Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner's Amendment Communication
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Corrected Notice of Allowability
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Pubs Case Remand to TC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to FDC
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IFEE |
|
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Filing Receipt - Corrected
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CFILE |
|
Request for Corrected Filing Receipt (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Filing Receipt - Corrected
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - BIB |
|
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IIFW |
|
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NOA |
|
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Document Verification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reasons for Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner's Amendment Communication
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Certified Translation of Foreign Priority Document
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FR TRANS |
|
Translation of Foreign Priority Documents (19 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - AMSB |
|
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None |
Prosecution - RCEX |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (13 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (12 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (11 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (16 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 1449 |
|
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - FOR |
|
Foreign Reference (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/1/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Filing Receipt
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - R3.73B |
|
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
371 Completion Date
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement considered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Reference capture on IDS
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - P.210.IN |
|
Incoming ISR, 237 and References from IB (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A.PE |
|
Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IDS |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |