Bryan Atwood v. CertainTeed Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-1407

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 5:26 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
BRIEF by Appellee CertainTeed Corporation in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/24/2014. [999402493] [14-1407]--[Docket Text -Type of Brief -Edited 07/25/2014 by ALC] M. Kelly Tillery
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
    FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Bryan L. Atwood. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/23/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Yes. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999381271] [14-1407] Frederick Greco
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
      BRIEF by Appellant Bryan L. Atwood in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/23/2014. [999381257] [14-1407] Frederick Greco
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
        CORRECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellee CertainTeed Corporation. [14-1407] Matthew Foster
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by M. Kelly Tillery for CertainTeed Corporation.[999356044] [14-1407] M. Kelly Tillery
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sean P McConnell for CertainTeed Corporation.[999355451] [14-1407] Sean McConnell
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee CertainTeed Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999355348] [14-1407] Matthew Foster
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-1407] (SLW)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                  BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/23/2014. Response Brief due 07/24/2014. [14-1407] (ALC)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Bryan L. Atwood. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999354222] [14-1407] Frederick Greco
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                      DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Bryan L. Atwood. [14-1407] Frederick Greco
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Frederick D. Greco for Bryan L. Atwood.[999354217] [14-1407] Frederick Greco
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Matthew D. Foster for Certainteed Corporation.[999350411] [14-1407] Matthew Foster
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                            DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-01006-CMH-JFA. [14-1407] (ALC)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                              Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-01006-CMH-JFA. Case manager: ACarlheim. [14-1407] (ALC)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?