City of Stockton v. Bank of America, N.A. et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-10350
District Judge Victor Marrero, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 10:34 PM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo City Of Stockton, Plaintiff

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Winters Cotchett +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 jcotchett@cpmlegal.com
Space Joseph Winters Cotchett +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 jcotchett@cpmlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aron K Liang +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 aliang@cpmlegal.com
Space Nanci Eiko Nishimura +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 nnishimura@cpsmlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nanci Eiko Nishimura +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 nnishimura@cpsmlaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/31/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Sterrett +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 dsterrett@cpmlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven N. Williams +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 swilliams@cpmlegal.com

Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Caldes - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 bcaldes@srkw-law.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene A. Spector +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 espector@srkw-law.com

Represented by Spector, Roseman & Kodroff Willis, P.C. (PA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Caldes - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 bcaldes@srkw-law.com

Represented by The Embarcadero

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart George Gross +1 415 671 4628 +1 415 480 6688 sgross@gross-law.com
v.
No Logo AIG Financial Products Corp., Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reginald David Steer +1 415 765 9500 +1 415 765 9501 rsteer@akingump.com
Space Reginald David Steer +1 415 765 9500 +1 415 765 9501 rsteer@akingump.com
No Logo Aig SunAmerica Life Assurance Company, Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reginald David Steer +1 415 765 9500 +1 415 765 9501 rsteer@akingump.com
No Logo Ambac Financial Group, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Jane Marie Metcalf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian N. Lasky +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 bnlasky@pbwt.com

Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. LoBue +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 rplobue@pbwt.com
No Logo Bank of America Securities, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon Matthew Kasley +1 202 626 9116 +1 202 626 3737 skasley@kslaw.com
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/06/2012 Shannon Matthew Kasley +1 202 626 9116 +1 202 626 3737 skasley@kslaw.com

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon Matthew Kasley +1 202 626 9116 +1 202 626 3737 skasley@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia L Maher +1 202 626 5504 +1 202 626 3737 pmaher@kslaw.com
No Logo Bank of America, N.A. et al., Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Sullivan , +1 202 737 0500 +1 202 626 3737 krsullivan@kslaw.com
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co., Defendant

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan A. Kane , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 rkane@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan A. Kane , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 rkane@stblaw.com
No Logo Cain Brother & Company, LLC, Defendant
No Logo CDR Financial Products, Inc., Defendant
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Court Square Capital Ltd.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Officer/Director, Citibank, NA
Officer/Director, Keane, Inc.
Officer/Director, Macdermid Inc.
Officer/Director, Travelers Insurance Co
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Imc Mortgage Co
Officer/Director, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Officer/Director, Pfs Services Inc
Officer/Director, Citicorp Banking Corp
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
Officer/Director, Cvc Partners LLC
Officer/Director, Ness Technologies Inc
Officer/Director, Primerica, Inc.
Officer/Director, Student Loan Corp
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Pimco Corporate Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Salomon Inc
Officer/Director, Jones Energy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cryomedical Sciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, S Y Bancorp Inc
Officer/Director, Scholastic Corp
Officer/Director, Corvel Corp
Officer/Director, Buckle, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Avid Technology, Inc.
Officer/Director, O'reilly Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Healthrite, Inc.
Officer/Director, Smith Midland Corp
Officer/Director, Mitcham Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Tc Group L.l.c.
Darden Restaurants, Inc. Officer/Director, Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Officer/Director, American Tire Corp
Officer/Director, Synalloy Corp
No Logo Feld Winters Financial, LLC, Defendant
No Logo First Southwest Company, Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN E. ROBISON +1 214 698 3370 +1 214 999 7770 BRobison@gibsondunn.com

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alden Lewis Atkins +1 202 639 6613 +1 202 879 8813 aatkins@velaw.com
No Logo FSA Capital Management Services LLC, Defendant
No Logo FSA Capital Services LLC, Defendant
No Logo GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Genworth Financial Investment Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo George K. Baum & Company, Defendant

Represented by Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hoke +1 303 223 1100 +1 303 232 1111 mhoke@bhfs.com

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher C. Javillonar +1 816 374 3200 christopher.javillonar@bryancave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher C. Javillonar +1 816 374 3200 christopher.javillonar@bryancave.com

Represented by One Kansas City Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W Perry Brandt +1 816 374 3200 +1 816 374 3300
No Logo Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., Defendant
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JP Morgan Chase & Co."

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan A. Kane , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 rkane@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peri Lauren Zelig +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pzelig@stblaw.com
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Officer/Director, Goodrich Petroleum Corp
Officer/Director, Peloton Resources Inc

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan A. Kane , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 rkane@stblaw.com
No Logo Kinsell Newcomb & De Dios Inc, Defendant
No Logo MBIA, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin James Perra +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 kperra@proskauer.com
No Logo Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Defendant
Officer/Director, Cumulus Media Inc.
Officer/Director, Lodgian, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Officer/Director, Validus Holdings, Ltd.
Officer/Director, Mk Rail Corp
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Group, Inc
Hertz Global Holdings Inc Officer/Director, Hertz Global Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Trust Co Fsb
Officer/Director, New BlackRock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ithaca Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bibb Co /de
Officer/Director, Digirad Corp
Officer/Director, Chart Industries, Inc.
Merrill Lynch Ventures LLC Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, ML Hertz Co-Investor, L.P.
Officer/Director, GMI Investments, Inc.
Officer/Director, Muniholdings Fund II Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Utility Fund
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Utility Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pioneer Floating Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
No Logo Morgan Keegan & Co. Ltd, Defendant

Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stefan Perovich +1 562 436 2000 +1 562 436 7416 stefan.perovich@kyl.com
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley"
Director, Toy Biz, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pagemart Wireless, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vital Images, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xcyte Therapies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Websense, Inc.
Officer/Director, Silgan Holdings Inc.
Officer/Director, Msci Inc.
Officer/Director, Allegiance Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Wci Communities, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gramercy Capital Corp.
Officer/Director, Discover Financial Services
Officer/Director, Cadiz Land Co Inc
Officer/Director, Ivf America Inc /de
Officer/Director, Jefferson Smurfit Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Imre Corp
Officer/Director, Uniholding Corp
Officer/Director, Cardiac Pathways Corp
Officer/Director, Impsat Corp
Officer/Director, Allscripts Inc /il
Officer/Director, Allscripts Holding Inc
Officer/Director, Psf Group Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, Acquicor Technology Inc
Officer/Director, Constant Contact, Inc.
Officer/Director, Big Entertainment, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Digitalglobe, Inc.
Officer/Director, Remec, Inc.
Officer/Director, Golden Tan, Inc
Officer/Director, Ms Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, NB Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Lazarus Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Texas Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Innocoll Holdings plc
Officer/Director, Visions In Glass Inc
Officer/Director, Bloom Energy Corp
Officer/Director, Leisure Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, Rps Realty Trust
Officer/Director, Symix Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cfw Communications Co
Officer/Director, Saratogo Holdings I Inc
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
No Logo Natixis Funding Corp., Defendant
No Logo Pakerkiss Securities, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Piper Jaffray & Co., Defendant

Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick M. Ralph +1 612 492 6964 +1 612 340 2868 ralph.matthew@dorsey.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirsten E. Schubert +1 612 492 6755 +1 612 340 2868 schubert.kirsten@dorsey.com

Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick M. Ralph +1 612 492 6964 +1 612 340 2868 ralph.matthew@dorsey.com
No Logo Salomon Smith Barney, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Trinity Funding Company, LLC, Defendant
UBS AG UBS AG, Defendant
Officer/Director, Cabletron Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dov Pharmaceutical Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, First South Africa Corp Ltd
Officer/Director, Impsat Corp
Officer/Director, Ubs Capital II Inc
Officer/Director, Dynamic Ventures Inc/canada
Officer/Director, Ip Factory Inc
Officer/Director, Desert Native Designs Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Munivest Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pioneer Floating Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco Municipal Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund

Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse T. Smallwood +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jsmallwood@wc.com
UBS Financial Services, Inc. UBS Financial Services, Inc., Defendant
UBS Securities LLC UBS Securities LLC, Defendant
No Logo Wachovia Bank, NA, Defendant
No Logo Winters & Co. Advisors LLC, Defendant
No Logo XL Asset Funding LLC, Defendant
No Logo XL Life Insurance & Annuity Company, Defendant
No Logo Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nanci Eiko Nishimura +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 nnishimura@cpsmlaw.com

Represented by Spector, Roseman & Kodroff Willis, P.C. (PA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Caldes - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 bcaldes@srkw-law.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (226) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander E. Barnett on behalf of City Of San Jose, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Los Angeles, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Kendal On Hudson, Inc., Los Angeles World Airports, Peconic Landing at Southhold, Inc., Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Sacramento Suburban Water District, San Jose Redevelopment Agency, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles Unified School District, Los Angeles World Airports, Active Retirement Community, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Barnett, Alexander) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION for Imtiaz A. Siddiqui to Withdraw as Attorney (Corrected). Document filed by City Of San Jose, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Los Angeles, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Kendal On Hudson, Inc., Los Angeles World Airports, Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Sacramento Suburban Water District, San Jose Redevelopment Agency, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles Unified School District, Los Angeles World Airports, Active Retirement Community, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Nishimura, Nanci) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION for Aron K. Liang to Withdraw as Attorney (Corrected). Document filed by City Of San Jose, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Los Angeles, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Kendal On Hudson, Inc., Los Angeles World Airports, Peconic Landing at Southhold, Inc., Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Sacramento Suburban Water District, San Jose Redevelopment Agency, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles Unified School District, Los Angeles World Airports, Active Retirement Community, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Nishimura, Nanci) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
        MOTION for Imtiaz A. Siddiqui to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by City Of San Jose, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Los Angeles, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Kendal On Hudson, Inc., Peconic Landing at Southhold, Inc., Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Sacramento Suburban Water District, San Jose Redevelopment Agency, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles Unified School District, Los Angeles World Airports, Active Retirement Community, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Nishimura, Nanci) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION for Aron K. Liang to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by City Of San Jose, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Los Angeles, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Kendal On Hudson, Inc., Los Angeles World Airports, Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Sacramento Suburban Water District, San Jose Redevelopment Agency, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, Peconic Landing at Southhold, Inc., Los Angeles Unified School District, Los Angeles World Airports, Active Retirement Community, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Nishimura, Nanci) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting (1830) Application for the Court to Request Counsel in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al. (js) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: NOW, THEREFORE, pursuant to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, it is hereby ORDERED that: The capitalized terms used herein shall have the meanings set forth in the Agreement. The Court preliminarily approves the Settlement as set forth in the Agreement, including the releases contained therein, as being fair, reasonable and adequate to the Class, subject to the right of any Class Member to challenge the fairness, reasonableness or adequacy of the Agreement and to show cause, if any exists, why a final judgment dismissing this Action against Defendant, and ordering the release of the Released Claims against Releasees, should not be entered after due and adequate notice to the Class as set forth in the Agreement and after a hearing on final approval. The Court hereby schedules a hearing to occur on June 6, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11B at 500 Pearl Street to determine whether (i) the proposed Settlement as set forth in the Agreement, should be finally approved as fair, reasonable and adequate pursuant to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23; (ii) an order approving the Agreement and a Final Judgment should be entered; and (iii) the application of Class Plaintiffs' Counsel for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses in this matter should be approved. All papers in support of final approval of the Settlement shall be filed thirty (30) days before the fairness hearing. No later than twenty (20) days before the hearing, all papers shall be filed and served by objectors or persons other than the parties to this Action. No later than seven (7) days before the hearing, all relevant reply papers shall be filed and served by the parties to this Action. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/12/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(rsh) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: NOW, THEREFORE, pursuant to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, it is hereby ORDERED that: The capitalized terms used herein shall have the meanings set forth in the Agreement. The Court preliminarily approves the Settlement as set forth in the Agreement, including the releases contained therein, as being fair, reasonable and adequate to the Class, subject to the right of any Class Member to challenge the fairness, reasonableness or adequacy of the Agreement and to show cause, if any exists, why a final judgment dismissing the Action against Defendant, and ordering the release of the Released Claims against Releasees, should not be entered after due and adequate notice to the Class as set forth in the Agreement and after a hearing on final approval. The Court hereby schedules a hearing to occur on June 6, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11B at 500 Pearl Street to determine whether (i) the proposed Settlement as set forth in the Agreement, should be finally approved as fair, reasonable and adequate pursuant to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23; (ii) an order approving the Agreement and a Final Judgment should be entered; and (iii) the application of Class Plaintiffs' Counsel for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses in this matter should be approved. All papers in support of final approval of the Settlement shall be filed thirty (30) days before the fairness hearing. No later than twenty (20) days before the hearing, all papers shall be filed and served by objectors or persons other than the parties to the Action. No later than seven (7) days before the hearing, all relevant reply papers shall be filed and served by the parties to the Action. (Settlement Conference set for 6/6/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/12/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(rsh). (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Rule 41(8)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiffs as listed in Exhibit A and Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (f/k/a Wachovia Bank, N.A.) and Wells Fargo'" Company, subject to the order of the Court, that each and every claim asserted in the above-captioned actions against Defendants Wells Fargo Bank. N.A. (f/k/a Wachovia Bank, N.A.) and Wells Fargo & Company only are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shallbear their own costs and attorneys' fees. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER re: (DE 1792 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF RYAN A. KANE: It is hereby ordered that the Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance of Ryan A. Kane on behalf of Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, and Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc. is granted (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF SONIA K. PFAFFENROTH: It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance of Sonia K. Pfaffenroth on behalf of Defendants Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., and General Electric Capital Corp. (collectively, "GE/Trinity") is granted. Attorneys Craig Stewart, DouglasL. Wald, John A. Freedman, Laura Cofer Taylor, and Arpan Sura of the law firm Arnold & Porter LLP will continue to appear on behalf of GE/Trinity. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/8/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        JOINT REPORT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DISCOVERY AND ORDER FOR SCHEDULING: Pursuant to this Court's May 2, 2013 Order, the parties submit for this Court's consideration this Joint Report Regarding the Status of Discovery and Proposals for Scheduling as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(lmb) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MEMO ENDORSED ON MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/31/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(js) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: It is hereby ordered that the motion for withdrawal of the appearance of Daniel R. Sterrett is GRANTED; and the Court further directs the Clerk to remove Daniel R. Sterrett from the docket in the above noted cases. It is So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/31/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(js) (js). (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Daniel R. Sterrett to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by City Of San Jose, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Los Angeles, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Kendal On Hudson, Inc., Los Angeles World Airports, Peconic Landing at Southhold, Inc., Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Sacramento Suburban Water District, San Jose Redevelopment Agency, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles Unified School District, Los Angeles World Airports, Active Retirement Community, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Nishimura, Nanci) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Now therefore, It is hereby stipulated and agreed, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between Plaintiffs as listed in Exhibit A and Defendant First Southwest Company, subject to the Order of the Court, that Defendant First Southwest Company only is voluntarily dismissed from the Actions without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian David Waller on behalf of CDR Financial Products Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Waller, Brian) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin Ann Van Der Meulen on behalf of City of Baltimore, Maryland Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Van Der Meulen, Robin) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Scott Asciolla on behalf of City of Baltimore, Maryland Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Asciolla, Gregory) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay L. Himes on behalf of City of Baltimore, Maryland Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Himes, Jay) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Ronald S. Rauchberg as counsel for defendant MBIA, Inc.. Document filed by MBIA, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Rauchberg, Ronald) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Class Plaintiffs' Counsel shall receive a total of $24,572,500 in attorneys' fees to be paid out of settlement funds created by two separate settlement agreements reached with (a) defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc. (n/k/a J.P. Morgan Securities LLC) and Bear Stearns & Co., Inc. (n/k/a J.P. Morgan Securities LLC) ("JPMorgan") and (b) defendants Wachovia Bank, N.A., n/k/a Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Wells Fargo & Company ("Wachovia") (the "Settlements"). 