PNGI Charles Town Gaming v. Tina Mawing
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-1513

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 4:58 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405163104 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant PNGI Charles Town Gaming, L.L.C.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 09/29/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999444834] [14-1513] Stacey Scrivani
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
      BRIEF by Appellees Tina Mawing and The Charles Town Horsemen's Benevolent Protective Association in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/29/2014. [999465196] [14-1513] David Hammer
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
        BRIEF by Appellant PNGI Charles Town Gaming, L.L.C. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/29/2014. [999444837] [14-1513] Stacey Scrivani
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
          FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant PNGI Charles Town Gaming, L.L.C.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 09/29/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999444834] [14-1513] Stacey Scrivani
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
            BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/29/2014. Response Brief due 10/31/2014 [14-1513] (MR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
              COURT ORDER filed [999418459] denying Motion to dismiss appeal [14] Copies to all parties.. [14-1513] (MR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                RESPONSE/ANSWER by PNGI Charles Town Gaming, L.L.C. to notice requesting response [15], Motion to dismiss appeal [14]. [14-1513] Stacey Scrivani
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                  ORDER filed [999387758] granting Motion to suspend [16] Copies to all parties.. [14-1513] (MR)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION by Appellant PNGI Charles Town Gaming, L.L.C. to suspend BRIEFING. Date and method of service: 07/01/2014 ecf. [999387651] [14-1513] Stacey Scrivani
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE ISSUED to Stacey Scrivani for PNGI Charles Town Gaming, L.L.C. requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [14]Response due: 07/10/2014.[999384038].. [14-1513] (MR)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION by Appellees Tina Mawing and The Charles Town Horsemen's Benevolent Protective Association to dismiss appeal [14]. Date and method of service: 06/26/2014 ecf. [999383960] [14-1513] David Hammer
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Harry P Waddell for The Charles Town Horsemen's Benevolent Protective Association..[999375806] [14-1513]--[Edited 06/13/2014 by MR to correct identification of party on whose behalf appearance of counsel has been filed] David Hammer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Harry P Waddell for Tina Mawing.[999375804] [14-1513] David Hammer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant PNGI Charles Town Gaming, L.L.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999374951] [14-1513] Stacey Scrivani
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by STACEY A. SCRIVANI, ESQ. for PNGI Charles Town Gaming, L.L.C..[999374925] [14-1513] Stacey Scrivani
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee The Charles Town Horsemen's Benevolent Protective Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999374440] [14-1513] David Hammer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Tina Mawing. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999374436] [14-1513] David Hammer
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David M. Hammer for The Charles Town Horsemen's Benevolent Protective Association.[999374428] [14-1513] David Hammer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David M.Hammer for Tina Mawing.[999374425] [14-1513] David Hammer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-1513] (SLW)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant PNGI Charles Town Gaming, L.L.C.. [14-1513] Stacey Scrivani
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                              BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 07/09/2014. Response Brief due 08/11/2014 [14-1513] (MR)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:14-cv-00002-JPB.. [14-1513] (MR)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:14-cv-00002-JPB. Case manager: MRadday. [14-1513] (MR)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?