O. John Benisek v. Bobby Mack
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-1417

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 11:10 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 3400 - STATUTES-State Reapportionment
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
ORDER filed [999361149] granting appellant's motion for leave to file electronically. [9] Copies to all parties. [14-1417] (SAC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION by Appellant Stephen M. Shapiro for leave to file electronically. Date and method of service: 05/19/2014 US mail. [999361146] [14-1417] (RW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Maria B. Pycha. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999356889] [14-1417] (RW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant O. John Benisek. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999356888] [14-1417] (RW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Stephen M. Shapiro. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999356887] [14-1417] (RW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
            INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: O. John Benisek, Stephen Shapiro, Maria Pycha. Informal Opening Brief due 05/27/2014 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. [14-1417] (RW)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
              RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 05/14/2014 [14-1417] (RW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:13-cv-03233-JKB. Case manager: RWarren. [14-1417] (RW)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 152 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?