COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00953
District Judge Gladys Kessler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 23, 2019 at 12:40 PM EDT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Advance America, Cash Advance Centers, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/19/2016 Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Harold Smith Reeves +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 393 5719 hreeves@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua P. Chadwick +1 202 263 4835 +1 202 736 5615 joshua.p.chadwick@frb.gov
Space Yonatan Gelblum +1 202 452 2046 +1 202 736 5615 yonatan.gelblum@frb.gov
Space Yvonne Facchina Mizusawa +1 202 452 3436 +1 202 736 5615 yvonne.f.mizusawa@frb.gov
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik Brendon Bond +1 703 562 6461 erbond@fdic.gov
Space Andrew Jared Dober +1 202 887 4338 +1 202 887 4288 adober@fdic.gov
Space Duncan Stevens +1 703 562 2402 +1 703 562 2477 dstevens@fdic.gov
Office of the Comptroller of the Currency Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of the Treasury

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Chadwell Koch +1 202 649 6313 +1 202 649 5709 peter.koch@occ.treas.gov
No Logo THOMAS J. CURRY, Defendant
No Logo AUBREY STONE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon David Almond +1 202 274 2864 +1 202 274 2994 brandon.almond@troutmansanders.com
No Logo LIBRE INITIATIVE INSTITUTE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cause Of Action Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Zachary Epstein +1 202 499 4232 +1 202 330 5842 Daniel.Epstein@causeofaction.org
Space Prashant Kumar Khetan +1 202 499 4232 +1 202 330 5842 prashant.khetan@causeofaction.org
No Logo NATIONAL ORGANIZATION OF AFRICAN AMERICANS IN HOUSING, Movant
No Logo State of South Carolina, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lewis Steven Wiener +1 202 383 0140 +1 202 637 3593 lewis.wiener@sutherland.com
No Logo TEAMSTERS NATIONAL BLACK CAUCUS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre & Lemon, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chrys D. Lemon +1 202 659 3900 +1 202 659 5763 cdl@mcintyrelf.com
No Logo THIRD PARTY PAYMENT PROCESSORS ASSOCIATION, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ivan Knauer +1 202 220 1219 knaueri@pepperlaw.com
No Logo WILLIAM ISAAC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Individual Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle Ann Scott +20208 338 400 X114 scott@cir-usa.org
No Logo The LIBRE Initiative Institute, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Cause Of Action Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Zachary Epstein +1 202 499 4232 +1 202 330 5842 Daniel.Epstein@causeofaction.org
Space Prashant Kumar Khetan +1 202 499 4232 +1 202 330 5842 prashant.khetan@causeofaction.org
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 702
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (252) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Redacted Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None sealed reply
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian W. Barnes, :Firm- Cooper & Kirk, PLLC, :Address- 1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.. Phone No. - 202-220-9600. Fax No. - 202-220-9601 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5449440. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Brian W. Barnes in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Moss, Nicole)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alissa Victoria Sagri on behalf of THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, JOSEPH M. OTTING (Sagri, Alissa)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine H. Wheatley on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Wheatley, Katherine)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne F. Mizusawa on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Mizusawa, Yvonne)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/20/18. (lctnm1)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance by Duncan Norman Stevens on behalf of FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Stevens, Duncan) Modified on 4/23/2018 (td).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Jo Moss on behalf of ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE (Moss, Nicole)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kenneth Morelli on behalf of OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, JOSEPH M. OTTING (Morelli, Michael)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Sterbenz on behalf of OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Sterbenz, Christopher)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting the FDIC's 177 Consent Motion for Protective Order. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/18. (lctnm1)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Protective Order (Amended) by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Amended Protective Order (clean), # 2 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Amended Protective Order (redline))(Dober, Andrew)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER. Pursuant to rulings from the bench at the February 14, 2018 Status Hearing, the Court hereby ORDERS the parties to comply with the attached AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/16/2018. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Trevor N. McFadden, held on 01/18/2018; Page Numbers: 30. Date of Issuance:01/26/2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sara Wick, Telephone number 202-354-3284, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced ab ove. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2018.(Wick, Sara)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Parties by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/7/17. (CL) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None USCA order
