Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABN |
|
Abandonment (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Electronic Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Email Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (5 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - EXIN |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/10/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/10/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - EXIN |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - AMSB |
|
Amendment Submitted/Entered with Filing of CPA/RCE (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - RCEX |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTFR |
|
Final Rejection (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - REM |
|
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None |
Prosecution - A... |
|
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None |
1 - SRNT |
|
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SRFW |
|
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FWCLM |
|
Index of Claims (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prior Art - 892 |
|
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CTNF |
|
Non-Final Rejection (4 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Classification Division Decision
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Transfer Inquiry to GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
PG-Pub Issue Notification
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB |
|
Notice of Publication (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Sent to Classification Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Filing Receipt
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - APP.FILE.REC |
|
Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M903 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Acceptance Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - NTC.PUB.DATE |
|
Notice of New or Revised Publication Date (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - R3.73B |
|
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - PA.. |
|
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Additional Application Filing Fees
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - OATH |
|
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - XT/ |
|
Extension of Time (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - LET. |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None |
Prosecution - M905 |
|
Notice of DO/EO Missing Requirements Mailed (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Cleared by OIPE CSR
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - IMIS |
|
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WCLM |
|
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - FRPR |
|
Certified Copy of Foreign Priority Application (18 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 371P |
|
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (8 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - N417 |
|
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - WFEE |
|
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - DRW |
|
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (6 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ABST |
|
Abstract (1 Page)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - CLM |
|
Claims (2 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - SPEC |
|
Specification (9 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - ADS |
|
Application Data Sheet (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - 136A |
|
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None |
Prosecution - TRNA |
|
Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
|
|
Request |
 |