Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - C.AD |
|
Change of Address (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC.NE |
|
Specification-Amendment Not Entered (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OA.APPENDIX |
|
Office Action Appendix (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
New or Additional Drawing Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.A.NONCPL |
|
Notice to the applicant regarding a non-compliant or non-responsive amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment after Examiner Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW.NE |
|
Drawings - Amendment Not Entered (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (18 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.I. |
|
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Withdraw Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Flagged for 5/25
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Transfer Inquiry to GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (20 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (36 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (26 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - P.PAMPHLET |
|
WIPO Publication - Non-English version (103 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (28 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (136 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (20 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (40 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (19 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (54 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |