Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABN |
|
Abandonment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (21 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (16 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Supplemental Response
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SA.. |
|
Supplemental Response or Supplemental Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
New or Additional Drawing Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (16 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/24/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Filing Receipt - Corrected
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CFILE |
|
Request for Corrected Filing Receipt (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Filing Receipt
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (18 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (20 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (48 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (100 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |