Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None |
Utility - Miscellaneous |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Docket Modification (Administrative) setting hearing on motion for depositions of government witnesses, to extend time to depose indian witnesses and to provide FRE 412 notice [610-1] for 2:00 on 5/19/03 (kc, COURT STAFF)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: None |
Utility - Miscellaneous |
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Docket Modification (Administrative) withdrawing attorney John W. Kennedy for USA and substituting attorney Stephen G. Corrigan (kc, COURT STAFF)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None |
Utility - Miscellaneous |
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Docket Modification (Administrative) referring to Judge Claudia Wilken the motion to quash subpoenas duces tecum [339-1], the motion to quash subpoenas duces tecum [338-1], the motion to quash Rule 17(c) subpoenas [337-1] (kc, COURT STAFF)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None |
set/reset deadlines/hearings |
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Docket Modification (Administrative) change of pleas hearing will be held at 10:00 on 3/5/01 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Jayaprakash Lakireddy, for Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None |
Utility - Miscellaneous |
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Docket Modification (Administrative) to add party intervenor San Jose Mercury News, Inc. (kc, COURT STAFF)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: None |
set/reset deadlines/hearings |
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Docket Modification (Administrative) change of plea hearing will be held at 9:00 on 10/30/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Docket Modification (Administrative) status hearing held 2/15/00 satisfying schedule date in system. (kk, COURT STAFF)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: None |
set/reset deadlines/hearings |
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None |
warrant issued |
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Bench Warrant issued for Lakireddy Bali Reddy by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil Bail Set: NO BAIL [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
745 |
Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Document (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
744 |
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy Granting 743 Stipulation to Permit Travel to India. Signed by Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken on 1/24/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
743 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to Permit Travel to India and [Proposed] Order by Lakireddy Bali Reddy. (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 1/20/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
742 |
Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy re 739 granting STIPULATION to Permit Travel to India. Signed by Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken on 2/25/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
741 |
Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter from Ted W. Cassman Regarding Stipulation and Order Permitting Travel to India as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 2/23/2010) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
740 |
Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Proposed Order re 739 Stipulation by Lakireddy Bali Reddy Permitting Travel to India (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 2/23/2010) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
739 |
Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to Permit Travel to India by Lakireddy Bali Reddy (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 2/23/2010) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
738 |
Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy re 736 granting STIPULATION Permitting Travel to India. Signed by Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken on 12/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
737 |
Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Proposed Order by Lakireddy Bali Reddy Permitting Travel to India (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 12/15/2009) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
736 |
Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION Permitting Travel to India by Lakireddy Bali Reddy (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 12/15/2009) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
735 |
Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Sealed Document as to Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
734 |
Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy re 733 GRANTING STIPULATION TO PERMIT TRAVEL. Signed by Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken on 2/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
733 |
Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION and Proposed Order TO PERMIT TRAVEL by Lakireddy Bali Reddy. (Goldman, Raphael) (Filed on 2/17/2009) Modified on 2/18/2009 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/17/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
732 |
Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER permitting travel to Egypt as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy. Signed by Hon. Claudia Wilken on 12/5/08. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
731 |
Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to permit travel to Egypt by Lakireddy Bali Reddy. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
727 |
Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy held on 5/22/06 before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter: Starr A. Wilson. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2006) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
726 |
Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
AMENDED JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/12/06. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
725 |
Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claudia Wilken: Resentencing held on 5/22/2006 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy (1) as to Count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 5s, committed to custody of BOP for a term of 60 months on Count 1, for a term of 97 months on Counts 2 and 3, and a term of 36 months on count 5 to run concurrent; 3 years supervised release on Counts 1, 2 and 3, and 5 years supervised release on Count 5 to run concurrent; $400 special assessment; $2 million restitution. (Special assessment and restitution have been paid) (Court Reporter Starr Wilson.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2006) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
724 |
Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy continuing Sentencing Hearing to 5/22/2006 at 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/17/06. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
723 |
Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2006) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
722 |
Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Supplemental SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2006) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
721 |
Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy Continuing Resentencing Hearing to 5/15/2006 at 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/19/06. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2006) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
720 |
Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy held on 2/27/06 before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter: Carol-Joy Harris. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2006) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
718 |
Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claudia Wilken: Resentencing Hearing as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy continued to 5/1/2006 at 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Carol-Joy Harris.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2006) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
717 |
Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
Order to Seal the Declaration of Steven L. Gore as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/27/06. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2006) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
716 |
Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
Letter to Judge Wilken, dated 2/27/06, from Ted W. Cassman requesting declaration of Steven L. Gore be sealed as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2006) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
715 |
Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Ted W. Cassman in Support of 713 Sentencing Memorandum by Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2006) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
714 |
Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT by Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2006) Modified on 3/1/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/23/2006)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
713 |
Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM; Objections to Supplemental Presentence Report; and Request for Evidentiary Hearing by Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2006) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
712 |
Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy continuing Resentencing Hearing to 2/27/2006 at 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/24/06. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2006) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
711 |
Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy continuing Sentencing Hearing to 1/30/2006 at 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/5/06. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2006) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
710 |
Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Attorney's Change of Address by Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2006) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
709 |
Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claudia Wilken: Status Hearing re 2255 Motion as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy held on 12/12/2005. Resentencing set for 1/23/2006 at 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2005) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
708 |
Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy Continuing Status Hearing to 12/12/2005 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/28/05. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2005) (Entered: 11/29/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
707 |
Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
CLERK'S NOTICE setting Status Conference for 11/28/2005 at 02:30 PM as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2005) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
704 |
Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING in part and DENYING in part motion for 28 USC 2255 (Civil case No.: C02-3752) [441-1]; granting motion to vacate sentence and denying motion to vacate conviction. Request for discovery and for an evidentiary hearing is DENIED (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
703 |
Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy to supplemental response [700-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
700 |
Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental RESPONSE by Plaintiff USA re second supplemental motion pursuant to 28:2255 [508-1] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
699 |
Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken setting briefing schedule on supplemental memorandun in support of 2255 motion [441-1]; Respondent shall file a supplemental opposition within thirty days of the date of the Order; Movant may file a reply within thirty days of the receipt of the opposition; motion will be taken under submission, or set for hearing if required as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
698 |
Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
697 |
Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
696 |
Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
695 |
Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken sealing second supplemental memorandum and exhibits re: 2255 motion and motion to file under seal as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
691 |
Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Claudia Wilken; sentencing Prasad Lakireddy (3) on count 1ss of the superseding information, five (5) years probation; $100 special assessment; $20,000 fine; dismissing counts as to Prasad Lakireddy (3) count 1 of the information, dismissed supereding indictment filed; count(s) 1s, 5s-6s, 7s-8s, 19s -21s of the superseding indictment, dismissed, superseding information filed; terminating case; (C/R: Raynee Mercado) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2004)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
667 |
Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Wilken, dated 8/22/03, from Ted W. Cassman regarding ruling on 2255 motion as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
660 |
Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken instructing counsel for government and defendant to submit a stipulation to the court within thirty (30) days of this order regarding parties intention regarding to use court interpreters or interpreters provided by defense counsel. (pta, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
657 |
Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
CLERK'S NOTICE rescheduling hearing on motion to quash subpoena for attendance at trial and subpoena duces tecum [654-1] for 2:00 on 12/1/03; opposition to be filed by 11/10/03; reply due 11/17/03 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
654 |
Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION with memorandum in support before Judge Claudia Wilken by Third Party Jayashri Srikantiah to quash subpoena for attendance at trial and subpoena duces tecum (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
650 |
Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
CLERK'S NOTICE setting hearing on motion for travel to India [645-1] for 10:00 on 9/9/03 before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
649 |
Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
CLERK'S NOTICE setting hearing on motion for letters rogatory [634-1] for 2:00 on 9/2/03 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
648 |
Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken referring to Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil the motion for travel to India [645-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
641 |
Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/18/2003)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
623 |
Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION before Judge Claudia Wilken to seal the response of Victims 1, 2, 4, 5, 6 and 7 to the motion for admission of evidence pursuant to Rule of Evidence 412 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
616 |
Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Claudia Wilken; DENYING motion for depositions of government witnesses, GRANTING motion to extend time to depose indian witnesses and GRANTING motion to provide FRE 412 notice [610-1]; (C/R: Nici Rodich) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
597 |
Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING motion to modify protective order [551-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/21/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
593 |
Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE withdrawing motion to quash subpoena for attendance at trial and subpoena duces tecum [586-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
586 |
Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION by Third Party Jayashir Srikantiah before Judge Claudia Wilken to quash subpoena for attendance at trial and subpoena duces tecum memorandum in support thereof (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
560 |
Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/26/2003)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
559 |
Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING motion to file pleadings under seal by Lakireddy Bali Reddy [558-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/26/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
558 |
Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION before Judge Claudia Wilken by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy to file pleadings under seal (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/24/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
557 |
Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY memorandum by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy in support of motion for 28 USC 2255 (Civil case No.: C02-3752) [441-1] ***REDACTED VERSION*** (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 03/24/2003 (Entered: 03/24/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
556 |
Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken continuing hearing on motion to modify protective order [551-1] to 2:00 on 4/14/03; time for filing responsive pleadings extended to 4/7/03 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/19/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
553 |
Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
PROOF OF SERVICE of declaration [552-1], motion to modify protective order [551-1] (scu, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
552 |
Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION by Scott A. Kronland in support of motion to modify protective order [551-1] (scu, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
551 |
Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
Notice of motion and MOTION with memorandum in support before Judge Claudia Wilken by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Lakshmi and Jarmani Prattipati to modify protective order with Notice set for 3/24/03 at 2:00 (scu, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
549 |
Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING motion to file response to 2255 motion under seal [548-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/10/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
548 |
Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION before Judge Claudia Wilken by USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy to file response to 2255 motion under seal (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
547 |
Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
AMENDED RESPONSE by Plaintiff USA re motion for 28 USC 2255 (Civil case No.: C02-3752) [441-1] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy ***REDACTED VERSION*** (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
546 |
Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken extending the time for defendant to file reply memorandum to 2255 motion to 3/21/03 as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
543 |
Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to continue filing date of reply memorandum to 3/21/03 as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
535 |
Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
DOCUMENT 535 FILED UNDER SEAL per Court Order #549 dated 3/6/03 (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 03/10/2003 (Entered: 02/21/2003)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
534 |
Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None |
|
|
DOCUMENT 534 FILED UNDER SEAL per Court Order #549 dated 3/6/03 (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 03/10/2003 (Entered: 02/21/2003)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
533 |
Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken continuing hearing on motion to use complaining witnesses' real names at trial [528-1] to 2:00 on 3/31/03 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/12/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
532 |
Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken extending briefing schedule on 2255 motion as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; government's response due 2/20/03; reply due 3/7/03 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/07/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
519 |
Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken extending briefing schedule on 2255 motion as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; government's response due 2/6/03; reply due 2/13/03 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
515 |
Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
514 |
Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
513 |
Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING motion to file pleadings under seal by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [507-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
498 |
Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING motion to file pleadings under seal [496-1] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; supplemental motion and memorandum re 2255 motion and supporting exhibits to be returned. Only the actual confidential information may be filed under seal, remainder may be filed in public record (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
497 |
Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken relating case CR-00-40028 with member case C-02-5570 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
496 |
Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION before Judge Claudia Wilken by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy to file pleadings under seal (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/03/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
491 |
Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING motion for sealing order [488-1] and protective order [488-2] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/27/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
489 |
Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None |
|
|
JOINDER by plaintiffs' in notice of related case filed by defendants in C-02-5570-VRW (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/27/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
480 |
Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken extending briefing schedule as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; the time for defendant to file additional papers in support of 2255 motion is extended to 12/2/02; government to file response within 30 days thereafter; defendant to reply within a week after that (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
478 |
Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to extend briefing schedule on 28:2255 motion as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
468 |
Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken re motion pursuant to 28:2255, defendant may file further papers in support no later than thirty days from the date of this Order; government shall respond thirty days thereafter, and defendant may reply a week after that; motion will be taken under submission, or set for hearing if required as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
453 |
Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to correct sentence as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/18/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
449 |
Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to correct sentence as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/11/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
448 |
Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE by Plaintiff USA in 4:00-cr-40028 re motion for 28 USC 2255 (Civil case No.: C02-3752) by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [441-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/11/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
443 |
Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 2255 Motion by Judge Claudia Wilken as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy in 4:00-cr-40028 ; respondent to file answer within 30 days of this order. Petitioner may file traverse within 30 days of receipt of the answer; Motion for evidentiary hearing denied without prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (pta, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
442 |
Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION by Ted W. Cassman on behalf of defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy in 4:00-cr-40028 in support of motion for 28 USC 2255 ( Civil case No.: C02-3752) [441-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/05/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
441 |
Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION before Judge Claudia Wilken by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy for 28 USC 2255 ( Civil case No.: C02-3752) (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 07/22/2004 (Entered: 08/05/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
420 |
Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None |
|
|
REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 6/19/01 ( C/R: Raynee Mercado) minutes [292-4] (oh, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
393 |
Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken REFERRING to Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil the motion to quash subpoenas duces tecum [339-1], the motion to quash subpoenas duces tecum [338-1], the motion to quash Rule 17(c) subpoenas [337-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/27/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
392 |
Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
AMENDED RECUSAL ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken amending the Court's 12 10/01 recusal order as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/26/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
388 |
Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Executive Committee Case reassigned to Judge Claudia Wilken (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
387 |
Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong recusing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy; all pending dates of motions, pretrial conferences and trial are VACATED; case to be reassigned pursuant to Section F of the Assignment Plan (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
362 |
Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong permitting withdrawal of Exhibit F to the declaration of L. Jay Kuo in support of motion to quash subpoenas by Victims #1 and 2 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
361 |
Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
JOINDER by City of Berkeley re motion to quash Rule 17(c) subpoenas by plaintiff USA [337-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
360 |
Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
PROOF OF SERVICE by Victims #1 and #2 of proposed order sealing exhibit (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/14/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
354 |
Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
352 |
Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 7/27/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
346 |
Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of motion by Plaintiff USA amending motion to quash Rule 17(c) subpoenas [337-1] hearing to 9:00 on 11/27/01 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
344 |
Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of JOINDER re motion to quash subpoenas duces tecum [339-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
342 |
Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of JOINDER re motion to quash subpoenas duces tecum [339-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
339 |
Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong by Victims #1 and 2 to quash subpoenas duces tecum with Notice set for 11/27/01 at 9:00 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
338 |
Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong by Victims 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, and 7 to quash subpoenas duces tecum with Notice set for 11/27/01 at 9:00; memorandum in support thereof (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
335 |
Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
LETTER from Bharat Kona, dated 9/25/01, regarding interpreter services (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
326 |
Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document as to Uma Rao (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/01/2001)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
321 |
Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; motion setting hearing held; pending motions will be heard at 9:00 on 11/6/01 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy; motions to be filed by 10/2/01; opposition due 10/16/01; reply due 10/23/01; (C/R: Nici Rodich) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
320 |
Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff USA of clerk's notice [319-2] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
319 |
Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
CLERK'S NOTICE further status hearing continued to 9/18/01 at 9:00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
315 |
Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
CJA Form 23 (Financial Affidavit) as to witness Uma Rao (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/29/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
314 |
Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil; I.D. of counsel hearing held as to witness Uma Rao; CJA attorney provided to represent witness; (Tape No.: 01-48) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/29/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
312 |
Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil for reconveyance as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy in 4:00-cr-40028 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
311 |
Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Mag. Judge Brazil, dated 8/16/01, from Ted W. Cassman regarding order for reconveyance of third deed of trust as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
309 |
Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (cc: all counsel) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
308 |
Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION regarding entry of protective order as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
304 |
Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
Payment Record Card: Payment of restitution in the amount of $2,000,000 on behalf of defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
297 |
Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/20/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
296 |
Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/19/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
295 |
Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/31/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
294 |
Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
Payment Record Card: Payment of special assessment in the amount of $400 on behalf of defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
293 |
Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong (cc: all counsel) (Date Entered: 6/25/01) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
292 |
Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; sentencing Lakireddy Bali Reddy (1) on count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 5s, of the superseding indictment, committed to custody of BOP for a term of 60 months on Count 1, for a term of 97 months on Counts 2 and 3, and a term of 36 months on count 5 to run concurrent; 3 years supervised release on Counts 1, 2 and 3, and one year supervised release on Count 5 to run concurrent; $400 special assessment; $2 million restitution; dismissing counts as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5-6, 8-9 dismissed, superseding indictment filed; (C/R: Raynee Mercado) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
291 |
Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil for return of passports as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
290 |
Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION for release of passports as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/22/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
289 |
Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/31/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/22/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
288 |
Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/19/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
287 |
Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/17/01, as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
286 |
Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/16/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
285 |
Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
284 |
Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
283 |
Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
282 |
Filed: 5/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/14/01, regarding setencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
281 |
Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/31/01, as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
280 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; status hearing re judgment and sentencing held as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; (C/R: Raynee Mercado) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
279 |
Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
CLERK's letter spreading the mandate to counsel as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
278 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
CERTIFIED COPY of USCA Order: DENYING petition as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
277 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
276 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/18/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
275 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/18/01, enclosing 43 letters regarding condemnation of defendant's actions as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
274 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/17/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
273 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/16/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
272 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01 regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
271 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
270 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
269 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
268 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
267 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
266 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/15/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
265 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
LETTER dated 6/15/01 regarding further questions to Office of the Inspector General as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
264 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
LETTER dated 6/14/01 regarding questions to Office of the Inspector General as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
263 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/14/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
262 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/13/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
261 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/14/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
260 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/14/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
259 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/14/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
258 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/14/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
257 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/14/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
256 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
PETITION regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
255 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong permitting defendant to wear street clothes at the 6/19/01 hearing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
254 |
Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/18/01, from Ted W. Cassman requesting defendant be permitted to wear personal clothes to court on 6/19/01 as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
253 |
Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/14/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
252 |
Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
251 |
Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/12/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
250 |
Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/14/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
249 |
Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
STATEMENT regarding evidentiary hearing by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
248 |
Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY by Plaintiff USA re sentencing memorandum [234-1] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
247 |
Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/12/01, from Robert P. Anderson regarding charitable gifts to India by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
246 |
Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/12/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
245 |
Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/9/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
244 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/11/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
243 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/10/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
242 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/8/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
241 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/8/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
240 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/8/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
239 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/7/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
238 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/7/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
237 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/31/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
236 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/31/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
235 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/31/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
234 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING memorandum filed by Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
233 |
Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING memorandum filed by USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
232 |
Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong regarding evidentiary hearing on parties objections to presentence report as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; if parties conclude that a hearing is necessary they shall advise the Court in any sentencing memorandum they may submit and come to the 6/19/01 sentencing hearing prepared to present any evidence or legal argument they may wish to submit (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
231 |
Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/7/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
230 |
Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/6/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
229 |
Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/6/01, Bharat Kona, Bay Area Telugu Association regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
228 |
Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/28/01, from International Human Rights Law Group regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
227 |
Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/6/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
226 |
Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
PETITION regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
225 |
Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/2/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
224 |
Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
