Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABN |
|
Abandonment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (14 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (162 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (15 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (20 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Substitute Specification Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (7 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Transfer Inquiry to GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CFILE |
|
Request for Corrected Filing Receipt (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - STATUS.LET |
|
Request for status of Application (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (43 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (57 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (56 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |