Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABN |
|
Abandonment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (14 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (9 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (8 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/2/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (87 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - STATUS.LET |
|
Request for status of Application (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statements
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (37 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (57 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (41 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (56 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (55 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (39 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Is Good Technically / Entered into Database
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CRFE |
|
CRF entered - partial listing printed by STIC (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of the International Application
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Translation of the international application into English
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Disk Has Been Received by Preexam / Group / PCT
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (21 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (34 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (34 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |