Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ISSUE.NTF |
|
Issue Notification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Applicant Has Filed a Verified Statement of Small Entity Status in Compliance with 37 CFR 1.27
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner's Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner's Amendment Communication
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (113 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (10 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - R3.73B |
|
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (85 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (19 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Copy of the International Application
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - P.409.IN |
|
Incoming IPEA/409 - Int'l Prelim Report on Patentability (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (69 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (145 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (146 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM.NE |
|
Claim-Amendment Not Entered (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |