Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - RCEX |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ANE.I |
|
Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTAV |
|
Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Amendment after Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - AMSB |
|
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Transfer Inquiry to GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for immediate examination under 35 U.S.C. 371(f)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (21 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (21 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (17 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (17 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |