Continental Western Insurance Company v. The Federal Housing Finance Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Southern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-00042
District Judge Robert W. Pratt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 12:28 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Continental Western Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent J. Colatriano +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 vcolatriano@cooperkirk.com
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker Hagenow & Gustoff LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matt M Dummermuth +1 319 849 8390 +1 515 864 0963 mdummermuth@whgllp.com
Space Kendra Lou Mills Arnold +1 515 868 0215 +1 515 864 0963 karnold@whgllp.com
Space Matthew G Whitaker +1 515 284 5001 +8640 864 864 0035 mwhitaker@whgllp.com
v.
No Logo Melvin L. Watt, Defendant
No Logo The Department of the Treasury, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas David Zimpleman +1 202 514 3346 +1 202 616 8470 thomas.d.zimpleman@usdoj.gov
No Logo The Federal Housing Finance Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Block Bergman +1 202 942 5474 +1 202 942 5999 david_bergman@aporter.com
Space Howard N. Cayne, PHV +1 202 942 5858 +1 202 942 5999 howard.cayne@aporter.com
Space Asim Varma +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 asim_varma@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BELIN MCCORMICK, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen H. Locher +1 515 283 4610 +1 515 558 0610 shlocher@belinmccormick.com
Space Matthew C McDermott +1 515 283 4643 +1 515 558 0643 mmcdermott@belinmccormick.com
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 68 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 55 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot 24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 2/3/2015. (clw) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Notice - Other
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Notice - Other
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Notice - Other
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  All Parties in this case have consented to Video Recording of some or all proceedings in this case as part of the Cameras in Court Pilot Project. In-court proceedings will be video recorded. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2014 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor - Video Proceeding before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt. (sc) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TEXT ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 58 Motion to file overlength brief. Defendants shall have to and including December 5, 2014 to file a reply brief to the Motion to Dismiss. Defendant may file a reply brief not to exceed ten pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 11/19/2014. (af, ) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Notice - Cameras
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None File Overlength Brief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Setting Hearing on Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Response/Resistance to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Reply
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TEXT ORDER: ORDER concerning 50 order concerning supplemental briefs. To avoid confusion the time for any responsive brief permitted by the previous order 50 shall be filed no later than 10/30/2014. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d), LR 6, LR 7.g. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/20/2014. (kln) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 49 plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental brief exceeding page limits. The brief [49-1] should be linked to motions 23 24 as a supplemental response. Defendants shall have the time allowed by the local rules for a reply to file their responsive brief, limited to discussion of the Perry decision. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/20/2014.(kln) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None File Overlength Brief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Reply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Reply
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/30/2014, Entered: None Response/Resistance to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay this Action filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/29/2014.(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 9/2/2014 to change reply due date in conformance with order 44 (kln). (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 43 joint motion for leave to exceed page limitations and extension of time to file reply briefs. Plaintiff's response to the motions to dismiss shall not exceed 85 pages. Defendants' replies in support of the motions to dismiss shall be filed on or before 9/29/2014. Defendants' reply briefs in support of the motions to dismiss shall not exceed 25 pages each. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/14/2014. (kln) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Leave
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Compel
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re 39 Motion Hearing, held on July 10, 2014 before Judge Ross A. Walters. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelli Mulcahy, Telephone Number: (515)284-6219. Page No(s).: 1 - 39. Transcript may be viewed at court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through court reporter, Clerk's Office, or PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (Mulcahy, Kelli) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters: Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2014 re 31 MOTION to Compel Production of the Administrative Record and for Suspension of the Briefing Schedule and Discovery-Related Deadlines filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy.) (af, ) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  TEXT ORDER: ORDER Re-Setting Hearing on Motion 31 MOTION to Compel Production of the Administrative Record and for Suspension of the Briefing Schedule and Discovery-Related Deadlines : By agreement of the parties, Motion Hearing is re-set for 7/10/2014 at 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters AND by telephone conference call arranged by counsel for plaintiff. The Court may be reached at (515) 284-6217 for purposes of the hearing and the call will be transferred into the courtroom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 6/27/2014. (kln) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    TEXT ORDER: ORDER Setting Hearing on 31 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of the Administrative Record and for Suspension of the Briefing Schedule and Discovery-Related Deadlines : Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2014 at 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters by telephone conference call arranged by counsel for plaintiff. The Court may be reached at (515) 284-6217 for purposes of the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 6/20/2014. (kln) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      REPLY re 31 MOTION to Compel Production of the Administrative Record and for Suspension of the Briefing Schedule and Discovery-Related Deadlines filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. (sc) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 34 plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to expand the page limits. Plaintiff's reply brief attached to the motion shall be detached and linked as a reply to its motion to compel 31 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 6/2/2014. (kln) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File to Expand the Page Limits (Unopposed) by Continental Western Insurance Company.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 6/19/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of the Administrative Record and for Suspension of the Briefing Schedule and Discovery-Related Deadlines)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Asim Varma. Signed by Marjorie Krahn on 5/2/2014. (sc) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              TEX ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David B. Bergman. Signed by Marjorie Krahn on 5/2/2014. (sc) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Howard N. Cayne. Signed by Marjorie Krahn on 5/2/2014. (sc) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2315011 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by The Federal Housing Finance Agency, Melvin L. Watt.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (McDermott, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2315005 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by The Federal Housing Finance Agency, Melvin L. Watt.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (McDermott, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2314999 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by The Federal Housing Finance Agency, Melvin L. Watt.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (McDermott, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay this Action by The Department of the Treasury. Responses due by 5/16/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by The Federal Housing Finance Agency, Melvin L. Watt. Responses due by 5/16/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Errata B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Memorandum in Support)(McDermott, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 20 defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and for leave to exceed page limitations. Defendants shall have to and including 4/29/2014 to move or plead in response to the complaint. They may file briefs in support of motions to dismiss not to exceed 50 pages for the FHFA defendants and not to exceed 35 pages for Treasury. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 4/3/2014. (kln) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen H. Locher on behalf of The Federal Housing Finance Agency, Melvin L. Watt (Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, and for leave to exceed page limitations by The Federal Housing Finance Agency, Melvin L. Watt.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (McDermott, Matthew) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C McDermott on behalf of The Federal Housing Finance Agency, Melvin L. Watt (McDermott, Matthew) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 17 plaintiff's unopposed motion to amend proof of service. The proof of service is amended to include the proofs of service attached to the motion as exhibits 1-3. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 3/21/2014.(kln) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Unresisted MOTION to Amend/Correct 11 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, 10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, 12 Summons Returned Executed as to USA by Continental Western Insurance Company.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 4/7/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas David Zimpleman on behalf of The Department of the Treasury (Zimpleman, Thomas) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. McElvain on behalf of The Department of the Treasury (McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Western Insurance Company. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney General and US Attorney Summons Returned Executed)(Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Western Insurance Company. Melvin L Watts served on 2/6/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. (Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Western Insurance Company. The Federal Housing Finance Agency served on 2/6/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. (Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Western Insurance Company. The Department of the Treasury served on 2/6/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. (Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter A. Patterson. Signed by Marjorie Krahn on 2/6/2014. (sc) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David H. Thompson. Signed by Marjorie Krahn on 2/6/2014. (sc) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Vincent J. Colatriano. Signed by Marjorie Krahn on 2/6/2014. (sc) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Charles J. Cooper. Signed by Clerk Marjorie Krahn on 2/6/2014. (sc) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2241435 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Continental Western Insurance Company.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Attachments: # 1 CMECF Form)(Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2241432 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Continental Western Insurance Company.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Attachments: # 1 CMECF Form)(Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION to Compel Production of the Administrative Record and for Suspension of the Briefing Schedule and Discovery-Related Deadlines filed by The Federal Housing Finance Agency, Melvin L. Watt. Replies due by 6/2/2014.(Locher, Stephen) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2241428 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Continental Western Insurance Company.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Attachments: # 1 CMECF Form)(Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION to Compel Production of the Administrative Record and for Suspension of the Briefing Schedule and Discovery-Related Deadlines filed by The Department of the Treasury. Replies due by 6/2/2014.(McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2241425 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Continental Western Insurance Company.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Attachments: # 1 CMECF Form)(Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Production of the Administrative Record and for Suspension of the Briefing Schedule and Discovery-Related Deadlines by Continental Western Insurance Company.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-2241420., filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/5/2014. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/5/2014.(Whitaker, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 338 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?