Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABN |
|
Abandonment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (362 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Filing Receipt
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Is Good Technically / Entered into Database
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CRFE |
|
CRF entered - partial listing printed by STIC (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Disk Has Been Received by Preexam / Group / PCT
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SEQ.TXT |
|
Sequence Listing (Text File) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Defective Response Mailed.
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CRFD |
|
Computer Readable Form (CRF) for Sequence Listing - Defective (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371.RES.DEF |
|
371 Defective Response - Form M916 (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Is Flawed Technically / Not Entered into Database
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SEQ.TXT |
|
Sequence Listing (Text File) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Is Flawed Technically / Not Entered into Database
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CRFD |
|
Computer Readable Form (CRF) for Sequence Listing - Defective (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
New or Additional Drawing Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendments
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of references cited in International Search Report
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Disk Has Been Received by Preexam / Group / PCT
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SEQ.TXT |
|
Sequence Listing (Text File) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CRFD |
|
Computer Readable Form (CRF) for Sequence Listing - Defective (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - AF/D |
|
Rule 130, 131 or 132 Affidavits (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFN |
|
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (5 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (7 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (9 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (6 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (6 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (16 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (80 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (126 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (112 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (33 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (20 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Is Flawed Technically / Not Entered into Database
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CRFD |
|
Computer Readable Form (CRF) for Sequence Listing - Defective (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of the International Preliminary Examination Report
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
CRF Disk Has Been Received by Preexam / Group / PCT
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - P.210.IN |
|
Incoming ISR, 237 and References from IB (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CRFS |
|
CRF Statement Paper and CRF are the same (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
1 - SEQLIST |
|
Sequence Listing (20 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (39 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |