Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABN |
|
Abandonment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - EXIN |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/4/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ELC. |
|
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Restriction Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTRS |
|
Requirement for Restriction/Election (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Restriction/Election Requirement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Return from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Return TO OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Return from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Return TO OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (4 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (8 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (8 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prior Art - NPL |
|
Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PEFR |
|
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (46 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (62 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (71 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (71 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (21 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (29 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (66 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (120 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |