Angelo Richardson v. Eleanor Norton
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 12-5405

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 5:12 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207539465 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1462359] considering Clerk order order by cert/1st class mail [1453028-3], dismissing case for lack of prosecution, withholding issuance of the mandate. [12-5405]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207523175 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1453028] granting motion to extend time [1445945-2]; extending Special Panel order of docketing fee payment [1438707-2] APPELLANT payment of docketing fee due 10/01/2013, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [12-5405]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207511188 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION filed [1445945] by Angelo Richardson to extend time to pay filing fee (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/15/2013) [Service Date: 07/01/2013 by US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [12-5405]
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 44 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?