223 |
Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/3/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
222 |
Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/3/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
221 |
Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 6/3/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
220 |
Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/26/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/05/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
219 |
Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/20/01, regarding punishment as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
218 |
Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/8/01, regarding sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
214 |
Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 5/6/01, from Isabel T. Escoda regarding sentence as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
213 |
Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE by Intervenor San Jose Mercury New of counsel's change of address (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/24/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
212 |
Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/7/01 (C/R: Candace Yount) minutes [177-2] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/18/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
203 |
Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil VACATING previous order barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
202 |
Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil VACATING previous order barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
201 |
Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil VACATING previous order barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
200 |
Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil VACATING previous order barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
199 |
Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil VACATING previous order barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
198 |
Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil VACATING previous order barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 03/15/2001 (Entered: 03/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
197 |
Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil exonerating bond as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
196 |
Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Mag. Judge Brazil, dated 3/8/01, from Ted W. Cassman regarding proposed orders exonerating bond and vacating order barring transfer of encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 03/15/2001 (Entered: 03/15/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
191 |
Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong sentencing hearing continued to 6/19/01 at 9:00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
190 |
Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by Probation requesting continuance of sentencing hearing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
189 |
Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM regarding letters submitted in regards to plea agreement as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
188 |
Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong re redacted copies of documents pursuant to Court's order dated 3/2/01 as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
187 |
Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by Plaintiff USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
186 |
Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
Proposed REDACTION of documents to be unsealed per Court order by Plaintiff USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
185 |
Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 3/9/01, from Ted W. Cassman regarding probation request to extend sentencing date as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
184 |
Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
CLERK'S NOTICE for pre-sentence investigation as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
183 |
Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO ENTER PLEA OF GUILTY by Lakireddy Bali Reddy before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
182 |
Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
PLEA Agreement as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
181 |
Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; Lakireddy Bali Reddy enters guilty plea to count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 5s of the superseding indictment; sentencing hearing will be held at 9:00 on 4/10/01 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy; defendant remanded to custody; (C/R: Candace Yount) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/07/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
179 |
Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy re: release pending sentencing (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
178 |
Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff USA regarding bail pending sentencing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
177 |
Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; change of plea hearing continued to 3/7/01 at 9:30 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy; counsel to submint briefs re: defendant remaining on bond pending completion of presentence report and sentencing by 3:00pm 3/5/01; (C/R: Candace Yount) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
168 |
Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong GRANTING motion to intervene and to join in motion to unseal documents by intervenor's San Jose Mercury News [166-1]; GRANTING motion to intervene under pseudonyms by Jane Does I, II, and III [153-1]; GRANTING motion for protective order to redact victims' names from documents by intervenor's Jane Does I, II, and III [153-2]; GRANTING motion to intervene by intervenor's The Hearst Corporation [141-1]; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part motion to unseal documents by intervenor The Hearst Corporation [141-2]; all reference to specific statements contained, or information disclosed, in the defendant's confidential pretrial release financial affidavit [Docket No. 8] shall be redacted from the government's submission concerning the affidavit [Docket No. 13]; the name of each person alleged to have been a victm of, or a witness to, any offense a defendant herein is charged with shall be redacted from the following documents; that those same documents shall be unsealed immediately following the redactions: Docket Nos. 12, 13, 24, 25, 32, 33, 39, 70, 94, and 116-118; the following documents require redaction: Docket Nos. 13, 24, 70, and 117; government shall submit a redacted version to the Court by 3/9/01 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
167 |
Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
LETTER dated 3/1/01 from John W. Kennedy requesting hearing for entry of guilty pleas be set for 3/5/01 at 10:00 as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/02/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
166 |
Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong to intervene and to join in motion to unseal documents with Notice set for 3/6/01 at 9:00 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
165 |
Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 2/26/01, from John William Templeton as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/27/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
162 |
Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor The Hearst Corporation of declaration [161-1], reply [160-1] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/23/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
161 |
Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION by Lisa M. Sitkin in support of application to intervene [141-1], and motion to unseal documents [141-2] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/23/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
160 |
Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY brief by intervenor The Hearst Corporation in support of application to intervene [141-1], and motion to unseal documents [141-2] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/23/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
159 |
Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong for extension of time to file reply in support of application to intervene as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy by Intervenor The Hearst Corporation (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/23/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
158 |
Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong granting motion to continue status hearing one week [157-1]; status hearing continued to 3/6/01 at 9:00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, for Prasad Lakireddy, for Jayaprakash Lakireddy, for Annapurna Lakireddy; time period from 2/27/01 through 3/6/01 is excluded from Speedy Trial Act computation (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/23/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
157 |
Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
Stipulated REQUEST before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong by USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy to continue status hearing one week (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
156 |
Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE by Plaintiff USA re motion to intervene [141-1], and motion to unseal documents by Hearst Corporation [141-2] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
155 |
Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION by Meera Trehan in support of motion to intervene under pseudonyms [153-1] and motion for protective order to redact victims' names from documents [153-2] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
154 |
Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by intervenors Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, and Jane Doe III in support of motion to intervene under pseudonyms [153-1] and motion for protective order to redact victims' names from documents [153-2] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
153 |
Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
APPLICATION before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong to intervene under pseudonyms and for protective order to redact victims' names from documents with Notice set for 3/6/01 (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 02/09/2001 (Entered: 02/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
152 |
Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
EXHIBIT A (Part 2) in support of opposition [148-1] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
151 |
Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
EXHIBIT A (Part 1) in support of opposition [148-1] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
150 |
Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION by Dr. Edward J. Bronson re motion to intervene [141-1] and to unseal documents by Hearst Corporation [141-2] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
149 |
Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION by Ted Cassman on behalf of defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
148 |
Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
OPPOSITION by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy to motion to intervene [141-1], and motion to unseal documents by Hearst Corporation dba San Francisco Chronicle [141-2] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
147 |
Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong setting hearing on Hearst's application to intervene [141-1] and motion to unseal documents [141-2] for 9:00 on 3/6/01; responses due on on 2/8/01; reply due 2/19/01 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
146 |
Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong that the parties shall notify the Court in writing, and by telephone on 2/5/01 whether the prefer to have Hearst's application and motion set for hearing on 2/27/01 at 9:00 or on 3/6/01 as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
145 |
Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong continuing hearing on motion to intervene [141-1] and motion to unseal documents [141-2] to 9:00 on 3/6/01; responsed to be filed by 2/1/01; reply due 2/9/01 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
144 |
Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to continue hearing date for application to intervene and motion to unseal documents as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 01/19/2001 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
143 |
Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil modifying conditions of release as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; releasing passports of sureties Susilpa Lakireddy and Hanimireddy Lakireddy to permit travel outside the U.S. from 1/15/01 to 3/31/01; each passport to be returned to the Clerk within two weeks of the individual's return to the U.S. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
142 |
Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to release the passports of surities Susilpa Lakireddy and Hanimireddy Lakireddy to permit travel outside of the U.S. as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
141 |
Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong by the Hearst Corporation dba San Francisco Chronicle to intervene and to unseal documents with Notice set for 1/23/01 at 9:00 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/08/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
140 |
Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong :for travel to Berkeley, CA from 12/24/00 to 12/26/00 and from 12/31/00 to 1/2/01 as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/04/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
139 |
Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; status hearing held; status hearing as to trial setting will be held at 9:00 on 2/27/01 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, for Prasad Lakireddy, for Jayaprakash Lakireddy, for Annapurna Lakireddy; (C/R: Carol Karen) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/29/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
134 |
Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Plaintiff USA (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/19/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
133 |
Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong status hearing will be held at 9:00 on 12/19/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, for Prasad Lakireddy, for Jayaprakash Lakireddy, for Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/15/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
131 |
Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil :for travel to Berkeley from 11/23/00 to 11/24/00 as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
130 |
Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION modifying conditions of release as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
129 |
Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Mag. Judge Brazil, dated 11/17/00, from Ted W. Cassman regarding passport of surety Susilpa Lakireddy as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
128 |
Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 10/30/00 (C/R: Candace Yount) minutes [119-2] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
127 |
Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil releasing specified properties only from bar on transfers and encumbrances as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
126 |
Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION releasing specified properties only from bar on transfers and encumbrances as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
125 |
Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Mag. Judge Brazil, dated 11/17/00, from Ted W. Cassman regarding redundancy in stipulation and proposed order for release of certain properties as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
124 |
Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil modifying conditions of release as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; releasing the passport of Vijaya Lakireddy to permit travel outside of the U.S. from 11/21/00 through 1/15/01; passport shall be returned to the Clerk on or before 1/30/01 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/20/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
123 |
Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION modifying conditions of release as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/20/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
122 |
Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION regarding plea agreements and defendant's custody status as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/02/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
121 |
Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
LETTER dated 10/30/00 from Roger R. Myers re notice of violation of constitutional right of access and request to postpone hearing or rescind closure order as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
120 |
Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 10/30/00, from S.F. Examiner Reporter re closed door hearing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
119 |
Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; change of plea hearing not held; hearing re objections to under seal proceedings held; 10/25/00 order sealing proceedings VACATED; matter referred to U.S. Probation for pre-plea and presentence investigation as to all defendants; 10/31/00 change of plea hearing for defendant Annapurna Lakireddy VACATED; change of plea hearing will be held at 9:00 on 2/6/01 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, for Prasad Lakireddy, for Jayaprakash Lakireddy, for Annapurna Lakireddy; (C/R: Candace Yount) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
118 |
Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong sealing government's motion to seal supplement to plea agreements, and the supplement to the plea agreements as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #168*** (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
117 |
Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by Plaintiff USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
116 |
Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy re: Rule 11 in camera proceedings ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #168*** (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
113 |
Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER, by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong, SEALING MEMORANDUM RE: RULE 11 IN CAMERA PROCEEDINGS, as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy. (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/30/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
112 |
Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER, by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong, SEALING PLEAS, as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, defendant Prasad Lakireddy, defendant Jayaprakash Lakireddy, defendant Annapurna Lakireddy. (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/30/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
110 |
Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: (filed on 10/27/00) Initial appearance held before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil. First appearance of Annapurna Lakireddy. Attorney Anne C. Moorman present. Defendant released on own recognizance as to Annapurna Lakireddy. Dft Annapurna Lakireddy arraigned; NOT GUILTY plea entered. Change of plea hearing will be held at 9:00 a.m. on 10/31/00 for Annapurna Lakireddy, before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong. ( Tape No.: 00-73) (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/30/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
102 |
Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: (filed on 10/26/00) Arraignment hearing held before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil. Dft Lakireddy Bali Reddy arraigned; NOT GUILTY plea entered. Attorney present. Change of plea hearing held change of plea hearing will be held at 9:00 a.m. on 10/30/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong. ( Tape No.: 00-70 & 00-71) (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
101 |
Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
WAIVER of INDICTMENT by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
98 |
Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SUPERSEDING Information naming Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy, Prasad Lakireddy, Jayaprakash Lakireddy, Annapurna Lakireddy Lakireddy Bali Reddy (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 5s, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (2) count(s) 1s, 4s, 6s, Prasad Lakireddy (3) count(s) 1, Jayaprakash Lakireddy (4) count(s) 1, Annapurna Lakireddy (5) count(s) 1 (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/25/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
97 |
Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
LETTER dated 10/19/00 from John W. Kennedy requesting status hearing be continued to 10/30/00 for change of plea hearing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/23/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
96 |
Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff USA of order [95-4] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/10/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
95 |
Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong status and setting hearing continued to 9:00 on 10/24/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy; time period from 10/10/00 through 10/24/00 is excluded from Speedy Trial Act computation; sealing stipulation (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/10/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
94 |
Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to continue hearing and to exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #168*** (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
93 |
Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong status or setting hearing will be held at 9:00 on 10/10/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy; time period from 6/13/00 through 10/10/00 is excluded from Speedy Trial Act computation (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
92 |
Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
91 |
Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; status hearing held; further status hearing will be held at 9:00 on 10/10/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy; (C/R: Carol Karen) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/14/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
90 |
Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong motion to dismiss counts five and six for vagueness by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [80-1] deemed WITHDRAWN without prejudice to refiling; status and setting hearing will be held at 9:00 on 9/12/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/12/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
89 |
Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Judge Armstrong, dated 9/8/00, from John W. Kennedy requesting 9/12/00 hearing be changed to a status and setting hearing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/12/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
88 |
Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY memorandum by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy re motion to dismiss counts five and six for vagueness by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [80-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/05/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
87 |
Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil modifying conditions of release as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; extending surety Susilpa Lakireddy's trip to India until 10/30/00; passport shall be returned to Clerk of the Court on or before 11/15/00 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/31/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
86 |
Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION modifying conditions of release as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/31/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
85 |
Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
OPPOSITION by Plaintiff USA to motion to dismiss counts five and six for vagueness by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [80-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/29/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
84 |
Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/24/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
83 |
Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/16/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
82 |
Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/16/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
81 |
Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy in support of motion to dismiss counts five and six for vagueness by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [80-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/11/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
80 |
Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
Notice of motion and MOTION before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong to dismiss counts five and six for vagueness by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/11/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
79 |
Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong modifying briefing schedule as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy; motion to dismiss to be filed on 8/11/00; opposition due 8/25/00; reply due 9/1/00 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/11/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
77 |
Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil modifying conditions of release allowing surety Susilpa Lakireddy to travel outside the U.S. from 7/27/00 to 8/30/00; passport to be returned to the Clerk on or before 9/15/00 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/24/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
76 |
Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION modifying conditions of release as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/24/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
75 |
Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER, by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil, modifying conditions of release, as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/17/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
74 |
Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION modifying conditions of release, as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/17/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
73 |
Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
WAIVER of appearance and acknowledgement of order to appear by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
71 |
Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; GRANTING waiver of defendant's appearance; status hearing held; hearing on motion to dismiss will be held at 9:00 on 9/12/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy; motion to be filed by 8/8/00; opposition due 8/22/00; reply due 8/25/00; (C/R: Carol Karen) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER, by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong, excluding time from 4/11/00 through 6/13/00 under the Speedy Trial Act, as to defendants Lakireddy Bali Reddy and Vijay Kumar Lakireddy. (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/26/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to exclude time under Speedy Trial Act, as to defendants Lakireddy Bali Reddy and Vijay Kumar Lakireddy. (rl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/26/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil extending travel to India until 4/30/00 for Vijaya Lakireddy as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; WITHDRAWING motion to dismiss [43-1], WITHDRAWING motion for a bill of particulars by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [43-2] without prejudice pending filing of a superseding indictment; further status hearing will be held at 9:00 on 6/13/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy; (C/R: Carol Karen) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong DENYING stipulation requesting hearing scheduled for 4/11/00 be continued to 5/2/00 as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION for continuance of hearing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong GRANTING motion to compel voice and handwriting exemplars by USA as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [36-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: 3/28/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong to preserve evidence as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/29/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: 3/28/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION to preserve evidence as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/29/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SUR-REPLY by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy re motion to compel voice and handwriting exemplars by USA as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [36-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy re motion to dismiss [43-1] or alternatively for a bill of particulars by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [43-2] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
OPPOSITION by Plaintiff USA to motion to dismiss [43-1], or, alternatively, for a bill of particulars by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [43-2] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION by Garen Nielsen in support of motion to compel voice and handwriting exemplars by USA as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [36-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY by Plaintiff USA re response to motion to compel handwriting and voice exemplars [42-1] as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/02/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/02/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
