Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. D-Link Systems, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00512
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 7:02 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
v.
No Logo D-link Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF S. J. CHRISTINE YANG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria Der-Lung Hao , +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 vhao@sjclawpc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by S J Christine Yang Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Duncan Palmatier +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 dpalm@dpalmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant D-Link Systems are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/19/13. cc:attys 2-20-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by D-Link Systems, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
      ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to 2 Complaint by D-Link Systems, Inc..(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against D-Link Systems, Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant D-Link Systems, Inc from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Space Space

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 70 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?