                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA ORDERED that the Clerk note on the docket that this case is dismissed as to 142 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE. USCA Case Number 17-5045. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                        FDIC ANSWER to 124 Amended Complaint, by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. Related document: 124 Amended Complaint, filed by NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE.(Dober, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 124 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, KEITH A. NOREIKA. Related document: 124 Amended Complaint, filed by NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE.(Koch, Peter)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 124 Amended Complaint, by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. Related document: 124 Amended Complaint, filed by NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE.(Chadwick, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 84 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Their Proposed Discovery Plan (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/6/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Motion for Summary Judgment and the Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/5/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 101 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/5/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 161 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Support filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Grupo Elektra 4Q16 Quarterly Report, # 2 Exhibit B: Grupo Elektra 1Q17 Quarterly Report, # 3 Exhibit C: Grupo Elektra 2016 Annual Report)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Joint Discovery Plan by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC re 160 Order (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Order, # 2 Defendants' Proposed Discovery Schedule)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Supplemental Support by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Fourth Declaration of Christian Rudolph)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan no later than May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/8/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order denying Community Financial Services Association of America's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/25/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Order on Motion for Entry of Final JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 110 Community Financial Services Association of America's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/25/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 154 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Support Seeking Immediate Discovery filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 138 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction as to New Plaintiffs, or for Summary Judgment as to Check Into Cash, NCP Finance, and Northstate Check Exchange MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Reply)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 138 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction as to New Plaintiffs, or for Summary Judgment as to Check Into Cash, NCP Finance, and Northstate Check Exchange MOTION for Summary Judgment by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Supplemental Support by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC re 84 MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Response to Order of the Court, (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 138 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction as to New Plaintiffs, or for Summary Judgment as to Check Into Cash, NCP Finance, and Northstate Check Exchange MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Second Declaration of Christopher Henn, # 3 Third Declaration of William S. Lane, # 4 Fourth Declaration of Robert K. Zeitler, Sr., # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Errata
                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA Corrected Memorandum in Support by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY 138 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction as to New Plaintiffs, or for Summary Judgment as to Check Into Cash, NCP Finance, and Northstate Check Exchange MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (znmw) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or for Summary Judgment by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or for Summary Judgment)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Gladys Kessler held on 2-1-17; Page Numbers: 1-12. Date of Issuance:3-17-17. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa M. Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. Afte r 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2017.(Foradori, Lisa) Modified on 3/17/2017 (tth).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Gladys Kessler held on October 22, 2015; Page Numbers: 1 - 29. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn jones, Telephone number 2023543246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2017.(Jones, Cathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 141 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiffs shall have up to and including April 7, 2017 in which to file their Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, or for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/16/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 144 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Report for Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Gladys Kessler held on 2-16-17; Page Numbers: (1-37). Date of Issuance:03-1-17. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2017.(Wallace, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                          Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 142 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Supplemental Support by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC re 142 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Letter by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC re 142 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, (Patterson, Peter) Modified on 3/15/2017 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 140 Memorandum & Opinion, 139 Order by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4875446. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 138 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction as to New Plaintiffs, or for Summary Judgment as to Check Into Cash, NCP Finance, and Northstate Check Exchange MOTION for Summary Judgment by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 134 TO VIEW DOCUMENT.) (td) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/23/17. (See docket entry 135 to view order) (ztnr) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction as to New Plaintiffs, or for Summary Judgment as to Check Into Cash, NCP Finance, and Northstate Check Exchange by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1: Hoover's Report on PH Financial Services, # 3 Exhibit 2: Articles of Incorporation for PH Financial Services, LLC, # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Exhibit Index, # 6 Exhibit A: Jones Management Services Homepage, # 7 Exhibit B: Check Into Cash "About Us" Webpage, # 8 Exhibit C: 2014 CFSA Presentation (Hecht), # 9 Exhibit D: 2012 CFSA Presentation (Butzlaf), # 10 Exhibit E: 2010 Stephens Industry Report (Butzlaf & Groce), # 11 Exhibit F: 2007 Stephens Industry Report (Telzrow & Butzlaf), # 12 Exhibit G: Check Into Cash Press Release (Oct. 8, 2013), # 13 Exhibit H: Check Into Cash Press Release (Oct. 4, 2016), # 14 Exhibit I: Times Free Press Article (June 2, 2016), # 15 Exhibit J: Check Into Cash Press Release (July 5, 2012), # 16 Exhibit K: Check Into Cash Online Payday Loan FAQs, # 17 Exhibit L: Check Into Cash Press Release (July 1, 2014), # 18 Exhibit M: Check Into Cash Press Release (July 13, 2016), # 19 Exhibit N: Check Into Cash Press Release (Apr. 16, 2016), # 20 Exhibit O: Check Into Cash Press Release (Apr. 15, 2016), # 21 Exhibit P: Check Into Cash Press Release (Oct. 8, 2013), # 22 Exhibit Q: Careers at Check Into Cash Webpage, # 23 Exhibit R: Check Into Cash Job Listings, # 24 Exhibit S: NCP Finance Homepage, # 25 Exhibit T: NCP Finance "Company" Webpage, # 26 Exhibit U: NCP Finance "CSO Lending" Webpage, # 27 Exhibit V: NCP Finance "Clients" Webpage, # 28 Exhibit W: S&P Credit Analysis for NCP Finance (Oct. 3, 2013), # 29 Exhibit X: 2015 CFSA Presentation (Hecht), # 30 Exhibit Y: S&P Credit Analysis for NCP Finance (Dec. 22, 2016), # 31 Exhibit Z: Moody's Credit Analysis for NCP Finance (Oct. 28, 2016), # 32 Exhibit AA: Moody's Rating Methodology, # 33 Exhibit BB: S&P Rating Methodology, # 34 Exhibit CC: Balance Credit Press Release (Feb. 17, 2016), # 35 Exhibit DD: Texas OCCC Annual Report (2012), # 36 Exhibit EE: Texas OCCC Annual Report (2013), # 37 Exhibit FF: Texas OCCC Annual Report (2014), # 38 Exhibit GG: Texas OCCC Annual Report (2015), # 39 Exhibit HH: Texas OCCC Annual Report (2016), # 40 Exhibit II: Houston City Ordinance No. 2013-1163 Ch. 28, Art. XV, # 41 Exhibit JJ: Houston Chronicle Article (Aug. 20, 2016), # 42 Exhibit KK: San Antonio Express-News Article (Sept. 11, 2015), # 43 Exhibit LL: Barth Article (2016), # 44 Exhibit MM: Northstate Check Exchange "Our Services" Webpage, # 45 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 3/13/2017 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/27/2017 Order on Motion to unseal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 136 Joint Motion to Unseal Documents; the Court's Sealed Memorandum Opinion at Docket #134, and the Court's Sealed Order at Docket #135 are hereby UNSEALED. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/27/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Unseal Document 134 Sealed Memorandum Opinion, 135 Sealed Order by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017 SEALED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              UN-SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/23/2017. (ztth) Modified on 2/28/2017 to unseal pursuant to 137 order filed on 02/27/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017 Sealed Memorandum OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                UN-SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/23/2017. (ztth) Modified on 2/28/2017 to unseal pursuant to 137 order filed on 02/27/2017 (jf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION (Main document Second Declaration of William S. Lane) re 107 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration 3rd Declaration of Robert K. Zeitler, Sr., # 2 Sworn Expert Report of Charles W. Calomiris)(td) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 131 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendants shall file their response to the Third Amended Complaint on or before March 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/22/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Third Amended Complaint by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re 126 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Materials in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 126 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Materials (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/14/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Proposed Order by CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC re 126 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Materials in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 107 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Materials in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Third Declaration of Robert K. Zeitler, Sr., # 2 Second Declaration of William S. Lane, # 3 Sworn Expert Report of Charles W. Calomiris)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 107 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Bhutta Article)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (as modified re 123 Notice of Filing) against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY filed by RICHARD NAUMANN, ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, CHECK INTO CASH, INC., NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.(znmw) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Third Amended Complaint by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC re 120 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Complaint)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 110 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY filed by RICHARD NAUMANN, ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD., PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, CHECK INTO CASH, INC., NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.(znmw) Modified Needs modifications pursuant to Order 120 on 2/6/2017 (td). (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 102 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (see Order for details on corrections ordered by the Court); Defendants shall have until February 8, 2017, in which to file an Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and, if necessary, Plaintiffs will have until Monday, February 13, 2017, in which to file a Reply. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/3/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Patterson on behalf of ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC. (Patterson, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 102 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Amended Complaint, filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 110 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts IV, VIII and XII of the Second Amended Complaint filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit A: Fifth Third Bank Deposit Agreement, # 3 Exhibit B: Excerpt from Umpqua Bank Treasury Management Services Terms and Conditions, # 4 Exhibit C: Synovus Bank Online Banking Agreement, # 5 Exhibit D: U.S. Bank Deposit Account Agreement, # 6 Exhibit E: FDIC FIL-34-2005)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER: The Motions Hearing set for February 1, 2017, is hereby converted to a Status Conference to discuss the most efficient sequence for resolving the pending Motions in this case. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/26/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the Motions Hearing set for February 1, 2017, is hereby converted to a Status Conference to discuss the most efficient sequence for resolving the pending Motions in this case. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/26/17. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 102 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Amended Complaint, filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts IV, VIII and XII of the Second Amended Complaint filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff Advance America's Statement of Material Facts and Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1 - SR 96-14, # 3 Exhibit 2 - OCC Bull. No. 2001-47, # 4 Exhibit 3 - OCC Bull. No. 2013-29, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Community Bank Supervision, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Large Bank Supervision, # 7 Exhibit 6 - OCC Bull. No. 2015-48, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Third Declaration of Christian Rudolph, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 108 MOTION for Briefing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (DE 107) filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Gelblum, Yonatan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: 1/16/2017 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 108 MOTION for Briefing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (DE 107) filed by CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Motion for Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Briefing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (DE 107) by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelblum, Yonatan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CHECK INTO CASH, INC., RICHARD NAUMANN, NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Richard Naumann, # 3 Declaration of William S. Lane, # 4 Declaration of Christopher Henn, # 5 Declaration of Glenn Bassett, # 6 Declaration of Robert K. Zeitler, Sr. (Supplemental), # 7 Expert Report of Charles W. Calomiris, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CHECK INTO CASH, INC. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Amended Complaint, by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., CHECK INTO CASH, INC., NCP FINANCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NCP FINANCE OHIO, LLC, NORTHSTATE CHECK EXCHANGE, PH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, RICHARD NAUMANN (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts IV, VIII and XII of the Second Amended Complaint by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit Index, # 4 Exhibit A: Advance America 2007 10-K, # 5 Exhibit B: Advance America 2008 10-K, # 6 Exhibit C: Advance America 2009 10-K, # 7 Exhibit D: Advance America 2010 10-K, # 8 Exhibit E: Advance America 2011 10-K, # 9 Exhibit F: Grupo Elektra 2014 Annual Report, # 10 Exhibit G: Grupo Elektra 2015 Annual Report, # 11 Exhibit H: Grupo Elektra 4Q13 Quarterly Report, # 12 Exhibit I: Grupo Elektra 4Q14 Quarterly Report, # 13 Exhibit J: Grupo Elektra 4Q15 Quarterly Report, # 14 Exhibit K: Grupo Elektra 3Q16 Quarterly Report, # 15 Exhibit L: Internal Revenue Service Yearly Average Currency Exchange Rates, # 16 Exhibit M: Grupo Elektra Presentation (May 2016), # 17 Exhibit N: John Hecht, Presentation at CFSA Conference (2016), # 18 Exhibit O: FDIC FIL-5-2015, # 19 Exhibit P: FDIC FIL-41-2014, # 20 Exhibit Q: FDIC FIL-43-2013, # 21 Exhibit R: Testimony of Daniel P. Stipano, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the Parties shall appear for a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on February 1, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/28/16. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Yonatan Gelblum on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Gelblum, Yonatan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Intention to Proceed on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and of Mutually Agreeable Dates for a Hearing on the Motion by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC. re 96 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/19/16. (CL) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 73 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; CFSA is dismissed as a party to this action; Plaintiff Advance America shall submit to the Court, within seven days of the issuance of this Order, a written update on whether it wishes to proceed on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction that is currently pending before the Court, file an amended Motion or withdraw the Motion; and if Plaintiff Advance America elects to proceed on the present Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the Parties shall submit a list of mutually agreeable dates between January 9-12 or January 31-February 1, 2017, on which they are available to attend a hearing on the Motion. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/19/16. (CL) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 87 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (znmw) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 93 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/14/16. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 92 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT (Declaration) filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. re 91 Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 89 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/12/2016. (ztth) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: 12/8/2016 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 87 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Serena Christenson, # 2 Exhibit C: FDIC FIL-43-2013, # 3 Exhibit D: FDIC FIL-41-2014, # 4 Exhibit E: Business Bank of Texas Consent Order, # 5 Exhibit F: Form 10-K for Advance America (2011), # 6 Exhibit G: Annual Report, Grupo Elektra (2015), # 7 Exhibit H: Quarterly Report, Grupo Elektra (2Q2015), # 8 Exhibit I: Quarterly Report, Grupo Elektra (3Q2016), # 9 Exhibit J: Grupo Elektra Presentation (May 2016), # 10 Exhibit K: Annual Report, Grupo Elektra (2014), # 11 Exhibit L: FDIC FIL-5-2015, # 12 Exhibit M: Testimony of Daniel P. Stipano, # 13 Exhibit N: John Hecht, Presentation at CFSA Conference (2016), # 14 Exhibit O: Texas Appleseed, Pulling Back the Curtain (2015), # 15 Exhibit P: Form 10-K, Community Choice Financial Inc. (2015), # 16 Exhibit Q: Form 10-Q, U.S. Bancorp (2Q2016), # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 89 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: 12/8/2016 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of NS (Scott) Ward III, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Koch, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 87 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chadwick, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Ed Lette, # 3 Declaration Dennis Shaul, # 4 Declaration Christian Rudolph, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY re 85 Response to motion, filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 84 MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Response to Order of the Court, filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of October 22, 2015 Scheduling Conference)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Response to Order of the Court, by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Revised Proposed Discovery Plan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 82 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Support, filed by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Supplemental Support by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit B-4)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY re 80 Response to Document, Proposed Discovery Plan filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 78 Response to Order of the Court, Regarding Plaintiffs' Discovery Plan filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Proposed Order And Statement in Support of Defendants' Proposed Discovery Plan by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order If Associational Standing Motion Granted, # 2 Text of Proposed Order If Associational Standing Motion Denied, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E)(Dober, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 71 Order,, Proposed Discovery Schedule filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 74 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Associational or Organizational Standing or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Plaintiff CFSA for Lack of Associational and Organizational Standing MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings in the Alternative as to Plaintiff CFSA filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED MEMORANDUM to re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Plaintiff CFSA for Lack of Associational and Organizational Standing MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings in the Alternative as to Plaintiff CFSA filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (znmw) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Associational or Organizational Standing or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Plaintiff CFSA for Lack of Associational and Organizational Standing, MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings in the Alternative as to Plaintiff CFSA by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE advising of a small error in the Memorandum Opinion [Dkt. No. 63] (see Notice for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/26/15. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that Defendants shall file their Motion to Dismiss on jurisdictional grounds no later than 5:00 p.m. on October 29, 2015; Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition no later than November 12, 2015; Defendants shall file their Reply in Support no later than November 19, 2015; the Parties shall file, either jointly or separately, their proposed, detail discovery schedules no later than December 10, 2015, Plaintiffs may, if they choose and in the interest of time, file a Motion to file a Third Amended Complaint by December 10, 2015; this Order does not preclude Plaintiffs from moving to amend their Complaint after the Court resolves Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/22/15. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Chadwick on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Chadwick, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Jared Dober on behalf of FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Dober, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 64 Amended Complaint, by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. Related document: 64 Amended Complaint, filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD..(Mizusawa, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 64 Amended Complaint, by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. Related document: 64 Amended Complaint, filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD..(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 64 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. Related document: 64 Amended Complaint, filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD..(Koch, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD..(znmw) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Motions to Dismiss, et al.. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/25/15. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 56 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss; denying 25 Motion for Discovery; the Parties shall, no later than October 19, 2015, at 2:00 p.m., a Joint Rule 16 Memorandum and shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 22, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/25/15. (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to LIBRE INITIATIVE INSTITUTE. Attorney Prashant Kumar Khetan terminated. (Khetan, Prashant)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Amended Complaint, filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Amended Complaint, filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Mizusawa, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Amended Complaint, filed by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: FIL-5-2015)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Amended Complaint, filed by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koch, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Amended Complaint, by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 52 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Support filed by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Supplemental Support by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H. Comm. Report on FDIC's Involvement in "Operation Choke Point", # 2 Exhibit Appendix to H. Comm. Report)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Replies in Support of the Government Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Surreply by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (znmw, ) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Opposition to Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Amended Opposition Brief)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, for Failure to State a Claim filed by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: DOJ Memorandum)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: FIL-43-2013, # 2 Exhibit B: FIL-41-2014, # 3 Exhibit C: Transmittal Letter, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Koch, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koch, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION for Discovery filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Mizusawa, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Mizusawa, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMICUS BRIEF by NATIONAL ORGANIZATION OF AFRICAN AMERICANS IN HOUSING, AUBREY STONE, TEAMSTERS NATIONAL BLACK CAUCUS. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMICUS BRIEF by LIBRE INITIATIVE INSTITUTE. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMICUS BRIEF by WILLIAM ISAAC. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMICUS BRIEF by THIRD PARTY PAYMENT PROCESSORS ASSOCIATION. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Supplemental Support by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Feb. 15, 2013 Letter from M. Anthony Lowe to depository institution)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 30 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, 32 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, 31 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae, 33 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Stevens, Duncan) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AUBREY STONE, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION OF AFRICAN AMERICANS IN HOUSING, TEAMSTERS NATIONAL BLACK CAUCUS. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Almond, Brandon) Modified filers on 10/14/2014 (znmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by The LIBRE Initiative Institute (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A: Proposed Amicus Brief)(Khetan, Prashant)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by William M. Isaac (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief)(Scott, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiener, Lewis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Zachary Epstein on behalf of The LIBRE Initiative Institute (Epstein, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Prashant Kumar Khetan on behalf of The LIBRE Initiative Institute (Khetan, Prashant)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10-08-2014. (lcgk3, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motions to Dismiss, and Opposition to Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery, by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Discovery by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery, # 2 Declaration of Harold S. Reeves, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 22 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, for Failure to State a Claim, 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of C. Rudolph, # 2 Declaration Declaration of J. Gonzalez, # 3 Declaration Declaration of M. Durbin, # 4 Declaration Declaration of R. Dean, # 5 Declaration Declaration of M. McDonald, # 6 Declaration Declaration of R. Zeitler, # 7 Declaration Declaration of B. Lynn, # 8 Declaration Declaration of J. Riggs, # 9 Declaration Declaration of D. Shaul, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: 10/2/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by THIRD PARTY PAYMENT PROCESSORS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A- Amicus Curiae Brief)(Knauer, Ivan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Smith Reeves on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reeves, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, for Failure to State a Claim by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions To Dismiss by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/18/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Koch, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/18/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, for Failure to State a Claim by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Index, # 3 Exhibit A: Bay Cities Bank Consent Order, # 4 Exhibit B: Meridian Bank Consent Order, # 5 Exhibit C: Metro Phoenix Bank Consent Order, # 6 Exhibit D: Achieve Financial Services Consent Order, # 7 Exhibit E: FDIC FIL-34-2005 (Apr. 28, 2005), # 8 Exhibit F: FDIC Risk Management Manual Section 4.3, # 9 Exhibit G: FDIC Compliance Exam Manual Section VII, # 10 Exhibit H: Supervisory Insights Article (Summer 2007), # 11 Exhibit I: FYI Article (Jan. 29, 2003), # 12 Exhibit J: FDIC Press Release (Jan. 29, 2003), # 13 Exhibit K: FDIC Guidelines for Payday Lending (July 2, 2003), # 14 Exhibit L: FDIC FIL-14-2005 (Mar. 2, 2005), # 15 Exhibit M: FDIC Risk Management Manual Section 3.2, # 16 Exhibit N: FDIC FIL-44-2008 (June 6, 2008), # 17 Exhibit O: FDIC FIL-127-2008 (Nov. 7, 2008), # 18 Exhibit P: Supervisory Insights Article (Summer 2011), # 19 Exhibit Q: FDIC FIL-3-2012 (Jan. 31, 2012), # 20 Exhibit R: FDIC FIL-43-2013 (Sept. 27, 2013), # 21 Exhibit S: SunFirst Bank Consent Order, # 22 Exhibit T: FDIC FIL-41-2014 (July 28, 2014), # 23 Exhibit U: Congressional Staff Report, # 24 Exhibit V: FDIC FIL-52-2006 (June 21, 2006), # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/18/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mizusawa, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/18/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Chadwell Koch on behalf of THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Koch, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Howard C. Nielson, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nielson, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. re 12 Amended Complaint, . (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY filed by COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD., ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance of Duncan N. Stevens and Erik B. Bond by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Stevens, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. THOMAS J. CURRY served on 6/12/2014 (Cooper, Charles) Modified date of service on 6/19/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY served on 6/12/2014 (Cooper, Charles) Modified date of service on 6/19/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM served on 6/12/2014 (Cooper, Charles) Modified date of service on 6/19/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION served on 6/12/2014 (Cooper, Charles) Modified date of service on 6/19/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/12/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/11/2014. (Cooper, Charles) Modified dates on 6/19/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/12/2014. (Cooper, Charles) Modified date of service on 6/19/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David Henry Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, THOMAS J. CURRY, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent, # 2 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3738764) filed by COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD., ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 567 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?