Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N570 |
|
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - R3.73B |
|
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of the International Preliminary Examination Report
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (41 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (15 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (24 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (26 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |