Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None |
1 - COCOUT |
|
Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail-Record a Petition Decision of Granted for Patent Term Adjustment after Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PET.DEC.COCI |
|
Petition Decision routed to Certificate of Correction (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Record a Petition Decision of Granted for Patent Term Adjustment after Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Adjustment of PTA Calculation by PTO
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None |
1 - COCOUT |
|
Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered for C of C
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - COCIN |
|
Request for Certificate of Correction (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - COCIN |
|
Request for Certificate of Correction (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None |
1 - COCOUT |
|
Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Entered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PET.PTA |
|
Patent Term Adjustment Petition (26 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None |
1 - COCOUT |
|
Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Decision - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PETDEC |
|
Petition Decision (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Entered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - COCIN |
|
Request for Certificate of Correction (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PET.PTA |
|
Patent Term Adjustment Petition (26 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Printer Rush- No mailing
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Applicant Has Filed a Verified Statement of Small Entity Status in Compliance with 37 CFR 1.27
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.NA |
|
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Pubs Case Remand to TC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner's Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ANE.I |
|
Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (17 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - EXIN |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner's Amendment Communication
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CFILE |
|
Request for Corrected Filing Receipt (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/24/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (262 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (178 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (316 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (297 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (362 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (79 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (68 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |