Compositions Useful As Fabric Softeners

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10589839
Examiner John R Hardee, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner John R Hardee
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Moore, John W., Applicant
Officer/Director, Sprague Resources LP

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alton L. Absher +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 aabsher@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Scott Adams +1 206 757 8002
Space Philip Albert +1 415 576 0200
Space John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Kenneth Allen +1 650 326 2400
Space Amr O Aly +1 212 775 8765 +1 212 775 8818 aaly@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Houtan Amanat +1 925 472 5000
Space David Annis +1 415 576 0200
Space Randolph Ted Apple +1 650 326 1431
Space Robert Artuz +1 650 326 2400
Space Thomas Auchterlonie +1 703 969 8228
Space Mark Barrish +1 650 326 2400
Space Girish Basarkar +1 650 326 2400
Space Kevin Bastian +1 415 576 0200
Space Akarsh P Belagodu +1 404 815 6003 +1 404 541 3385 abelagodu@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Jesse Bennett +1 206 467 9600
Space James Bergstrom +1 303 571 4000
Space Eugene Bernard +1 303 571 4000
Space Michael Bertelson 1 +1 +1 +1
Space Jennifer Blackburn +1 404 815 6500
Space Vanessa Blake +1 404 815 5912
Space Landin Boring +1 415 576 0200
Space David Boyd +1 303 571 4000
Space Juliene Britt +1 858 350 6100
Space Kyle Brown +1 858 350 6100
Space Theodore Brown +1 650 326 2400
Space Megan Bussey +1 404 815 6003
Space Charles Calkins +1 336 607 7300
Space Nathan Cassell +1 303 571 4000
Space Deborah Caswell +1 650 474 8400
Space Kelvin Catmull +1 650 326 2400
Space KO-FANG CHANG +1 650 326 2400
Space Wendy Choi +1 404 815 6500
Space Robert Colwell +1 650 324 6303
Space Roger Cook +1 415 576 0200
Space Martin II Cosenza +1 703 535 7341
Space Kristin Mallatt Crall +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 kcrall@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Cathy Cretsinger +1 415 576 0200
Space Robert J. Curylo +1 404 815 6583
Space Robert Dailey +1 202 508 5800
Space William Daley +1 303 571 4000
Space Michael Dimino +1 202 665 3544
Space Kristin Doyle +1 404 815 6389
Space Christopher M Durkee +1 404 745 2537 cdurkee@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Ernest Ellenberger +1 650 326 2400
Space Hugo Eng +1 650 416 5029
Space Justin Eurek +1 650 326 2400
Space James Lindsay Ewing, IV +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 jewing@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Matias Ferrario +1 336 607 7300
Space Lisa Flanagan +1 925 472 5000
Space Bryan Foster +1 336 607 7363
Space Thomas Franklin +1 303 571 4000
Space Chuan Gao +1 415 576 0200
Space Jason Gardner +1 404 815 6500
Space John Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500
Space Euginia Garrett-Wackowski +1 925 472 5000
Space Katherine Gaudry +1 785 656 2265
Space Geoffrey Gavin +1 404 815 6500
Space Tyler Gee +1 415 547 0200
Space Faryar Ghazanfari +1 415 576 0200
Space Darin Gibby +1 303 571 4000
Space Jennifer Giordano-Coltart +1 336 607 7300
Space James II Golladay +1 202 481 9900
Space Leslie Grab +1 336 607 7300
Space Jamie L. Graham +1 404 815 6500
Space Bonnie Grant +1 404 815 6500
Space Charles Gray +1 303 571 4000
Space Gerald Gray +1 925 482 0100
Space Donna Gressler +1 415 576 0200
Space David Hall +1 858 350 6100
Space Joe Hao +1 925 472 5000
Space Tywanda L. Harris Lord +1 404 745 2597 TLord@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Catherine Hart +1 404 815 6938
Space Paul Haughey +1 415 273 4787
Space M Heines +1 415 576 0200
Space Mymy Henderson +1 650 326 2400
Space Claudia Hetzer-Egger +1 858 350 3869
Space Matthew Hinsch +1 415 576 0200
Space Aaron Hokamura +1 415 576 0200
Space Brenda Holmes +1 404 815 6500
Space Benjamin Holt +1 925 472 5000
Space Mark Hopkins +1 925 472 5000
Space James Howard +1 336 607 7300
Space Hain-Whei Hsueh +1 415 273 7548
Space Eric M. Hutchins +1 650 326 2400 +1 650 326 2422 emhutchins@townsend.com
Space Roger Hylton +1 650 326 2400
Space Kenneth Jenkins +1 858 350 6100
Space Philip Jensen +1 650 833 2119
Space Stephen Jewett +1 303 405 8531
Space Patrick Jewik +1 415 576 0200
Space Athena Johns +1 415 576 0200
Space Carol Johns +1 415 273 7567
Space Eugene B. Joswick +1 404 815 6626 +1 404 815 6555 ejoswick@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Vaibhav Kadaba +1 404 815 6500
Space Rajit Kapur +1 202 824 3000
Space Adil Karrar +1 650 326 2400
Space William Kezer +1 925 472 5000
Space Steven Koerber +1 858 350 6100
Space George Korsh +1 650 326 2400
Space Sujit Kotwal +1 650 326 2400
Space Babak Kusha +1 925 472 5006
Space Christopher Kuyper +1 206 467 9600
Space Jordan Kwan +1 510 693 9799
Space Patrick Lafferty +1 202 508 5800
Space William Lambert +1 650 849 6765
Space William Lane +1 919 420 1794
Space Craig Largent +1 650 326 2400
Space Joshua Lee +1 404 815 6500
Space JAMES JASON LINK +1 336 607 7443 +1 336 734 2622 jlink@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Jonathan Link +1 202 637 2243
Space Rong Liu +1 925 817 3121
Space Jean M. Lockyer,. +1 415 576 0200
Space Brad Loos +1 650 324 6369
Space Shane Lunceford +1 408 754 1459
Space Mark Mathison +1 925 472 5000
Space Daniel McCormick +1 303 571 4000
Space Megan McCoy +1 415 273 4757
Space John McDonald +1 404 815 6500
Space John McGroarty +1 202 371 2600
Space Mark McMaster +1 206 467 9600
Space Scott McMillan +1 303 571 4000 +1 303 571 4321 slmcmillan@townsend.com
Space RICHARD S. MEYER +1 202 739 3000
Space Alan Minsk +1 206 223 7000
Space Michael Morlock +1 336 607 7300
Space Francis Mycroft +1 925 472 5000
Space Christian Nicholes +1 408 414 1224
Space Anson Nomura +1 858 350 6100
Space Shayne O'Reilly +1 336 253 6560
Space Andrew Oliver +1 216 696 8730
Space Todd Ostomel +1 805 472 5000
Space Raquel Pacheco +1 415 576 0200 +1 415 576 0300 rpacheco@townsend.com
Space Sean Parmenter +1 925 472 5000
Space Michael Pavento +1 404 815 6213
Space Rebecca Peterson +1 925 472 5000
Space Jon Pierce +1 336 607 7503
Space Elena Polovnikova +1 404 815 6500
Space N.. Powell +1 336 607 7300
Space John S Pratt +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 541 3348 jpratt@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space David Raczkowski +1 415 576 0200
Space Kristopher Reed +1 303 571 4000
Space BRADLEY RIEL +1 650 462 5329
Space LARRY ROBERTS +1 404 815 6500
Space Matthew Rojanakiathavorn +1 510 396 0584
Space Michael T. Rosato +1 206 467 9600
Space Cynthia Rothschild +1 336 607 7300
Space Dean Russell +1 404 815 6500
Space Karam Saab +1 303 571 4000
Space Donna Sai +1 310 542 7520
Space Carl Sanders +1 336 607 7300
Space Jason Sanders +1 303 571 4000
Space Babak Sani +1 415 576 0200
Space Barmak Sani +1 650 326 2400
Space Matthew Sarles +1 303 571 4000
Space Christopher P. Schaffer +1 760 728 6068
Space J. Michael Schiff +1 650 324 6340
Space Johann Seka +1 415 576 0200
Space William Shaffer +1 650 326 2400
Space Kenneth Shurtz +1 650 326 2400
Space DAVID SLONE +1 650 324 6305
Space JOSEPH SNYDER +1 415 472 5000
Space Susan Spaeth +1 650 326 2400
Space Jessica Stahnke 1 +1 +1 +1
Space Mitchell Stockwell +1 404 815 6500
Space Ryan Sydenham +1 650 326 2400
Space ARDESHIR TABIBI +1 650 326 2400
Space Alexander Trimble +1 415 576 0200
Space Michael Turton +1 404 815 6500
Space Paul Vapnek +1 415 576 0200
Space Michael Verga +1 202 508 5800
Space Kathryn Wade +1 404 815 6500
Space Renae Bailey Wainwright +1 404 532 6947 rwainwright@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Kenneth Weber +1 415 273 4714
Space Clark Weight +1 303 571 4000
Space Camilla Williams +1 404 815 6500
Space Tiffany Williams +1 404 815 6500
Space Christopher Willink +1 415 576 0200
Space Alyson Wooten +1 404 815 6500
Space Roger Wylie +1 206 467 9600
Space Hal Yeager +1 415 576 0200
Space LU YIN +1 650 752 2436
Space Daniel Young +1 303 571 4000
Space John Zigmant,. +1 415 576 0200
Space Eric Zylstra +1 925 472 5000
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Moore, John W., Wilmington, DE (US)
Filing Date August 17, 2006
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number OPTI-0125
Confirmation Number 2804
Group Art Unit 1796
Class / Sub-Class 510 / 466
Timeline
  Entries (136) Tab Overlap Assignments (6) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - C.AD
Change of Address (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - R3.73B
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF
Issue Notification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Document Verification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Ex Parte Quayle Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - INTRVIEW.APP
Applicant summary of interview with examiner (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Ex Parte Quayle Action (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (75 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - CTEQ
Ex Parte Quayle Action (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Quayle action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - ELC.
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Restriction Requirement
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - CTRS
Requirement for Restriction/Election (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Restriction/Election Requirement
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Flagged for 5/25
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
PG-Pub Issue Notification
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - NTC.PUB
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement considered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (18 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (11 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (20 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (40 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - M903
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Record Petition Decision of Granted to Make Special
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Cleared by OIPE CSR
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.OP
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.SPRE
Petition for review by the Technology Center SPRE. (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - M903
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
371 Completion Date
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FRPR
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (38 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FRPR
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (38 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - P.ART19.STMT
Copy/Translation of Stmnt. Under PCT Article 19 (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (31 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ADS
Application Data Sheet (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A.PE
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (31 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 167 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?