N5 Technologies LLC v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00686
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 9:38 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo N5 Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Panovia Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek J Jardieu +1 202 297 2767 djardieu@panoviagroup.com

Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com
v.
Capital One Bank (USA) NA Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Capital One Bank (USA) National Association"

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Buroker +1 202 955 8541 +1 202 530 4200 bburoker@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Foster Chandler +1 202 887 3512 +1 202 530 4253

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Joseph Benz, III +1 404 815 2329 +1 404 685 5329 joebenz@paulhastings.com
Capital One Services, LLC Capital One Services, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Buroker +1 202 955 8541 +1 202 530 4200 bburoker@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Foster Chandler +1 202 887 3512 +1 202 530 4253

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Joseph Benz, III +1 404 815 2329 +1 404 685 5329 joebenz@paulhastings.com
Capital One, NA Capital One, NA, Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Buroker +1 202 955 8541 +1 202 530 4200 bburoker@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Foster Chandler +1 202 887 3512 +1 202 530 4253

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Joseph Benz, III +1 404 815 2329 +1 404 685 5329 joebenz@paulhastings.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion to Transfer to the Alexandria Division of the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/20/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION and Stipulation to Transfer to the Alexandria Division of the Eastern District of Virginia by Capital One Bank (USA) National Association, Capital One Services LLC, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buroker, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/14/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Joseph Benz, III on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA) National Association, Capital One Services LLC, Capital One, N.A. (Benz, E) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Entry of a Discovery Order by N5 Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreed Proposed Discovery Order)(Jardieu, Derek) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2013: # 2 REVISED DISCOVERY ORDER) (sm, ). (Entered: 02/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for a New Trial Date in a Reassigned Case by N5 Technologies LLC. (Jardieu, Derek) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 02/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of deadlines. Deadlines are 2/6/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/30/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for a New Trial Date and Joint and Unopposed Motion for Entry of a Discovery Order by Capital One Bank (USA) National Association, Capital One Services LLC, Capital One, N.A., N5 Technologies LLC. (Buroker, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 01/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derek J Jardieu on behalf of N5 Technologies LLC (Jardieu, Derek) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Foster Chandler on behalf of All Defendants (Chandler, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Rodney Gilstrap per General Order 13-3. For proposed scheduling order see Appendix E to General Order 13-3. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by N5 Technologies LLC of Readiness for Schedulilng Conference (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint, by Capital One, N.A..(Buroker, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint, by Capital One Services LLC.(Buroker, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint, by Capital One Bank (USA) National Association.(Buroker, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Capital One Bank (USA) National Association, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services LLC, filed by N5 Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,197,297)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by N5 Technologies LLC. Capital One Bank (USA) National Association served on 11/7/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Capital One Financial Corporation served on 11/5/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Capital One Services LLC served on 11/5/2012, answer due 12/27/2012. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Bank (USA) National Association, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services LLC.( Buroker, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M Buroker on behalf of All Defendants (Buroker, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER; the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice of readiness for scheduling conference when all Defendants in all of the listed cases have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/8/12. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA) National Association, (Attachments: # 1 Capital One Financial Corporation, # 2 Capital One Services LLC)(ch, ) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of N5 Technologies LLC (Fussell, James) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by N5 Technologies LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Capital One Bank (USA) National Association, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3846023.), filed by N5 Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,197,297, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 21 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?