Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail PUB other miscellaneous communication to applicant
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M327 |
|
Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PUB Other miscellaneous communication to applicant
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - EXIN |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (24 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (28 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (23 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (20 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (20 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (15 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (17 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (14 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (26 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (21 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (49 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Oath or Declaration Filed (Including Supplemental)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - R3.73B |
|
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (44 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (15 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (43 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (16 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (43 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |