Illinois State Rifle Association et al v. Grau et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-03064
District Judge Joan H. Lefkow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 9:21 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Illinois State Rifle Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith L Gibson +1 312 443 1840 +1 312 896 6738 kgibson@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Nicholas Howard +1 312 443 0333 +1 312 896 6433 whoward@lockelord.com
No Logo Steven Charles Thomas, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Chair, ICCLRB Robinzina Bryant, Defendant
No Logo G. Patrick Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Hiram Grau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sunil Shashikant Bhave +1 312 814 4450 sbhave@atg.state.il.us
No Logo James Cavanaugh, Defendant
No Logo John Chesley, Defendant
No Logo Member ICCLRB Virginia Wright, Defendant
No Logo Member, ICCLRB John Diwik, Defendant
No Logo Sergio Acosta, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Response to defendants' motion to dismiss 27 due by 7/22/2014; reply due by 8/5/2014; ruling will issue by mail. Motion is removed from the Court's call of 7/1/2014. Status hearing of 7/10/2014 is stricken.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Motion by Sunil Shashikant Bhave for presentment of motion to dismiss, 27 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 7/1/2014 at 11:00 AM. (Bhave, Sunil) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION by Defendants Hiram Grau, John Chesley, Sergio Acosta, James Cavanaugh, John Diwik, Robinzina Bryant, G. Patrick Murphy, Virginia Wright to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's state court complaint)(Bhave, Sunil) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Defendants' motion for extension of time to 6/25/2014 to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint 16 is granted. Motion is removed from the court's call of 6/5/2014 and will not be called in court. Status hearing is set for 7/10/2014 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association, Steven Charles Thomas by Peter A Patterson (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Motion of Charles Justin Cooper for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association and Steven Thomas 18 is granted. Motion of David Henry Thompson for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association and Steven Thomas 20 is granted. Motion of Peter Andrew Patterson for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association and Steven Thomas 21 is granted.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association, Steven Charles Thomas by David Henry Thompson (Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9528495. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association, Steven Charles Thomas by Charles J. Cooper (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9528364. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                          PAYMENT of Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9528257 on behalf of Charles J. Cooper (see entry 18 ). (Thompson, David) Docket Text Modified By Clerk's Office. (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Cooper, Charles) Docket Text Modified By Clerk's Office. (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Motion by Sunil Shashikant Bhave for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 16 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 6/5/2014 at 11:00 AM. (Bhave, Sunil) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                MOTION by Defendants Sergio Acosta, Robinzina Bryant, James Cavanaugh, John Chesley, John Diwik, Hiram Grau, G. Patrick Murphy, Virginia Wright for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 UNOPPOSED (Bhave, Sunil) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illinois State Rifle Association as to James Cavanaugh on 5/5/2014, answer due 5/26/2014. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Acosta, Robinzina Bryant, James Cavanaugh, John Chesley, John Diwik, Hiram Grau, G. Patrick Murphy, Virginia Wright by Sunil Shashikant Bhave (Bhave, Sunil) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Charles Thomas, Illinois State Rifle Association as to John Diwik on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Charles Thomas, Illinois State Rifle Association as to Sergio Acosta on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Charles Thomas, Illinois State Rifle Association as to Virginia Wright on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Charles Thomas, Illinois State Rifle Association as to Robinzina Bryant on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Charles Thomas, Illinois State Rifle Association as to G. Patrick Murphy on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Charles Thomas, Illinois State Rifle Association as to Hiram Grau on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Charles Thomas, Illinois State Rifle Association as to John Chesley on 4/30/2014, answer due 5/21/2014. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                    REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 400.00, receipt no. 25FGEUVB, (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association, Steven Charles Thomas by Keith L. Gibson (Gibson, Keith) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                        CIVIL Cover Sheet (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Illinois State Rifle Association (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association, Steven Charles Thomas by William Nicholas Howard (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                              COMPLAINT filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Steven Charles Thomas; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9432875. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Howard, William) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?