Filter Assembly

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10582030
Examiner Thomas M Lithgow, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Thomas M Lithgow
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Chapman, Raymond G., Applicant

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alton L. Absher +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 aabsher@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Scott Adams +1 206 757 8002
Space Philip Albert +1 415 576 0200
Space John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Kenneth Allen +1 650 326 2400
Space Amr O Aly +1 212 775 8765 +1 212 775 8818 aaly@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Houtan Amanat +1 925 472 5000
Space David Annis +1 415 576 0200
Space Randolph Ted Apple +1 650 326 1431
Space Robert Artuz +1 650 326 2400
Space Thomas Auchterlonie +1 703 969 8228
Space Mark Barrish +1 650 326 2400
Space Girish Basarkar +1 650 326 2400
Space Kevin Bastian +1 415 576 0200
Space Akarsh P Belagodu +1 404 815 6003 +1 404 541 3385 abelagodu@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Jesse Bennett +1 206 467 9600
Space James Bergstrom +1 303 571 4000
Space Eugene Bernard +1 303 571 4000
Space Michael Bertelson 1 +1 +1 +1
Space Jennifer Blackburn +1 404 815 6500
Space Vanessa Blake +1 404 815 5912
Space Landin Boring +1 415 576 0200
Space David Boyd +1 303 571 4000
Space Juliene Britt +1 858 350 6100
Space Kyle Brown +1 858 350 6100
Space Theodore Brown +1 650 326 2400
Space Megan Bussey +1 404 815 6003
Space Charles Calkins +1 336 607 7300
Space Nathan Cassell +1 303 571 4000
Space Deborah Caswell +1 650 474 8400
Space Kelvin Catmull +1 650 326 2400
Space KO-FANG CHANG +1 650 326 2400
Space Wendy Choi +1 404 815 6500
Space Robert Colwell +1 650 324 6303
Space Roger Cook +1 415 576 0200
Space Martin II Cosenza +1 703 535 7341
Space Kristin Mallatt Crall +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 kcrall@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Cathy Cretsinger +1 415 576 0200
Space Robert J. Curylo +1 404 815 6583
Space Robert Dailey +1 202 508 5800
Space William Daley +1 303 571 4000
Space Michael Dimino +1 202 665 3544
Space Richard Dodson +1 206 467 9600
Space Kristin Doyle +1 404 815 6389
Space Christopher M Durkee +1 404 745 2537 cdurkee@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Ernest Ellenberger +1 650 326 2400
Space Hugo Eng +1 650 416 5029
Space Justin Eurek +1 650 326 2400
Space James Lindsay Ewing, IV +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 jewing@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Matias Ferrario +1 336 607 7300
Space Lisa Flanagan +1 925 472 5000
Space Bryan Foster +1 336 607 7363
Space Thomas Franklin +1 303 571 4000
Space Chuan Gao +1 415 576 0200
Space Jason Gardner +1 404 815 6500
Space John Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500
Space Euginia Garrett-Wackowski +1 925 472 5000
Space Katherine Gaudry +1 785 656 2265
Space Geoffrey Gavin +1 404 815 6500
Space Tyler Gee +1 415 547 0200
Space Faryar Ghazanfari +1 415 576 0200
Space Darin Gibby +1 303 571 4000
Space Donald Gibson +1 925 989 1165
Space Jennifer Giordano-Coltart +1 336 607 7300
Space James II Golladay +1 202 481 9900
Space Leslie Grab +1 336 607 7300
Space Jamie L. Graham +1 404 815 6500
Space Bonnie Grant +1 404 815 6500
Space Charles Gray +1 303 571 4000
Space Gerald Gray +1 925 482 0100
Space Donna Gressler +1 415 576 0200
Space David Hall +1 858 350 6100
Space Joe Hao +1 925 472 5000
Space Tywanda L. Harris Lord +1 404 745 2597 TLord@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Catherine Hart +1 404 815 6938
Space Paul Haughey +1 415 273 4787
Space M Heines +1 415 576 0200
Space Mymy Henderson +1 650 326 2400
Space Claudia Hetzer-Egger +1 858 350 3869
Space Matthew Hinsch +1 415 576 0200
Space Aaron Hokamura +1 415 576 0200
Space David Holloway +1 202 815 6500
Space Brenda Holmes +1 404 815 6500
Space Benjamin Holt +1 925 472 5000
Space Mark Hopkins +1 925 472 5000
Space James Howard +1 336 607 7300
Space Hain-Whei Hsueh +1 415 273 7548
Space Eric M. Hutchins +1 650 326 2400 +1 650 326 2422 emhutchins@townsend.com
Space Roger Hylton +1 650 326 2400
Space Kenneth Jenkins +1 858 350 6100
Space Philip Jensen +1 650 833 2119
Space Stephen Jewett +1 303 405 8531
Space Patrick Jewik +1 415 576 0200
Space Athena Johns +1 415 576 0200
Space Carol Johns +1 415 273 7567
Space Eugene B. Joswick +1 404 815 6626 +1 404 815 6555 ejoswick@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Vaibhav Kadaba +1 404 815 6500
Space DAH-BIN KAO +1 650 424 9325
Space Rajit Kapur +1 202 824 3000
Space Adil Karrar +1 650 326 2400
Space William Kezer +1 925 472 5000
Space Steven Koerber +1 858 350 6100
Space Russell Korn +1 404 815 6500
Space George Korsh +1 650 326 2400
Space Sujit Kotwal +1 650 326 2400
Space Babak Kusha +1 925 472 5006
Space Christopher Kuyper +1 206 467 9600
Space Jordan Kwan +1 510 693 9799
Space Patrick Lafferty +1 202 508 5800
Space William Lambert +1 650 849 6765
Space William Lane +1 919 420 1794
Space Craig Largent +1 650 326 2400
Space Joshua Lee +1 404 815 6500
Space JAMES JASON LINK +1 336 607 7443 +1 336 734 2622 jlink@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Jonathan Link +1 202 637 2243
Space Rong Liu +1 925 817 3121
Space Jean M. Lockyer,. +1 415 576 0200
Space Brad Loos +1 650 324 6369
Space Shane Lunceford +1 408 754 1459
Space Mark Mathison +1 925 472 5000
Space Daniel McCormick +1 303 571 4000
Space Megan McCoy +1 415 273 4757
Space John McDonald +1 404 815 6500
Space John McGroarty +1 202 371 2600
Space Mark McMaster +1 206 467 9600
Space Scott McMillan +1 303 571 4000 +1 303 571 4321 slmcmillan@townsend.com
Space RICHARD S. MEYER +1 202 739 3000
Space Alan Minsk +1 206 223 7000
Space Michael Morlock +1 336 607 7300
Space Francis Mycroft +1 925 472 5000
Space Anson Nomura +1 858 350 6100
Space Shayne O'Reilly +1 336 253 6560
Space Andrew Oliver +1 216 696 8730
Space Todd Ostomel +1 805 472 5000
Space Raquel Pacheco +1 415 576 0200 +1 415 576 0300 rpacheco@townsend.com
Space Sean Parmenter +1 925 472 5000
Space Michael Pavento +1 404 815 6213
Space Rebecca Peterson +1 925 472 5000
Space Jon Pierce +1 336 607 7503
Space Elena Polovnikova +1 404 815 6500
Space N.. Powell +1 336 607 7300
Space John S Pratt +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 541 3348 jpratt@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space David Raczkowski +1 415 576 0200
Space Kristopher Reed +1 303 571 4000
Space BRADLEY RIEL +1 650 462 5329
Space LARRY ROBERTS +1 404 815 6500
Space Matthew Rojanakiathavorn +1 510 396 0584
Space Michael T. Rosato +1 206 467 9600
Space Cynthia Rothschild +1 336 607 7300
Space Dean Russell +1 404 815 6500
Space Karam Saab +1 303 571 4000
Space Donna Sai +1 310 542 7520
Space Carl Sanders +1 336 607 7300
Space Jason Sanders +1 303 571 4000
Space Babak Sani +1 415 576 0200
Space Barmak Sani +1 650 326 2400
Space Matthew Sarles +1 303 571 4000
Space J. Michael Schiff +1 650 324 6340
Space Johann Seka +1 415 576 0200
Space William Shaffer +1 650 326 2400
Space Kenneth Shurtz +1 650 326 2400
Space DAVID SLONE +1 650 324 6305
Space JOSEPH SNYDER +1 415 472 5000
Space Susan Spaeth +1 650 326 2400
Space Jessica Stahnke 1 +1 +1 +1
Space Mitchell Stockwell +1 404 815 6500
Space Ryan Sydenham +1 650 326 2400
Space ARDESHIR TABIBI +1 650 326 2400
Space Alexander Trimble +1 415 576 0200
Space Michael Turton +1 404 815 6500
Space Paul Vapnek +1 415 576 0200
Space Michael Verga +1 202 508 5800
Space Kathryn Wade +1 404 815 6500
Space Renae Bailey Wainwright +1 404 532 6947 rwainwright@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Kenneth Weber +1 415 273 4714
Space Clark Weight +1 303 571 4000
Space Camilla Williams +1 404 815 6500
Space Tiffany Williams +1 404 815 6500
Space Christopher Willink +1 415 576 0200
Space Alyson Wooten +1 404 815 6500
Space Roger Wylie +1 206 467 9600
Space Hal Yeager +1 415 576 0200
Space LU YIN +1 650 752 2436
Space Daniel Young +1 303 571 4000
Space John Zigmant,. +1 415 576 0200
Space Eric Zylstra +1 925 472 5000
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Chapman, Raymond G., Killara (AU)
Filing Date March 29, 2007
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 082975-000000US
Confirmation Number 1446
Group Art Unit 1797
Class / Sub-Class 210 / 234
Timeline
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Assignments (1) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF
Issue Notification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Document Verification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
PG-Pub Issue Notification
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - NTC.PUB
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/11/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - M903
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Sent to Classification Contractor
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement considered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
New or Additional Drawing Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
371 Completion Date
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Additional Application Filing Fees
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statements
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (15 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - A.PE
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - M905
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/9/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Cleared by OIPE CSR
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FRPR
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ADS
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A.PE
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 136A
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 191 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?