Denis Sheils v. Pennsbury School District
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 14-2883

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2016 at 11:29 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3899 - Other Statutes
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011773671 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: AMBRO, CHAGARES and VANASKIE, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 7. Judge: VANASKIE Authoring. (TMM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011773683 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT, ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the order of the District Court entered May 28, 2014 be and the same is VACATED and this case is REMANDED for further proceedings. The stay issued by this court on June 24, 2014 shall remain in effect until the District Court enters an order deciding Appellant's petition for a preliminary injunction. Costs shall not be taxed in this matter.--[Edited 10/23/2014 by TMM] (TMM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011752902 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
      COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [13-3111, 13-2838, 14-1874, 13-4296, 14-2883, 13-2212, 13-2580, 13-4002, 13-4734] (CMH)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011724517 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
        Oral Argument Notification for Wednesday, 10/01/2014. (CMH)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011709183 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER (AMBRO, CHAGARES and VANASKIE, Circuit Judges) The foregoing Motion by Appellant for leave to supplement the record is denied, filed. Ambro, Authoring Judge. (EMA)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 003011707323 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
            ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Denis F. Sheils, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/13/2014 by US mail. (DFS)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011702563 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
              ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Pennsbury School District, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/08/2014 by US mail, ECF. (TCW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011689676 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellant Denis F. Sheils regarding the brief and appendix filed on 07/24/2014. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 07/28/2014. This Order does not change the deadline for filing the next brief. (EMA)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 003011689686 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                  ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix & Addendum attached on behalf of Appellant Denis F. Sheils, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/24/2014 by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all attachments]--[Edited 07/25/2014 by EMA] (DFS)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011688509 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                    ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Denis F. Sheils to supplement the record. Certificate of Service dated 07/24/2014. (DFS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011688569 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Denis F. Sheils, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/24/2014 by ECF. [Entry edited by Clerk's Office to reflect the correct event and Attorney directed to re-file brief with volume I separately]--[Edited 07/25/2014 by EMA] (DFS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011688868 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                        ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Denis F. Sheils, Esq. for Appellant Denis F. Sheils. Certificate of Service dated 07/24/2014. (DFS)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011688929 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                          ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Thomas C. Warner, Esq. for Appellee Pennsbury School District. Certificate of Service dated 07/24/2014. (TCW)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011686105 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                            Calendared for Wednesday, 10/01/14. (Rescheduled from Monday, 09/29/2014)--[Edited 09/02/2014 by CMH] (CMH)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011660767 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                              ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Denis F. Sheils, received. (DFS)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011659765 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Pro Se on behalf of Appellant(s) Denis F. Sheils, on behalf of himself and on behalf of minor child, M.D.S.. (DFS)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011659768 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                  ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Denis F. Sheils advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Lynn McCloskey. (DFS)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011659775 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                    ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Denis F. Sheils, filed. (DFS)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011659848 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER (AMBRO and CHAGARES, Circuit Judges) Motion for a stay of order is granted. The clerk is hereby directed to refer this case to a merits panel and the case shall be listed before the next available panel on an expedited basis, filed. Panel No.: BCO-088-E. Chagares, Authoring Judge. (TMM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011659882 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                        ORDER (Clerk) On 6/24/14, the Court entered an order granting Appellant's motion for stay and listing the case before the next available merits panel on an expedited basis. It is hereby ordered that the brief for Appellant and the joint appendix shall be filed on or before 7/24/14; It is further ordered that the brief for Appellee shall be filed and served within 21 days of the date of service of Appellant's brief; It is further ordered that the reply brief, if any, shall be filed and served within 7 days of the date of service of Appellee's brief. Motions for extensions of time to file briefs are strongly discouraged, filed. (TMM)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011658425 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                          ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan P. Riba on behalf of Appellee(s) Pennsbury School District. (JPR)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011658428 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                            ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Pennsbury School District, filed. (JPR)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011654457 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                              FOLLOW UP LETTER to Denis F. Sheils, Esq. requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/02/2014. Information Statement on or before 07/02/2014. Concise Summary on or before 07/02/2014. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 07/02/2014. (TMM)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011654465 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jonathan P. Riba, Esq. and Thomas C. Warner, Esq. for Pennsbury School District requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/02/2014. Disclosure Statement on or before 07/02/2014. (TMM)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011641353 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                  ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Pennsbury School District to Motion to Expedite, Motion stay request. Certificate of Service dated 06/06/2014. (JPR)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011639653 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                    ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL Supplemental Exhibit to Movant's Expedited Application Filed on June 2, 2014 filed by Appellant Denis F. Sheils. Certificate of Service dated 06/05/2014. (DFS)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011636084 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                      ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Denis F. Sheils to Expedite Motion to Stay, to stay Stay Administrative Order. Certificate of Service dated 06/02/2014. (DFS)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011635511 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                        CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Denis F. Sheils in District Court No. 2-14-cv-02736. (TMM)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?