet, William) (Filed on 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 188 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?