Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Response to 312 Amendment (PTO-271)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N271 |
|
Response to Amendment under Rule 312 (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ANE.I |
|
Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Amendment under Rule 312
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.NA |
|
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - R3.73B |
|
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - C.AD |
|
Change of Address (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Decision Made by Classification Division
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Classification Division Decision
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Transfer Inquiry to GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Compliant Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.A.NONCPL |
|
Notice to the applicant regarding a non-compliant or non-responsive amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Compliant Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Filing Receipt
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - STATUS.LET |
|
Request for status of Application (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (10 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (32 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Oath or Declaration Filed (Including Supplemental)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM.NE |
|
Claim-Amendment Not Entered (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (49 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (43 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (24 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (51 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (71 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (44 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (25 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (52 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (72 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |