District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Think Computer Foundation et al v. Administrative Office of the United States Courts et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:14-cv-02396-JTM
District Judge Jeffrey T Miller, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 18, 2019 at 3:07 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Greenspan, Aaron, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Aaron Jacob Greenspan"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspan, Aaron

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Think Computer Corporation +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959
Think Computer Foundation Think Computer Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Think Computer Foundation +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959
v.
Administrative Office of the United States Courts Administrative Office of the United States Courts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bety Javidzad +1 310 229 9900 +1 310 229 9901 bjavidzad@venable.com
No Logo Claudia Wilken, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michel Ishakian, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
No Logo Richard W. Wieking, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States District Court For The Northern District Of California, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
No Logo Wendell Skidgel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
Office San Jose
Filed 5/23/2014
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ADRMOP
Flags ADRMOP,ProSe
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller denying [61] Motion for FED.R.CIV.P 60(B) Relief (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
    LREF
    Legal Document 62 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Memorandum In Support
    MEMORANDUM in Support re [61] MOTION Relief from a Judgment or Order Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(1) or in the Alternative 60(b)(6) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Related document(s)[61]) (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document 61 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015, Terminated: 12/8/2015 motion for miscellaneous relief
      MOTION for Relief from a Judgment or Order Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(1) or in the Alternative 60(b)(6) filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Responses due by 12/21/2015. Replies due by 12/28/2015. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
        CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 59 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 USCA Mandate
          MANDATE of USCA as to [56] Notice of Appeal, filed by Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation, Aaron Jacob Greenspan (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
            LREF
            Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015, Terminated: 3/10/2015 USCA order
            ORDER of USCA as to [56] Notice of Appeal, filed by Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation, Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
              LREF
              Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: 12/31/2014 USCA Case Number
              USCA Time Scheduling Order. USCA Case Number 14-17570 US Court of Appeals for [56] Notice of Appeal, filed by Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation, Aaron Jacob Greenspan. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014, Terminated: 1/13/2015 Notice of appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan, Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. Appeal of Order, [55] (Filing Fee Paid - Receipt number 54611015281). (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                  AMENDED ORDER DISMISSING CORPORATE PLAINTIFFS FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN LEGAL REPRESENTATION; GRANTING ALL MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/4/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                    ORDER DISMISSING CORPORATE PLAINTIFFS FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN LEGAL REPRESENTATION; GRANTING ALL MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller denying [34] Motion for Leave to File; granting [36] Motion to Dismiss; granting [37] Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Clerks Notice
                      NOTICE motions taken under submission without oral hearing. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Response (Non-Motion)
                        RESPONSE to re [51] Request for Judicial Notice, [49] Request for Judicial Notice by Administrative Office of the United States Courts, Michel Ishakian, Wendell Skidgel, United States District Court for the Northern District of California, Richard W. Wieking, Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter)(Sandberg, Justin) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Request For Judicial Notice
                        Request for Judicial Notice filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Response to order to show cause
                          RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by American Bar Association In Response to Corporate Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiffs Think Computer Foundation and Think Computer Corporation Should Not be Dismissed as Parties for Failure to Obtain Counsel. (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Request For Judicial Notice
                            Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan, Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Response to order to show cause
                              Corporate Plaintiffs' Response to Second Order to Show Cause [44] Order to Show Cause, byThink Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                REPLY (re [37] MOTION to Dismiss ) in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byAmerican Bar Association. (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                  REPLY (re [36] MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAdministrative Office of the United States Courts, Michel Ishakian, Wendell Skidgel, United States District Court for the Northern District of California, Richard W. Wieking, Claudia Wilken. (Sandberg, Justin) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to [37] MOTION to Dismiss , [34] MOTION for Leave to File, [36] MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2014 10:00 AM before Jeffrey T Miller. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [37] MOTION to Dismiss , [34] MOTION for Leave to File, [36] MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2014 10:00 AM before Jeffrey T Miller. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to [37] MOTION to Dismiss , [34] MOTION for Leave to File, [36] MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2014 10:00 AM before Jeffrey T Miller. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER re [37] MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Bar Association, [36] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard W. Wieking, United States District Court for the Northern District of California, Administrative Office of the United States Courts, Michel Ishakian, Wendell Skidgel, Claudia Wilken, [34] MOTION for Leave to File filed by Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation, Aaron J. Greenspan. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/21/14. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/8/2014. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/21/14. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case FilingCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller granting in part and denying in part [3] Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed byAaron J. Greenspan, Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                  PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (re [37] MOTION to Dismiss , [36] MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAaron J. Greenspan, Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Miller, United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 8/8/14. (Attachments: # (1) Ninth Circuit Order, # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE STAYING CASE PENDING REASSIGNMENT TO OUT OF DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 08/05/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 Notice - other
                                                        NOTICE by Administrative Office of the United States Courts, Michel Ishakian, Wendell Skidgel, United States District Court for the Northern District of California, Richard W. Wieking, Claudia Wilken re [36] MOTION to Dismiss Response Deadline (Sandberg, Justin) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014, Terminated: 12/1/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Bar Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/21/2014. Replies due by 8/28/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014, Terminated: 12/1/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss filed by Administrative Office of the United States Courts, Michel Ishakian, Wendell Skidgel, United States District Court for the Northern District of California, Richard W. Wieking, Claudia Wilken. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/18/2014. Replies due by 8/25/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Justin) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER of Recusal. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/28/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014, Terminated: 12/1/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Via CM/ECF filed by Aaron J. Greenspan, Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER re [24] Response to Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/17/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Michael Sandberg on behalf of the Federal Defendants (Sandberg, Justin) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                      Summons Issued as to Richard W. Wieking. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Summons issued
                                                                        Summons Issued as to Claudia Wilken. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Summons issued
                                                                          Summons Issued as to Wendell Skidgel. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Summons issued
                                                                            Summons Issued as to Michel Ishakian. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding United States District Court for the Northern of California by Aaron J. Greenspan, Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding Administrative Office of the United States Courts by Aaron J. Greenspan, Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding American Bar Association by Aaron J. Greenspan, Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Response to order to show cause
                                                                                    Corporate Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause [22] Order, byThink Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exh A, # (2) Exh. B)(srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Amended Complaint
                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants. Filed byThink Computer Foundation, Think Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exh. A, # (2) Exh. B, # (3) Exh. C, # (4) Exh. D, # (5) Exh. E, # (6) Exh. F, # (7) Exh. G, # (8) Exh. H, # (9) Exh. I, # (10) Exh. J)(srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/13/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER CORRECTING [19] Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/13/2014. The prior Order contained a typographical error in the calculation of the date on which Plaintiffs' response to the Order was due. This Order corrects that typographical error, and sets Plaintiffs' response to be due by July 13, 2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Bety Javidzad (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 6/11/2014) Modified on 6/12/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING [11] Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief to Extend the Time by Which the American Bar Association Must Respond to the Complaint filed by American Bar Association. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/11/2014. (blflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: [11] MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to Why the Complaint Should not be Dismissed (Local Rule 7-11) filed by American Bar Association. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/11/2014. (blflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman denying [14] Motion to Strike. (blflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2014: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                          OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATIONS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO EXTEND THE TIME BY WHICH THE AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION MUST RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED (re [14]; [11] filed by American Bar Association. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 6/11/2014) Text modified on 6/12/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                          Blank  Terminate Motions
                                                                                          Motions terminated: [11] MOTION Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief to Extend the Time by Which the American Bar Association Must Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/14/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Terminated on 6/11/2014 by ECF No. 20)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Terminate Motions
                                                                                            Motions terminated: [11] MOTION Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief to Extend the Time by Which the American Bar Association Must Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/14/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Terminated on 6/11/2014 by ECF No. 20)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Terminate Motions
                                                                                              Motions terminated: [11] MOTION Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief to Extend the Time by Which the American Bar Association Must Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/14/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Terminated on 6/11/2014 by ECF No. 20)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Think Computer Foundation (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Think Computer Corporation (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014, Terminated: 6/11/2014 Motion to strike
                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Defendant American Bar Association's [11] MOTION Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief to Extend the Time by Which the American Bar Association Must Respond to the Complaint; and Motion for Order to Show Cause as to Why the Complaint Should not be Dismissed (Local Rule 7-11) filed by Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. Responses due by 6/24/2014. Replies due by 7/1/2014. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Bar Association re [11] MOTION Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief to Extend the Time by Which the American Bar Association Must Respond to the Complaint; and Motion for Order to Show Cause as to Why the Complaint Should not be Dismissed (Local Rule 7-11) (Administrative Office of the US Courts and USDC Northern District of California (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by American Bar Association (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014, Terminated: 6/11/2014 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                          MOTION Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief to Extend the Time by Which the American Bar Association Must Respond to the Complaint; and Motion for Order to Show Cause as to Why the Complaint Should not be Dismissed (Local Rule 7-11) filed by American Bar Association. Responses due by 6/23/2014. Replies due by 6/30/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Bety Javidzad, # (2) Exhibit A and B re Declaration of Bety Javidzad, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Received Document
                                                                                                          Received filed documents along with original summons issued by clerk's office via US Mail by Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) main document continued, # (2) original summons issued by clerk's office, # (3) Envelope)(srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 terminate hearings
                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, U.S. District Court 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY*** (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Summons issued
                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to American Bar Association. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Administrative Office of the United States Courts. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, at the US District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, CA 95113. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/23/14. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [3] MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014, Terminated: 8/21/2014 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Think Computer Corporation, Think Computer Foundation. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 54611014749.). Filed byThink Computer Foundation, Think Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2014: # (7) Civil Cover Sheet) (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 7,920 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?