Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reasons for Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner's Amendment Communication
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (68 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.A.NONCPL |
|
Notice to the applicant regarding a non-compliant or non-responsive amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment after Examiner Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.NE |
|
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - RCEX |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (31 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Amendment after Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.NE |
|
Amendment After Final (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (68 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Decision - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PET.DEC.TC |
|
Petition decision routed to the Technology Center to act on the decision or continue prosecution (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PET.OP |
|
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Entered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PET.OP |
|
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail-Petition Decision - Dismissed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Decision - Dismissed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PETDEC |
|
Petition Decision (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Substitute Specification Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
New or Additional Drawing Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (50 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (50 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Entered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PET.OP |
|
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
New or Additional Drawing Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statements
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (5 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (99 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (28 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFN |
|
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (78 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (55 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (15 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (16 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (56 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |