Ali v. City of Springfield
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-30064
District Judge Michael A Ponsor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2019 at 11:55 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Imam Ishmael Ali, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Imam Ishmael Ali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Imam Ishmael Ali +1 413 204 7097
v.
No Logo CITY OF SPRINGFIELD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CITY OF SPRINGFIELD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Liebel +1 413 787 6085 +1 413 787 6173 jliebel@springfieldcityhall.com
No Logo Richard Allen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by williamgcullinan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William G. Cullinan +1 413 732 9080 +1 413 731 1177 law@williamgcullinan.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT of Dismissal in favor of Defendants City of Springfield, et al against Plaintiff Imam Ishmael Ali.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Michael A Ponsor: ORDER entered. ORDER OF DISMISSAL. See the attached order for complete details. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
      Pltf's EXHIBIT in support of his 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Imam Ishmael Ali filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
        Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Imam Ishmael Ali filed.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
          Letter to plaintiff enclosing proper form re: in forma pauperis. Response from plaintiff by 11/28/07 (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
            Pltf's STATUS REPORT by Imam Ishmael Ali filed. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. Re: Requesting plaintiff to either file a status report re: as to intent to proceed/or file appropriate filing fee by 8/15/07 See Order(French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                Not all parties consented to assignment of case to Magistrate Judge Neiman. Case to be reassigned to Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Document not scanned and placed in the vault) (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Liebel on behalf of City of Springfield (Liebel, John) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Cullinan on behalf of Richard Allen (Cullinan, William) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against City of Springfield, Richard Allen by Imam Ishmael Ali received for filing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Cover and category sheets)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                        Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Imam Ishmael Ali filed.(Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 57 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?