Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Response to 312 Amendment (PTO-271)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N271 |
|
Response to Amendment under Rule 312 (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Amendment under Rule 312
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.NA |
|
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail PUB other miscellaneous communication to applicant
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M327 |
|
Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PUB Other miscellaneous communication to applicant
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner's Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner's Amendment Communication
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Ex Parte Quayle Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Ex Parte Quayle Action (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTEQ |
|
Ex Parte Quayle Action (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Quayle action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Substitute Specification Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (49 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (49 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Compliant Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Compliant Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.A.NONCPL |
|
Notice to the applicant regarding a non-compliant or non-responsive amendment (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CFILE |
|
Request for Corrected Filing Receipt (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/21/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for immediate examination under 35 U.S.C. 371(f)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statements
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (118 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (100 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of Annexes to the International Preliminary Examination Report
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of the International Preliminary Examination Report
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of the International Application
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (74 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (15 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (53 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (75 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (74 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM.NE |
|
Claim-Amendment Not Entered (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.I. |
|
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (15 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (53 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |