Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABN |
|
Abandonment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/6/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/11/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of the International Search Report
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFN |
|
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (44 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (30 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (22 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (21 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (17 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |