MERCIER et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:12-cv-00920
District Judge Elaine D. Kaplan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2021 at 4:46 PM DT (2.9 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AUDRICIA BROOKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David Marvin Cook

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated David Marvin Cook +1 513 721 0444 dcook@econjustice.com
No Logo STEPHANIE MERCIER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David Marvin Cook

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marvin Cook +1 513 721 0444 dcook@econjustice.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ben Franklin Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelley Dawn Weger +1 202 616 1273 +1 202 514 8624 shelley.d.weger@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica R. Toplin +1 202 616 0382 +1 202 514 8624 Jessica.Toplin@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Paul Goodman +1 202 305 2087 +1 202 514 8624 michael.goodman@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 300 - Civilian Pay - Back Pay
  Entries (203) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/15/2021, Entered: None Response (Not to a motion)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/15/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/14/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Response (Not to a motion)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Status Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Memorandum
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Memorandum
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Memorandum
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Cancelling Deadline/Hearing
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Status Conference Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Status Conference Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Status Conference Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Assignment - ADR
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Referring Case to ADR
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None sur-reply
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Response (Not to a motion)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/3/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Filing Consent Forms and Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms and Declarations)(Cook, David) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification due by 11/30/2017. Defendant's Response due by 1/31/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 2/19/2018. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Regarding Briefing Schedule, filed by USA. (Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Take Deposition from Deborah Plageman MOTION for Discovery costs for deposition , filed by USA. (Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting-in-part 117 Motion to Take Deposition from Ms. Deborah Plageman ; denying 117 Motion for Discovery Costs. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 117 MOTION to Take Deposition from Deborah Plageman MOTION for Discovery costs for deposition , filed by All Plaintiffs.Reply due by 8/25/2017. (Cook, David) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Take Deposition from Deborah Plageman , MOTION for Discovery costs for deposition, filed by USA.Response due by 8/18/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Attachment C)(Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part 113 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 8/31/2017. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 113 MOTION for Extension of Time,until 8/18/17, to Complete Discovery (Class Certification) , filed by All Plaintiffs.Reply due by 8/3/2017. (Cook, David) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/25/2017 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time,until 8/18/17, to Complete Discovery (Class Certification), filed by USA.Response due by 7/31/2017.(Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Echols, Alexis) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Status Report due 7/14/2017. Discovery due by 7/17/2017. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. Modified on 7/19/2017 to add deadline (ar). (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Class Certification) , filed by USA. (Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Class Certification) , filed by All Plaintiffs.Reply due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cook, David) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Class Certification), filed by USA.Response due by 6/29/2017.(Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Party ("Opt-In") Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Paul Wenzlawsh)(Cook, David) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Robin McCauley, # 2 Keith Miller, # 3 Jamey Stephens, # 4 Linda Sulton, # 5 Beth Znaniecki)(Cook, David) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Karen Brabant, # 2 Angelo Carter, # 3 Deborah DenBleyker, # 4 Dean Evans, # 5 Belinda Ford, # 6 Carolyn Gartner, # 7 Cheryl Green, # 8 Precious Green, # 9 Leah Marcovitz, # 10 Rebecca McCasland)(Cook, David) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) notice due by 1/13/17; Identities of Defendant's 30(b)(6) witnesses disclosed by 1/20/17; Plaintiffs' motion for class certification due by 6/16/17. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Echols, Alexis) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 101 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2017. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/9/17 to File Status Report , filed by USA.Response due by 1/3/2017.(Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Party ("Opt-In") Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Sharon Rayball, # 2 Cathy Walker, # 3 Shelly Williams)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Pamela Becker Weilitz, # 2 Leslie White, # 3 Candice Whitlock, # 4 Barbara Whitmer, # 5 Cheryl Winston, # 6 William Zuber, # 7 Pamela Gardner-Davis, # 8 Linda Schiesl, # 9 Martha Newmyer)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Jackie Rust, # 2 Lori Rutherford, # 3 Sandra Shaw, # 4 Catherine Stuart, # 5 Rory Tedrick, # 6 Karen Van Embden, # 7 Deborah Vlam, # 8 Mary Walton, # 9 Mary Ward, # 10 Frances Wasserman)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 April Patterson, # 2 Donna Patts, # 3 Thomas Patts, # 4 William Patz, # 5 Tracey Perkins, # 6 Beverly Porter, # 7 Rosa Prouhet, # 8 Donna Richardson, # 9 Carmen Roaquin, # 10 Theresa Rucker)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 MaryAnn Martin, # 2 Mark McClung, # 3 Kevin McCoy, # 4 Joan McElhinney, # 5 Daniel McPartlin, # 6 Madona McPherson, # 7 Teresa Moore, # 8 Mary Muth, # 9 Pamela O'Toole, # 10 Saduman Ozturk)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 LaKeysha Jenkins, # 2 Susan Johnston, # 3 April Klutman, # 4 Allyn Kratzer, # 5 Malgorzata Kursa, # 6 Michael Langley, # 7 Jean Lee, # 8 Susan Lewis, # 9 Loy Long, # 10 Maryann Machuga)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Karin Hahn, # 2 Jayne Heath, # 3 Elaine Henson, # 4 Constance Hermreck, # 5 Tina Highlen, # 6 Dana Hogan, # 7 Cynthia Hollis, # 8 Brenda Hughes, # 9 Randy Hughston, # 10 Daniel Janssen)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Rebecca Epperly, # 2 Michael Erskine, # 3 Marjorie Ferguson, # 4 Mona Flanigan, # 5 Cathy Fonder, # 6 Alisa Garrett, # 7 Peggy Gerdes, # 8 Scott Gleim, # 9 Nancy Grass, # 10 Rachelle Gray)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Tommy Chang, # 2 Christina Clark, # 3 Kathleen Cobb, # 4 Ruth Corbett, # 5 Danny Cox, # 6 Anthony DeBonis, # 7 Lois Dickinson, # 8 Randall Dotts, # 9 Dorothy Dunn, # 10 Julie Eastman)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Tamim Alsaedi, # 2 Devin Bailey, # 3 Deborah Wentz Baker, # 4 Linda Baker, # 5 Nicholas Beaumonte, # 6 Linda Lou Beede, # 7 Stephanie Bixler, # 8 Steven Carter, # 9 Samra Cates, # 10 Ann Chang)(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2016. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until December 19, 2016 to File Joint Status Report , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 12/23/2016.(Cook, David) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2016. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until December 8, 2016 to File Joint Status Report , filed by USA.Response due by 11/28/2016.(Echols, Alexis) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Melissa Nixon, # 2 Toby Riedinger, # 3 Brenda Russell, # 4 Susan Smith, # 5 Renee Sullivan, # 6 Jane Walston, # 7 Kelly Watters, # 8 Myrene Wilson, # 9 Janine Woodburn, # 10 Margery Young)(Cook, David) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Cindy Jandron, # 2 Kelly Kazlo, # 3 Michael Kendall, # 4 Hazel Kimbrough, # 5 Bridget Kmetz, # 6 Joan Knox, # 7 Karen Kulp, # 8 Denise Leisure, # 9 Matthew Miller, # 10 Jon Monk)(Cook, David) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Jan Amundson, # 2 Judith Brooks, # 3 Margo Mae Burrows, # 4 Michelle Conti, # 5 Debra Corbin, # 6 Gerrie Evans, # 7 Cherisse Griffith-Burns, # 8 Janelle Harris, # 9 Jerry Haywald, # 10 Karen Jakala)(Cook, David) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **ENTERED IN ERROR** JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Echols, Alexis) Modified on 8/19/2016 to strike document; uploaded in wrong case (ar). (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2016. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , filed by USA.Response due by 8/26/2016.(Echols, Alexis) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Kelly Reese, # 2 Nancy Rodenberg, # 3 Denise Sweeney, # 4 Mark Van Over, # 5 Carolyn Verbanic, # 6 Ellen Veschio, # 7 Ruth Vogt, # 8 Kathleen Walter, # 9 Kristin Weaver, # 10 Suzanne Wolf)(Cook, David) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Sharon Garner, # 2 Kimberly Karnstedt, # 3 Peggy Keys, # 4 Lori Klingerman, # 5 Patricia Lawrence, # 6 Lisa Montore, # 7 Frances Moore, # 8 Valerie Parillo, # 9 Stephanie Pollard, # 10 Linda Ravetti)(Cook, David) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Stephanie Bangs, # 2 Marilyn Bell, # 3 Susan Bissette, # 4 Sharon Bringewatt, # 5 Karen Campbell, # 6 May Chu, # 7 Benilda Crouse-Smith, # 8 Michelle Dunne, # 9 Yvonne Eichler, # 10 Joseph Estrada)(Cook, David) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Arlette Stevens Castano, # 2 Gregory Stevenson, # 3 Thomas Talbot, # 4 Vangie Tran, # 5 Remeliza Tukay, # 6 Patricia Vasquez, # 7 Linh Vu, # 8 John Walker, # 9 Todd Welch, # 10 Shirley Zakaria)(Cook, David) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Guy Penn, # 2 Lanita Peterson Smith, # 3 La Chune Price, # 4 Cynthia Rasmussen, # 5 Denise Rowe, # 6 Shirley Saunders, # 7 Gary Schulte, # 8 Karen Sharrah, # 9 Greta Shaw, # 10 Paul Sinuk)(Cook, David) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Sheri Korlekar, # 2 Cindu Kunthara, # 3 Michael Langmead, # 4 Vanessa Lee, # 5 Anne Maltese, # 6 Wilma Mechsner, # 7 Maria Melichar, # 8 Juan Mendez, # 9 Haris Nguyen, # 10 Joanna Oberbroeckling)(Cook, David) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Karen Gialle, # 2 Patricia Griffith, # 3 Patricia Hall, # 4 Pamela Hamilton, # 5 Marie Hansen Henderson, # 6 Tina Hoover, # 7 Lisa Hsieh, # 8 Jeannette Iturrino, # 9 Loretta King, # 10 Teresa King)(Cook, David) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Lorna Cook, # 2 Lizel Craig, # 3 Mary Ann Crawford, # 4 Regina Deringer, # 5 Pamela Detrick, # 6 Robin Dobbs, # 7 April Elkins, # 8 Sandy First, # 9 Marianne Flesch, # 10 Lindsey Fraumeni)(Cook, David) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Frances Abad, # 2 Rosemary Alexander-Ledbetter, # 3 Gerry Bertish, # 4 Hazel Bluen, # 5 Roberta Bowdish, # 6 Colleen Ruth Broderick, # 7 Eve Broughton, # 8 Ruth Browne, # 9 Cheryl Buncio, # 10 Carolyn Cole)(Cook, David) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis J. Echols for USA . (Echols, Alexis) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Kim Price, # 2 Grace Punla, # 3 Trent Renfrow, # 4 Ramonda Rustige, # 5 Wanda Shewmon, # 6 Stephanie Simmons, # 7 Sharon Snover, # 8 Lisa Thompson, # 9 Patricia Willis, # 10 Jennifer Leake Wilde)(Cook, David) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Timothy Johnson, # 2 Elizabeth Kuo, # 3 Beth Ann Lane, # 4 Frank MacDonald, # 5 Stella Madu, # 6 Stephanie Mayo, # 7 Rosalinda Morales, # 8 John Edward Mullen, # 9 Kevin Murphy, # 10 Victoria Poppelaars)(Cook, David) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Bobbie Adams, # 2 Rosemary Bates, # 3 Martha Brooks, # 4 Scot Burroughs, # 5 Kathrine Clifton, # 6 Lisa Cole, # 7 Heather Davis, # 8 Stephanie Eason, # 9 Donna Edwards, # 10 Susan Freeman)(Cook, David) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 64 Joint Motion for Entry of Discovery Concerning Materials As to Which Privileges May be Asserted. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order for HIPAA Material, filed by USA.Response due by 5/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION Claw Back Order , filed by USA.Response due by 5/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 David Skelley, # 2 Lynn VanDame, # 3 Lisa Vitchayanonda, # 4 Suzanne Wallace, # 5 Ann Wiertel)(Cook, David) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Shirley Alleyne, # 2 Jennifer Allred, # 3 Mary Breslin, # 4 Jan DeMoisey, # 5 Jan Marie Fisher-Griffis, # 6 Sarah Harris, # 7 Mary Jo Imes, # 8 Sharon Mayne, # 9 Olivia Mgbeokwene, # 10 Matthew Sima)(Cook, David) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint , filed by USA.JPSR due by 2/1/2016. (Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER affirming the 59 Motion for Clarification. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due by 12/10/2015. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Clarification of 58 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer , filed by USA.Response due by 12/18/2015.(Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 12/3/2015. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/10/2015 to File Answer re 56 Amended Complaint , filed by USA.(Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by All Plaintiffs. .Answer due by 12/3/2015. (Cook, David) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: First Amended Complaint due 11/16/15; Initial Disclosures Due 12/7/15; Class Discovery due 8/15/2016; Motion for Class Certification due 9/14/16. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Florence Uzuegbunam, # 2 Timothy Van Mauldin, # 3 Jennie Vegard, # 4 Cathy Walker, # 5 Paul Wenzlawsh, # 6 Raquel West-Crisp, # 7 Robert Williams)(Cook, David) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Elizabeth Roach, # 2 Linda Royal, # 3 Jacqueline Rozier, # 4 Denise Sadowski-Leist, # 5 Kimberly Sammons, # 6 Mita Sass, # 7 Martin Sawyer, # 8 Dianne Schmidt-Ciminelli, # 9 Pamela Sykes, # 10 Daniel Totman)(Cook, David) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Donna Lewis, # 2 Sherry Maroni, # 3 Silvia Mathew, # 4 Pia May, # 5 Kathleen McClure, # 6 Magalie Metellus, # 7 Renee Minotti, # 8 Tonya Murray, # 9 Ann Paladin, # 10 Sharon Rayball)(Cook, David) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Angelique Guiteau-Laurent, # 2 Suzanne Hixson, # 3 Kathryn Horvath, # 4 Lisa Ibata, # 5 Phyllis Kazimer, # 6 Maureen Komperda, # 7 Mary Kortan, # 8 Jamie Kowalski, # 9 Melissa Kropf, # 10 Carla Leuschen)(Cook, David) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER Notice of Filing Consent Forms & Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Marie Essie Antoine, # 2 Neil Baron, # 3 Scott Campbell, # 4 Sharon Chandler, # 5 Mary Conklin, # 6 Ma Visimee Diaz-Caturan, # 7 Rick Forster, # 8 Shirley Fye, # 9 Janet Gavin, # 10 Michele Gavin)(Cook, David) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER, STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Report due by 10/15/2015. Status Conference set for 10/19/2015 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 28, 2013 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Total No. of Pages: 1-33. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. To order a copy of the proceeding (click HERE) Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2015. (ew) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on June 28, 2013 in Washington, D.C. (ew) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 12, 2013 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Total No. of Pages: 1-23. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. To order a copy of the proceeding (click HERE) Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2015. (ew) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on June 12, 2013 in Washington, D.C. (ew) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/6/2015 at 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 7, 2013 before Judge Edward J. Damich. Total No. of Pages: 1-36. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. To order a copy of the proceeding (click HERE) Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2015. (ew) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on June 7, 2013 in Washington, D.C. (ew) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT on further proceedings, filed by USA. (Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT , filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER. (Cook, David) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 35 Notice (Other), 34 Notice (Other), 36 Notice (Other), 37 Notice (Other) , filed by USA. (Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER Notice of Filing Consent Forms and Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Kathleen Vertino, # 2 Shelly Williams, # 3 Linda Zachary)(Cook, David) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER Notice of Filing Consent Forms and Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Lori Lynn Perkins, # 2 Deborah Plageman, # 3 Cynthia Potter, # 4 Barbara Prendes, # 5 Stacey Lea Ratigan, # 6 Susan Redovian, # 7 Keith Robinson, # 8 Janice Sensing, # 9 Bridget Shoulders, # 10 Sharon Vaden-Karn)(Cook, David) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER Notice of Filing Consent Forms and Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Sadie Hughes, # 2 Ruby Rose Hutchinson, # 3 Connie Kendall, # 4 Lisa King, # 5 Karen Leidy, # 6 Terry Lonczak, # 7 Phirin Lorth-Kennedy, # 8 Sandra Mabry, # 9 Mary Ellen Mannix-Cantillon, # 10 Linda Darlene Naron)(Cook, David) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER Notice of Filing Consent Forms and Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Nancy Denise Bartlett, # 2 Laura Leigh Britt, # 3 Jan Burdine, # 4 Lina Camagay-Montante, # 5 Michelle Clapham, # 6 Scott Dempsey, # 7 Helen Effron, # 8 Deborah Harris-Cobbinah, # 9 Kevin Hennessy, # 10 Marjorie Hill)(Cook, David) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER Joint Proposal due by 8/24/2015 Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (jh) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE of CAFC. Accordingly, USCAFC reverse in part the Court of Federal Claims dismissal of the nurses claim to overtime pay under 38 U.S.C. § 7453 and remand for further proceedings under the correct interpretation of that statute. (hw1) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/23/2015 at 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica R. Toplin for USA . (Toplin, Jessica) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Status Conference , filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER.Response due by 7/24/2015.(Cook, David) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Decision of the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. The attached opinion announcing the judgment of the court in your case was filed and judgment was entered on the date indicated above. The mandate will be issued in due course, approximately by 7/9/2015. (hw1) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Dawn Weger for USA . (Weger, Shelley) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 25 Judgment, 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6), Reported Opinion, filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 9998-2390647. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (Cook, David) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint. (Copy to parties) (dls) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORTED OPINION granting 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Oral Argument on Motion 13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) : Oral Argument set for 2/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom before Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Elaine D. Kaplan for all further proceedings. (ac7) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Elaine Kaplan. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ss5) Copy to parties. (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 19 Sur-Reply , filed by USA. (Goodman, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY re Order on Motion for Leave to File, , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cook, David) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss , filed by USA.Reply due by 9/9/2013. (Goodman, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss , filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER.Response due by 9/6/2013.(Cook, David) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) , filed by USA. (Goodman, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) , filed by AUDRICIA BROOKS, STEPHANIE MERCIER.Reply due by 8/15/2013. (Cook, David) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' response to 13 Defendant's motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before July 29, 2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) , filed by USA.Response due by 7/22/2013.(Goodman, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER, STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss on or before June 21, 2013; Status Conference, via telephone, set for June 28, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. (Eastern time). Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT . (Goodman, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint , filed by USA.JPSR due by 5/13/2013.(Goodman, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant shall file its answer to Plaintiffs' complaint, or otherwise show cause why its answer hasn't been filed, by March 25, 2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ADR declined at this time. Signed by Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ADR telephonic conference scheduled for 2/7/13. Signed by Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Goodman for USA. (Goodman, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Bohdan A.Futey for Auto ADR proceedings. (dls) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. (dls) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (VA) (Filing fee $350, Receipt number 074555) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by STEPHANIE MERCIER, AUDRICIA BROOKS. Answer due by 2/28/2013.(dls) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1,664 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?