STATUS REPORT and reservation of additional motions by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION by Ted W. Cassman as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy in support of motion to dismiss [43-1], or, alternatively for a bill of particulars by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [43-2] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
Notice of motion and MOTION before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong to dismiss or, alternatively, for a bill of particulars by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy re motion to compel voice and handwriting exemplars by USA as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [36-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/01/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/24/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
40 |
Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/24/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong relating case 4:00-cr-40028 with member case 4:00-sx-3009 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #168*** (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 03/06/2001 (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/23/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
37 |
Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff USA in support of motion to compel voice and handwriting exemplars by USA as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [36-1] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
36 |
Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong to compel voice and handwriting exemplars by USA as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy with notice set for 4/11/00 at 9:00 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/22/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
35 |
Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by Plaintiff USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/18/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
34 |
Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by Plaintiff USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/18/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
33 |
Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Judge D. L. Jensen GRANTING motion to seal the opposition to defendants' motion to quash by USA as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy [32-1] ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #168*** (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 03/06/2001 (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MOTION before Judge D. L. Jensen by USA to seal the opposition to defendants' motion to quash by USA as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #168*** (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 03/06/2001 (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
31 |
Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil barring transfer or encumbrance of real property as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/18/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
Bench Warrant returned executed as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy on 1/18/00 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/16/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
29 |
Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; status hearing held; all pending motions will be heard by 9:00 on 4/11/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy, for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy; motions to be filed by 2/29/00; opposition due 3/14/00; reply due 3/21/00; (C/R: Candace Yount) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/16/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by Pretrial Services re travel restrictions on bond as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/10/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
26 |
Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
PETITION for Action on Conditions of Pretrial release ordered by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil that conditions of release be amended to restrict defendants travel to the Northern District of California for the purposes of court appearances, Pretrial Services visits, attorney visits, and medical appointments, by PTO: Steven J. Sheehan as to Lakireddy Bali Reddy . (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/10/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil sealing the application for material witness warrants, and affidavit in support of the application as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #168*** (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/08/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by Plaintiff USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/08/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
22 |
Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by Plaintiff USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy, defendant Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/08/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
21 |
Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil; dft Lakireddy Bali Reddy arraigned; NOT GUILTY plea entered; Attorney present; status or trial setting hearing will be held at 9:00 on 2/15/00 for Vijay Kumar Lakireddy; (Tape No.: 00-11) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/08/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20 |
Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil for release of the passport of Vijaya Lakireddy to permit her to travel to India from 2/18/00 to 4/10/00; Vijaya Lakireddy shall return her passport forthwith upon her return from India (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/08/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil; GRANTING Vijaya Lakireddy's request for travel, passport to be returned; dft Lakireddy Bali Reddy arraigned; NOT GUILTY plea entered; Attorney present; status or trial setting hearing will be held at 9:00 on 2/15/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong; (Tape No.: 00-11) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/08/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Mag. Judge Brazil, dated 2/4/00, from Ted W. Cassman regarding status on bail situation as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/07/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Mag. Judge Brazil, dated 2/2/00, from Ted W. Cassman regarding property documents as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/03/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: 1/25/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
$10,000,000 property and P/R bond by Lakireddy Bali Reddy by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/02/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
INDICTMENT by AUSA John W. Kennedy. Counts filed against Lakireddy Bali Reddy (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5-6, 8-9, Vijay Kumar Lakireddy (2) count(s) 1, 2, 7 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/01/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: 1/26/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil; bail posting/signing held; GRANTING request to waive defendant's appearance; arraignment or preliminary exam will be held at 10:00 on 2/7/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy; (Tape No.: 00-8) [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: 1/25/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by Plaintiff USA as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 1/25/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil sealing government's submission regarding the defendant's assets as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #168*** (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/06/2001)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 1/25/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil,dated 1/25/00, from Berkeley City Attorney Manuela Albuquerque regarding detention and bail request as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 1/25/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil; further detention hearing held; defendant released on $10,000,000 bond pending submission of property documents; arraignment or preliminary exam will be held at 10:00 on 2/7/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy; (Tape No.: 00-7) [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 1/25/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER by Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil to file declaration under seal as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED document by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Mag. Judge Brazil, dated 1/24/00, from Ted W. Cassman declaration and proposed order to seal as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental MEMORANDUM by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy in opposition to government's detention motion [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER to Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil, dated 1/20/00, from Manuela Albuquerque, City of Berkeley, City Attorney requesting to appear as amicus curie at 1/21/00 hearing as to defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 01/24/2000 (Entered: 01/24/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil; detention hearing held; further detention hearing set for 10:00 on 1/25/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy; remanding defendant to custody; (Tape No.: 00-5 & 00-6) [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/24/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM by defendant Lakireddy Bali Reddy in opposition to government's detention motion [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/24/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
MINUTES: before Mag. Judge Wayne D. Brazil; first appearance of Lakireddy Bali Reddy, Attorney present; detention hearing set for 10:00 on 1/21/00 for Lakireddy Bali Reddy; defendant remanded to custody; (Tape No.: 00-5) [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/19/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None |
 |
|
COMPLAINT against Lakireddy Bali Reddy (1) count(s) cmp before Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James [ 4:00-m -4 ] (kc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/18/2000)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |