Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (23 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (34 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (27 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (7 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (20 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (13 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (25 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (26 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (13 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (14 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (13 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (14 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (26 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (23 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (26 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (13 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (60 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (11 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (14 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (5 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (12 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (11 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (10 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (13 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (5 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (19 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (15 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (18 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (19 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (25 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRAN.LET |
|
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (15 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (7 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (71 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (29 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (26 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (14 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Filing Receipt
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (34 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (34 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (70 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (116 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (36 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (15 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (33 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (20 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - P.409.IN |
|
Incoming IPEA/409 - Int'l Prelim Report on Patentability (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - P2.416 |
|
IPEA/416 - Notification of Transmittal of International Preliminary Report on Patentability (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - P.210.OUT |
|
Outgoing ISA/210 - International Search Report (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (20 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |