Larkins v. Toledo et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-30001
District Judge Michael A Ponsor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 6:04 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Guy Larkins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy C. Flahive +1 413 732 3758 +1 413 732 3758 nancyflahive93@yahoo.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Perman Glenn, III +1 413 734 9955 +1 413 734 1255 jbramson12@yahoo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Perman Glenn, III +1 413 734 9955 +1 413 734 1255 jbramson12@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo City of Springfield, Massachusetts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, City of Springfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony I. Wilson +1 413 219 0365 awilson@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo Officer Edwin Torres, Defendant
No Logo Officer Felix Aguirre, Defendant
No Logo Officer Matthew Longo, Defendant
No Logo Officer Richard Jarvis, Defendant
No Logo Officer Richard Ward, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joseph Scheideler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin B. Coyle +1 413 787 1524 +1 413 787 1703 attycoyle@aol.com
No Logo Police Commissioner William Fitchett, Defendant
No Logo Richard Randolph, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reardon, Joyce & Akerson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Gambaccini +1 508 754 7285 +1 508 754 7220 agambaccini@rja-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin M. Joyce +1 508 754 7285 +1 508 754 7220 ajoyce@rja-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John K. Vigliotti +1 508 754 7285 +1 508 754 7220 jvigliotti@rja-law.com
No Logo Sergeant Julio M. Toledo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CITY OF SPRINGFIELD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Liebel +1 413 787 6085 +1 413 787 6173 jliebel@springfieldcityhall.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. ORDER RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. See order for details. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. ORDER RE: POST-VERDICT CONTACT WITH JURORS(Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant, Julio Toledo against Plaintiff, Guy Larkins. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
        JURY VERDICT in favor of Defendant, Julio Toledo against Plaintiff, Guy Larkins. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 87 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part 88 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Officer Toledo. To clarify docket See clerk note 4/23/13. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Ponsor: Conference held. Jury Trial day 7 completed on 4/24/2013.. Closings completed. Jury Instructions completed. Deliberations begin at 11:40 am. Question Court exhibit 1 ented at 3:13. Verdict reached 4:48 pm. Verdict in favor of Defendant. (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at 617-330-1377.)(Attorneys present: Liebel, Flahive) (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Ponsor: Conference held. Jury Trial day 6 held on 4/23/2013. Testimony of Richard Randolph, Felix Aguirre, Lee Poggi completed. Plaintiff rest. Motion for directed verdict. Court grants motion on all defendants except Toledo and Ward as to claims as stated in court. Defendant calls Stephen Wyzanski, Chad Joseph and Robert Tardiff. Defendants rest. Court releases Jury for the day. Charging conference held. Without objection from Plaintiff Court will enter Judgment in favor of Mr. Ward based on remaining counts, Mr Toledo remains on case on counts stated in court. Court reviews jury instructions with parties. (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at 617-330-1377.)(Attorneys present: Flahive, Coyle, Joyce, Liebel) (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS MATTER OF LAW, MOTION for Directed Verdict by Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo.(Pelegano, Theresa). Added an additional relief - MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on 4/23/2013 (Finn, Mary). (Main Document 88 replaced on 4/24/2013 with motion signed only by John Liebel) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 4/24/2013 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                  MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS MATTER OF LAW by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward.(Pelegano, Theresa) Modified on 4/23/2013 to change the relief type of the motion for MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Guy Larkins. (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Ponsor: Conference held. Jury Trial day 5 held on 4/22/2013. testimony of Richard Ward, Kristopher Kurr, Juan Estrada, Sean Condon, Edwin Torres, Richard Jarvis completed. Plaintiff calls Richard Randolph, direct completed, cross continues. Exhibit H admitted. Trial resumes 4/23/13. (Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413-731-0086.)(Attorneys present: Flahive, Coyle, Joyce, Liebel) (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Ponsor: Conference held. Jury Trial day 4 held on 4/19/2013. Testimony of Mr. LArkin resumes. Testimony completed. Plaintiff calls Jose Toledo. Testimony completed. Plaintiff calls Richard Ward. Direct begins. Exhibits: A,B,C,D, E,F,G AND 9. (Court Reporter: Carol Carpentier.)(Attorneys present: Flahive, Liebel, Coyle, Joyce) (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Jury Trial set for 4/22/2013 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2013 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2013 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Attorneys should be in court by 8:45 am for conference. Jurors should be prepared to sit all day. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Ponsor: Conference held. Jury Trial held on 4/18/2013. Testimony of Mr Larkin continues. Direct completed. Cross begins. exhibits entered: 1a.1b.1c,2,3,4a,4b,5,6,7,8. (Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413-731-0086.)(Attorneys present: Joyce, Coyle, Liebel, Flahive) (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Ponsor: Morning conference with counsel held. Jury Trial day 2 held on 4/16/2013. Plaintiffs case begins. Witness Craig Moore testimony completed. Plainitff calls Guy Larkin. Guy Larkin direct testimony continues on 4/18. No exhibits admitted. (Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413-731-0086.)(Attorneys present: Flahive, Coyle, Joyce, Liebel) (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Jury Trial set for 4/18/2013 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2013 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Attorneys to be in court by 8:45 am for morning conference(Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Jury Trial set for 4/16/2013 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Ponsor: Conference with counsel., Jury Selection/ Voir Dire begun on 4/15/2013. Jury selection complete. Jury sworn. Judge gives preliminary instructions to jury. Jury trial begins. Openings completed. Trial to resume Tues 4/16/13 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413-731-0086.)(Attorneys present: Flahive, Joyce, Liebel, Coyle) (Pelegano, Theresa) Modified on 4/16/2013 to correct error (Pelegano, Theresa). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered re: Schedule for Trial(Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/14/2013, Entered: None
                                        Proposed Voir Dire by Guy Larkins. (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                          Plaintiff's Witness List by Guy Larkins. (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                            Defendants' Witness List by Julio M. Toledo. (Liebel, John) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by City of Springfield, Massachusetts, Julio M. Toledo, Richard Randolph, Richard Ward, Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Edwin Torres and Matthew Longo. (Wilson, Anthony) Modified on 4/10/2013 tp add Richard Randolph, Richard Ward, Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Edwin Torres and Matthw Longo's names to the text. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                Proposed Voir Dire by City of Springfield, Massachusetts, Julio M. Toledo, Richard Randolph, Richard Ward, Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Edwin Torres and Matthew Longo. (Wilson, Anthony) Modified on 4/10/2013 to add Richard Randolph, Richard Ward, Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Edwin Torres and Matthew Longo's names to the text. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 49 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Individual Officers' Personnel Files by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward, except as to statements made by Defendants, which may be used during cross examination. So ordered. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 48 Motion in Limine to Exclucde the Report and Testimony of Craig L. Moore, Ph.D. From Trial by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 51 Motion in Limine to Admit Evidence of Plaintiff's Convictions of Disorderly Conduct and Resisting Arrest and to Further Preclude Plaintiff from Refuting His Actions Regarding Those Convictions by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 50 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Acquittal of the Charge of Assault and Battery on a Police Officer by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 59 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Untimely Oppositions to Their Motions In Limine (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 36 Motion for Protective Order; granting 36 Motion to Continue, to clarify docket the trial will commence on 4/15/13. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Ponsor: Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held on 4/3/2013 re :Motions in Limine. Court reviews schedule for trial. Orders to issue.(Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413-731-0086.)(Attorneys present: Flahive, Coyle, Gambaccini, Liebel) (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Guy Larkins (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/26/13 to File Response/Reply. ALLOWED. Responses due by 3/26/2013 (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/26/2013 to File Response/Reply to Motions In Limine by Guy Larkins. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Counsel)(Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Opposition re 51 MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence of Plaintiff's Convictions of Disorderly Conduct and Resisting Arrest and to Further Preclude Plaintiff from Refuting His Actions Regarding Those Convictions filed by Guy Larkins. (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Opposition re 50 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Acquittal of the Charge of Assault and Battery on a Police Officer filed by Guy Larkins. (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Untimely Oppositions to Their Motions In Limine by Felix Aguirre, City of Springfield, Massachusetts, William Fitchett, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward.(Vigliotti, John) (Main Document 59 replaced on 3/26/2013 with correct signed document) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 3/26/2013 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Opposition re 48 MOTION in Limine to Exclucde the Report and Testimony of Craig L. Moore, Ph.D. From Trial filed by Guy Larkins. (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Opposition re 49 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Individual Officers' Personnel Files filed by Guy Larkins. (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply due to the Court already having allowed the Pltf's motion to ext. time to file response/reply see #'s 53, 54. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/25/2013 to File Response/Reply to Motions In Limine by Guy Larkins.(Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 51 MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence of Plaintiff's Convictions of Disorderly Conduct and Resisting Arrest and to Further Preclude Plaintiff from Refuting His Actions Regarding Those Convictions, 49 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Individual Officers' Personnel Files, 50 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Acquittal of the Charge of Assault and Battery on a Police Officer, 48 MOTION in Limine to Exclucde the Report and Testimony of Craig L. Moore, Ph.D. From Trial. Pltf's Responses due by 3/25/2013. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/25/2013 to File Opposition to Motions In Limine by Guy Larkins.(Flahive, Nancy) Modified on 3/21/2013 yo change the reief type of the motion to MOTION to extend time to file Response/Reply. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to 51 MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence of Plaintiff's Convictions of Disorderly Conduct and Resisting Arrest and to Further Preclude Plaintiff from Refuting His Actions Regarding Those Convictions, 49 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Individual Officers' Personnel Files, 50 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Acquittal of the Charge of Assault and Battery on a Police Officer, 48 MOTION in Limine to Exclucde the Report and Testimony of Craig L. Moore, Ph.D. From Trial. Responses due by 3/22/2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2013 01:00 PM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence of Plaintiff's Convictions of Disorderly Conduct and Resisting Arrest and to Further Preclude Plaintiff from Refuting His Actions Regarding Those Convictions by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward.(Liebel, John) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Acquittal of the Charge of Assault and Battery on a Police Officer by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward.(Liebel, John) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Individual Officers' Personnel Files by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward.(Liebel, John) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclucde the Report and Testimony of Craig L. Moore, Ph.D. From Trial by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liebel, John) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Ponsor: Counsel appear for Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/7/2013. Colloquy re: trial and pretrial filing schedule. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Alice Moran at 413-731-0086.)(Attorneys present: Flahive, Liebel, Wilson, Coyle, Joyce) (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER: As follows; Plaintiffs motion to dismiss voluntarily particular counts or defendants due 2/20/13, Defendants Motion in Limine due by 3/1/2013 and opposed by 3/22/13,Counsel will appear for argument on the Motion in Limine on 4/3/2013 at 01:00 PM, Proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions will be filed by 4/5/13 and Trial in this matter will commence on 4/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. See the attached scheduling order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 44 Motion to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 2/6/2013 03:45 PM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (The conference on 1/16/13 has been rescheduled. The court will discuss the trial date at the rescheduled conference date of 2/6/13. The current trial date of 2/11/13 is canceled.) (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference to 1/26/13 or date Convenient to Court by Guy Larkins. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Counsel)(Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING (Time change only) Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2013 12:30 PM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Healy, Bethaney) (Main Document 42 replaced on 11/15/2012) (Healy, Bethaney). (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman for mediation. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER with respect to Mediation ENTERED, cc:cl. Mediation set for 11/14/2012 at 11:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; confidential mediation memoranda shall be submitted to the court by 11/9/12. See order for details. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Jury Trial set for 2/11/2013 09:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2013 02:30 PM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    JUDGE PONSOR OUT SICK TODAY - TODAY'S PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS CANCELLED---ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2011 11:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION for Continuance of Trial date to a date after 1/2/2013 by City of Springfield, Massachusetts, William Fitchett, Julio M. Toledo.(Liebel, John). Added an additional relief - MOTION to Continue on 10/15/2012 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Guy Larkins. (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE Pre-trial memoranda deadline is extended to 10/12/12 after counsel, Nancy C. Flahive, contacted court requesting a short extension. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE The correct date for the conference is 10/16/12 please disregard any other notice sent in error. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2012 12:00 PM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (The 10/15/12 date was entered in error.)(Pelegano, Theresa) Modified on 10/3/2012 to fix error. (Pelegano, Theresa). (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2012 12:00 PM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (The hearing on 10/12/12 has been rescheduled.)(Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The hearing on 10/3/12 is canceled no motions were filed. (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy L. Bramson on behalf of Guy Larkins (Bramson, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony I. Wilson on behalf of City of Springfield, Massachusetts (Wilson, Anthony) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Julio M. Toledo.(Liebel, John) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to June 23, 2012 to Complete Discovery filed by City of Springfield, Massachusetts, William Fitchett, Julio M. Toledo. (Liebel, John) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time to June 23, 2012 to Complete Discovery by Guy Larkins.(Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 22 MOTION for Protective Order by Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Richard Randolph. (Joyce, Austin) Modified on 4/18/2012 to correct the text to reflect that Deft. Richard Randolph filed this document. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order by Felix Aguirre, City of Springfield, Massachusetts, William Fitchett, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward.(Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Answers to Sets of Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production of Documents by City of Springfield, Massachusetts, William Fitchett, Julio M. Toledo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Liebel, John) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Vigliotti, John) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward.(Coyle, Kevin) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: PROTECTIVE ORDER ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by City of Springfield, Massachusetts, William Fitchett, Julio M. Toledo.(Liebel, John) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Judge Michael A. Ponsor: PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED, cc:cl. Auto discl by 9/16/11; mots to amend pldgs/add parties by 10/21/11; all disc compl by 2/22/12; P's expert discl by 3/23/12; Ds' expert discl by 4/23/12; expert depos compl by 5/25/12; Ds' S/J motions by 6/29/12, with P's opp by 7/20/12, and Ds' reply by 8/10/12; hearing on S/J motions set for 9/12/12 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Michael A. Ponsor; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2012 at 2:00 PM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor; Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 at 9:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom before Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Liebel on behalf of Julio M. Toledo (Liebel, John) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin B. Coyle on behalf of Felix Aguirre, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward (Coyle, Kevin) (Entered: 08/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Gambaccini on behalf of Richard Randolph (Gambaccini, Andrew) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Recommendations for Scheduling Order. (Liebel, John) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Richard Randolph.(Vigliotti, John) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Vigliotti on behalf of Richard Randolph (Vigliotti, John) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Richard Randolph (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Liebel, John) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED, cc:cl. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2011 at 10:30 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint statement and LR 16.1 certs by 8/17/11. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Springfield, Massachusetts, William Fitchett.(Liebel, John) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Liebel on behalf of City of Springfield, Massachusetts, William Fitchett (Liebel, John) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy C. Flahive on behalf of Guy Larkins (Flahive, Nancy) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Felix Aguirre, City of Springfield, Massachusetts, William Fitchett, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Richard Randolph, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Felix Aguirre, City of Springfield, Massachusetts, Richard Jarvis, Matthew Longo, Julio M. Toledo, Edwin Torres, Richard Ward, William Fitchett, Richard Randolph, filed by Guy Larkins. Filing fee of $350.00 paid. Receipt numer 0101-3213064. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 541 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?