Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reasons for Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Telephonic restriction
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (31 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - AMSB |
|
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - RCEX |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (34 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (18 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (84 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/14/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (5 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (15 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (22 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Transfer Inquiry to GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (21 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (56 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - P.PAMPHLET |
|
WIPO Publication - Non-English version (100 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (99 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (18 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (22 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (67 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |