Egan v. Goddard
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00189
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 2:25 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo `, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Michael F. Egan, III"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mark Gallagher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark F. Gallagher +1 888 806 1531 mgallagher@hawaiiantel.net
v.
No Logo Gary Wayne Goddard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Koshiba Agena & Kubota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weintraub Tobin Chediak Coleman Grodin Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul E Gaspari +1 415 433 1400 +1 415 433 3883 pgaspari@weintraub.com
Space Daniel C Zamora +1 415 433 1400 +1 415 433 3883 dzamora@weintraub.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Daniel C. Zamora Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1393052.Charles A. Price appearing for Defendant Gary Wayne Goddard (Price, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Paul E. Gaspari Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-1393049.Charles A. Price appearing for Defendant Gary Wayne Goddard (Price, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 13 Declaration, 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, 14 Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Price, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
        Declaration re 13 Declaration, 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Declaration of Wayne Goddard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C to Goddard Declaration, # 2 Exhibit D to Goddard Declaration, # 3 Exhibit E to Goddard Declaration, # 4 Exhibit F-G to Goddard Declaraiton)(Price, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
          Declaration re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue - Declaration of Paul E. Gaspari. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E of Paul E. Gaspari Declaration)(Price, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Charles A. Price appearing for Defendant Gary Wayne Goddard (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Price, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER APPROVING REQUEST FOR MEDIA BLOGGING (Re: Associated Press ~ Jennifer Kelleher, Oskar Garcia, Audrey McAvoy, Cathy Bussewitz) - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 5/14/2014. ["Limited to on-the-record proceedings in open court."](emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 05/15/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
            ORDER APPROVING REQUEST FOR MEDIA BLOGGING (Re: Associated Press ~ Jennifer Kelleher, Oskar Garcia, Audrey McAvoy, Cathy Bussewitz) - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/15/2014. ["all proceedings in open court on the record"] (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 05/15/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Regarding Plaintiff Michael F. Egan, III re 8 - by Michael F. Egan, III. (ATTACHMENT SEALED) (emt, ) (emt, ). (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO ACCEPT AND ALLOW FILING OF CERTIFICATE OF MERIT UNDER SEAL IN TRADITIONAL PAPER FORMAT re 6 - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 4/29/2014. "The certificate of merit is accepted by the Court, and the Clerk shall accept it for filing in a traditional paper format, and cause it to be put under seal. The certificate shall be maintained as confidential pending further order of this Court." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                  Summons Issued as to Gary Wayne Goddard. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                    Plaintiff's Ex Parte MOTION for Leave of Court to Accept and Allow Filing of Certificate of Merit Under Seal in Traditional Paper Format Mark F. Gallagher appearing for Plaintiff Michael F. Egan, III (Gallagher, Mark) Modified on 4/25/2014 (emt, ). (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                      Summons (Proposed) (Gallagher, Mark) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                        CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 1 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons AO398, # 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons AO 399)(ecs, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 7/21/2014 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements)(ecs, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry Please attach the Rule 16 Scheduling Order to the Initiating Document (Complaint/Notice of Removal). The Scheduling Order must be served with the Document. (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 14-00189 SOM-BMK on all further pleadings. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT Michael F. Egan, III against Gary Wayne Goddard ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1376907.), filed by Michael F. Egan, III. (Attachments: # 1 civil cover sheet)(Gallagher, Mark) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?