Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sequence Moved to Public Database
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sequence Forwarded to Pubs on Tape
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner's Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (11 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - EXIN |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner's Amendment Communication
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CFILE |
|
Request for Corrected Filing Receipt (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Is Good Technically / Entered into Database
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CRFE |
|
CRF entered - partial listing printed by STIC (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statements
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendments
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A set of symbols and procedures, provided to the PTO on a set of computer listings, that describe in
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Disk Has Been Received by Preexam / Group / PCT
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ARTIFACT |
|
Artifact sheet indicating an item has been filed which cannot be scanned (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/4/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (58 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (17 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (38 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (6 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (98 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (17 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (38 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |