Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Pay Issue Fee
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABN |
|
Abandonment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Abandonment for Failure to Pay Issue Fee
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/2/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Decision - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PET.DEC.TC |
|
Petition decision routed to the Technology Center to act on the decision or continue prosecution (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Entered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PET.SPRE |
|
Petition for review by the Technology Center SPRE. (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.A.NONCPL |
|
Notice to the applicant regarding a non-compliant or non-responsive amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.A.NONCPL |
|
Notice to the applicant regarding a non-compliant or non-responsive amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment after Examiner Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (36 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Return from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Return TO OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Return from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Return TO OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (36 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (24 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (44 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (26 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (24 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (33 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (17 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (22 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (20 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (24 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (63 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (42 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (32 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (19 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (30 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |