Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Reasons for Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - EXIN |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SA.. |
|
Supplemental Response or Supplemental Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Supplemental Response
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SA.. |
|
Supplemental Response or Supplemental Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (9 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (10 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (9 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - AMSB |
|
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - RCEX |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner's Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (35 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (29 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner's Amendment Communication
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - INTRVIEW.APP |
|
Applicant summary of interview with examiner (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - EXIN |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
New or Additional Drawing Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (30 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (17 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (31 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (7 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (25 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (51 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (7 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (28 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (9 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (19 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (41 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (56 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (65 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (33 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (39 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (25 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (37 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (15 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (19 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - R3.73B |
|
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (29 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - R3.73B |
|
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statements
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ARTIFACT |
|
Artifact sheet indicating an item has been filed which cannot be scanned (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (13 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (16 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for immediate examination under 35 U.S.C. 371(f)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of the International Application
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (69 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (57 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (68 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (68 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (59 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (52 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (46 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (25 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (33 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |