USA v. Hamoodi
Criminal Case Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 2:09-cr-04053-NKL

Tags
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 6:06 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Peter Gonzalez +1 573 634 8214 +1 573 634 8723 anthony.gonzalez@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Jefferson City
Filed 12/22/2009
County Cole
Terminated 5/23/2012
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (1). Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration [Doc. # 28] is DENIED. The Court did not misunderstand the facts at sentencing and did not commit any error that would permit it to reconsider its sentence. (Kanies, Renea)
    LREF
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/11/2012 Electronic TranscriptCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi of Sentencing held 5/16/2012 before Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Court Reporter: Katie Wirt, 816-512-5608, katie_wirt@mow.uscourts.gov. Number of pages: 34. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the parties' intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.mow.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. NOTICE: Attorneys must contact the court reporter for copies during this 90 day period. Notice of Intent to File Redaction of Transcripts due by 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2012.(Wirt, Katie)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 5/29/2012, Terminated: 6/20/2012 Motion for Reconsideration
      MOTION for reconsideration by Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/15/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hobbs, James)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: 5/23/2012 Judgment and CommitmentCourt Filing
        JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (1), Count(s) 1, Defendant sentenced on May 16, 2012 to 36 months imprisonment on count 1 followed by 2 years supervised release. No fine. No restitution. $100 special assessment.. Signed on 5/23/12 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.(James, Carrie)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/23/2012 Order on Motion for Downward DepartureCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey: granting [24] motion for downward departure as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (1); SENTENCING held on 5/16/2012 for Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (1), Count(s) 1, Defendant sentenced on May 16, 2012 to 36 months imprisonment on count 1 followed by 2 years supervised release. No fine. No restitution. $100 special assessment. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Katie Wirt, 816-512-5608. (James, Carrie) (Main Document 25 replaced on 5/24/2012. Case number corrected) (James, Carrie).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Case Unsealed
            Case unsealed as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (James, Carrie)
              LREF
              Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012, Terminated: 5/16/2012 Motion for Downward Departure
              MOTION for downward departure by USA as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/29/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kanies, Renea)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: 4/18/2012 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. This is the official notice for this hearing. Sentencing is reset for 5/16/2012 at 02:30 PM (previously set 4/26/12) in District Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                  ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting motion to continue sentencing[21]. The case as to defendants Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi is continued. Sentencing is reset for 4/27/2012 at 11:00 AM in District Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea) Modified on 9/20/2011 to correct year "2012" (Kanies, Renea).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011, Terminated: 9/19/2011 Motion to Continue
                    MOTION to continue by USA as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/3/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kanies, Renea)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                      ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting [19] motion to seal document as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (1) This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011, Terminated: 9/15/2011 ~Motion to Seal Document
                        MOTION to file document under seal by the United States. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/3/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kanies, Renea)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Sentencing Memorandum
                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (Kanies, Renea)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: 5/26/2011 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                            SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. This is the official notice for this hearing. Sentencing is reset for 6/28/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Previously set 6/17/11 in Jefferson City.)This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                              SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. This is the official notice for this hearing. Sentencing previously set for 6/23/2011, is RESET for Friday, 6/17/2011, at 11:00 AM, in District Courtroom, Jefferson City (djc), before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Scheduling conflicts must be addressed within three days of this notice. Motions to continue for reasons other than scheduling conflicts must be filed not less than seven days prior to sentencing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Smith, Fran)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                AMENDED ORDER/ NOTICE OF HEARING entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. This is the official notice for this hearing. ***Motions terminated as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi: [13] MOTION to continue sentencing filed by Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi is granted. Sentencing previously set for 11/10/2010 is RESET for 6/23/2011 at 11:00 AM in District Courtroom, Jefferson City (djc) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Order emailed to counsel for plaintiff and defendant by R.Kanies) This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                  ORDER/ NOTICE OF HEARING entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. This is the official notice for this hearing. ***Motions terminated as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi: [13] MOTION to continue sentencing filed by Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi is granted. Sentencing previously set for 11/10/2010 is RESET for 6/23/2010 at 11:00 AM in District Courtroom, Jefferson City (djc) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Order emailed to counsel for plaintiff and defendant by R.Kanies)This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010, Terminated: 11/3/2010 Motion to Continue
                                    MOTION to continue by Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/19/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kanies, Renea)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. This is the official notice for this hearing. Sentencing set for 11/10/2010 at 11:00 AM in District Courtroom, Jefferson City (djc) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Scheduling conflicts must be addressed within three days of this notice. Motions to continue for reasons other than scheduling conflicts must be filed not less than seven days prior to sentencing.This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt
                                        ACCEPTANCE of Plea of guilty and Adjudication of Guilt as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi, re[6] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. A copy of this order was emailed to jrhobbs@whmlaw.net and anthony.gonzalez@usdoj.gov. (Kanies, Renea)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [7] motion for order to seal case as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 12/22/09. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Bax, Laura)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009, Terminated: 1/13/2010 Report and Recommendations on Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi Objections to R&R due by 1/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 12/23/09.(Price, Jackie)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009 Plea EnteredCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William A. Knox: Plea entered by Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (1) Guilty Count 1., INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi held on 12/22/2009, CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi held on 12/22/2009, ARRAIGNMENT as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (1) Count 1 held on 12/22/2009. AUSA Tony Gonzalez, defendant and his counsel JR Hobbs and Marilyn Keller attended in person. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jackie Price, 573-636-4015. (Price, Jackie) Modified on 12/29/2009 to add TEXT ENTRY ONLY - no document is attached (Price, Jackie).
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Motion for Order
                                                ORAL MOTION for order to seal case by USA & defense counsel as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/8/2010 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bax, Laura)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Knox for a change of plea hearing as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi.. Signed by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey on 12/22/09.(Price, Jackie)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER setting conditions of release as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi. Defendant released on a personal recognizance bond. This document contains original signatures of non attorneys and is being maintained in a paper file at the court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 12/22/09.This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Price, Jackie)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Plea Agreement
                                                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (Price, Jackie)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Information - Felony
                                                        INFORMATION as to Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (1) count(s) 1. (Price, Jackie)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Waiver of Indictment
                                                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Shakir Abdul-Kafi Al A Hamoodi (Price, Jackie)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?