2. Class Plaintiffs' Counsel shall be reimbursed $71,796.67 in costs and expenses reasonably incurred in the presentation and settlement of this litigation, to be paid out of the settlement funds created by the Settlements. 3. Class Plaintiffs' current Lead Counsel (consisting of Hausfeld LLP, Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP, and Susman Godfrey, LLP) shall have the sole authority to allocate and distribute any attorneys' fees and expenses awarded pursuant to this Order from the Settlements in a manner which, in the opinion of Lead Counsel, fairly compensates the Class Plaintiffs' Counsel's firms for their services. 4. An incentive award of $40,000, to be paid equally out of settlement funds created by the Settlements ($120,000 from each Settlement), shall be paid to each of the following named Class Plaintiffs: the City of Baltimore, Maryland; the University of Mississippi Medical Center; the University of Southern Mississippi; the University of Mississippi; the Central Bucks School District; and the Bucks County Water & Sewer Authority. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(lmb) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with prejudice, all claims against Defendants Bank of America, N.A., and Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc, with the parties bearing their own attorneys' fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(cd) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that defendant Morgan Stanley only is voluntarily dismissed from the Actions with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(cd) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER APPROVING NOTICE PLAN AND FORMS RELATED TO SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT JPMORGAN granting 1702 Motion to Approve to Approve Class Plaintiffs' Notice Plan and Forms Related to Settlement with Defendant JPMorgan in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. It is hereby Ordered that the motion is granted. It is further Ordered as follows: The Court approves the proposed Notice Program, including the JPMorgan Cover Letter, Long Form Notice ("Direct Notice"), and Short Form Notice ("Publication Notice"), attached as Exhibits A-C, respectively, to the Declaration of Katherine Livesay, and approves the form of the Banner Advertisement previously submitted (see Docket No. 1513-7). The Court finds that the manner of distribution of the Notice set forth below constitutes the best practicable notice under the circumstances as well as valid, due and sufficient notice to all persons entitled thereto and complies fully with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 and the due process requirements of the United States Constitution. On or before July 11, 2012, Class Counsel shall cause the Notice, in substantially the same form as Exhibits A-B referenced above, to be mailed by first class mail, postage prepaid, to all members of the proposed Settlement Class, including those identified by the Settling Defendants. For this Settlement, a hearing (the "Final Fairness Hearing") shall be held by this Court on December 14, 2012 at 2:00 p.m., before the Honorable Victor Marrero at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl St., New York, NY 10007-1312 to make a final determination whether the proposed Settlement Agreement is fair, adequate, and reasonable to the Settlement Class and should be approved by the Court, and whether JPMorgan should be released from all claims, as provided in the Settlement Agreement. The Court may adjourn this Final Fairness Hearing without further notice to members of the Class; as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(mro) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER APPROVING NOTICE PLAN AND FORMS RELATED TO SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO: I. The Court approves the proposed Notice Program, including the Wells Fargo Cover Letter, Long Form Notice ("Direct Notice"), and Short Form Notice ("Publication Notice"), attached as Exhibits A-C, respectively, to the Declaration of Katherine Livesay, and approves the form of the Banner Advertisement previously submitted (see Docket No. 1513-7). The Court finds that the manner of distribution of the Notice set forth below constitutes the best practicable notice under the circumstances as well as valid, due and sufficient notice to all persons entitled thereto and complies fully with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 and the due process requirements of the United States Constitution. 2. On or before July 11, 2012, Class Counsel shall cause the Notice, in substantially the same form as Exhibits A-8 referenced above, to be mailed by first class mail, postage prepaid, to all members of the proposed Settlement Class, including those identified by the Settling Defendants. 7. Class Counsel shall file with the Court their motion for final approval of the Proposed Settlement Agreement within 10 calendar days prior to the date of the Final Fairness Hearing. 8. The litigation against Wells Fargo is stayed except as otherwise required by the Wells Fargo Settlement Agreement. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/13/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(djc) Modified on 6/21/2012 (djc). (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting (1690) Motion to Approve Class Action Settlement in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. Pursuant to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The capitalized terms used herein shall have the meanings set forth in the Agreement. 2. The Court preliminarily approves the Settlement as set forth in the Agreement, including the releases contained therein, as being fair, reasonable and adequate to the Class, subject to the right of any Class Member to challenge the fairness, reasonableness or adequacy of the Agreement and to show cause, if any exists, why a final judgment dismissing the Action against Defendant, and ordering the release of the Released Claims against Releasees, should not be entered after due and adequate notice to the Class as set forth in the Agreement and after a hearing on final approval and as further set forth in this order. The Fairness Hearing shall take place on December 14, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. to determine whether (i) the proposed Settlement as set forth in the Agreement, should be finally approved as fair, reasonable and adequate pursuant to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23; (ii) an order approving the Agreement and a Final Judgment should be entered; and (iii) the application of Class Plaintiffs' Counsel for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses in this matter should be approved. All papers in support of final approval of the Settlement shall be filed thirty (30) days before the fairness hearing. No later than twenty (20) days before the hearing, all papers shall be filed and served by objectors or persons other than the parties to the Action. No later than seven (7) days before the hearing, all relevant reply papers shall be filed and served by the parties to the Action. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/4/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(lmb) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Hinds County, Mississippi, State of Mississippi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Shaw, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/11/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/23/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 11/23/2011 before Judge Victor Marrero. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: granting (1638) Motion to Approve class action settlement in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. It is hereby ordered that: 1. The capitalized terms used herein shall have the meanings set forth in the Agreement. 2. The Court preliminarily approves the Settlement as set forth in the Agreement, including the releases contained therein, as being fair, reasonable and adequate to the Class, subject to the right of any Class Member to challenge the fairness, reasonableness or adequacy of the Agreement and to show cause, if any exists, why a final judgment dismissing the Action against Defendant, and ordering the release of the Released Claim against Releasees, should not be entered after due and adequate notice to the Class as set forth in the Agreement and after a hearing on final approval. 3. The Court finds that the Agreement was entered into at arm's length by highly experienced counsel and is sufficiently within the range of reasonableness that notice of the Agreement should be given as provided in the Agreement. 4. The Court conditionally certifies the Class (set forth herein) for purposes of the Settlement as to Defendant, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/27/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(lmb) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  AMENDED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT re: (1654 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG)that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 the Court enters judgment settling action as to defendant Morgan Stanley. Judgment, (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/27/11) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(dt) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT WINTERS & CO. ADVISORS, LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/15/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(jar) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Gerard Eisler on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Grant & Eisenhofer P.A., 123 Justison Street, Wilmington, DE, USA 19801, 302-622-7100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Eisler, Robert) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 the Court enters judgment settling action as to defendant Morgan Stanley. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/23/11) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(ml) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting (1648) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rachel Allison Gupta terminated in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to amend the Court's records accordingly.(Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/16/2011). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(djc) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter dated October 25, 2011 from the one of the counsel for the Class Plaintiffs. Any party wishing to respond to this letter shall do so by November 1,2011. Any reply letter may be submitted by noon on November 3, 2011. Conference set for 11/4/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/26/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer on October 24, 2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wachovia Bank N.A., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Wheeler, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                DECLARATION of David M. Ellis in Support re: (111 in 1:08-cv-06304-VM, 71 in 1:08-cv-07355-VM, 133 in 1:10-cv-00629-VM, 131 in 1:10-cv-00628-VM, 171 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 125 in 1:08-cv-05492-VM, 83 in 1:10-cv-04989-VM, 180 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 171 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 105 in 1:09-cv-01199-VM, 72 in 1:08-cv-07034-VM, 82 in 1:10-cv-04988-VM, 1603 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 174 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 81 in 1:10-cv-08273-VM, 82 in 1:10-cv-00769-VM, 185 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 82 in 1:10-cv-04990-VM, 114 in 1:08-cv-06342-VM, 136 in 1:08-cv-03002-VM, 129 in 1:10-cv-00627-VM, 82 in 1:10-cv-04987-VM, 58 in 1:11-cv-00682-VM, 84 in 1:10-cv-04991-VM, 112 in 1:08-cv-06341-VM, 40 in 1:11-cv-01019-VM, 130 in 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 67 in 1:08-cv-06140-VM, 111 in 1:08-cv-06142-VM, 65 in 1:11-cv-00361-VM, 131 in 1:10-cv-00630-VM, 125 in 1:08-cv-05493-VM, 160 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM) MOTION Modify Judge Gorenstein's September 27, 2011 Order re: (1590 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. MOTION Modify Judge Gorenstein's September 27, 2011 Order re: (1590 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Hinds County, Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Shaw, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (111 in 1:08-cv-06304-VM, 71 in 1:08-cv-07355-VM, 133 in 1:10-cv-00629-VM, 131 in 1:10-cv-00628-VM, 171 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 125 in 1:08-cv-05492-VM, 83 in 1:10-cv-04989-VM, 180 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 171 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 105 in 1:09-cv-01199-VM, 72 in 1:08-cv-07034-VM, 82 in 1:10-cv-04988-VM, 174 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 81 in 1:10-cv-08273-VM, 82 in 1:10-cv-00769-VM, 185 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 82 in 1:10-cv-04990-VM, 114 in 1:08-cv-06342-VM, 129 in 1:10-cv-00627-VM, 82 in 1:10-cv-04987-VM, 58 in 1:11-cv-00682-VM, 84 in 1:10-cv-04991-VM, 112 in 1:08-cv-06341-VM, 40 in 1:11-cv-01019-VM, 130 in 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 67 in 1:08-cv-06140-VM, 111 in 1:08-cv-06142-VM, 65 in 1:11-cv-00361-VM, 131 in 1:10-cv-00630-VM, 125 in 1:08-cv-05493-VM, 160 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM) MOTION Modify Judge Gorenstein's September 27, 2011 Order re: (1590 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. MOTION Modify Judge Gorenstein's September 27, 2011 Order re: (1590 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Hinds County, Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Shaw, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MOTION Modify Judge Gorenstein's September 27, 2011 Order re: (1590 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hinds County, Mississippi.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Shaw, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: Plaintiffs' Counsel shall receive a total of $1.55 million dollars from the Morgan Stanley Settlement Agreement (equaling $1,484,494.17 in expenses and costs, and legal fees of $65,505.83). Class Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel shall have authority to distribute any attorneys' fees and expenses awarded from the settlement in a manner which, in the opinion of Lead Counsel, fairly compensates the Plaintiffs' Counsel's firms for their services as described in the Declaration. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/6/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(ft) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying (1573) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG; denying (129) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-03002-VM; denying (118) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-05492-VM; denying (118) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-05493-VM; denying (61) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-06140-VM; denying (104) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-06142-VM; denying (104) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-06304-VM; denying (123) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-06340-VM; denying (105) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-06341-VM; denying (107) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-06342-VM; denying (66) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-07034-VM; denying (65) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-07355-VM; denying (178) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-10350-VM; denying (173) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-10351-VM; denying (164) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:09-cv-01196-VM; denying (164) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:09-cv-01195-VM; denying (167) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:09-cv-01197-VM; denying (98) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:09-cv-01199-VM; denying (153) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:09-cv-10102-VM; denying (122) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-00627-VM; denying (124) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-00628-VM; denying (126) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-00629-VM; denying (124) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-00630-VM; denying (75) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-00769-VM; denying (75) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-04987-VM; denying (75) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-04988-VM; denying (76) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-04989-VM; denying (75) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-04990-VM; denying (77) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-04991-VM; denying (72) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:10-cv-08273-VM; denying (58) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:11-cv-00361-VM; denying (51) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:11-cv-00682-VM; denying (33) Motion for In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order in case 1:11-cv-01019-VM: For the reasons set forth on this Order, the Clerk is directed to mark the motion docketed as #1573 as denied. Annexed hereto is the final version of the Notice Packet as approved by the Court. The Court finds that this revision discloses to the eligible counterparties "the nature of any remedies that may be available to them as putative class members in MDL No. 1950 and the attendant consequences of electing to opt in to the State Agreement" and that it does so "in clear, concise and neutral terms." (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 9/27/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al. (ab) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/11/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 5/11/2011 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION of Shannon R. Wheatman, PHD in Support re: (124 in 1:10-cv-00628-VM, 122 in 1:10-cv-00627-VM, 178 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 153 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 1573 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 105 in 1:08-cv-06341-VM, 76 in 1:10-cv-04989-VM, 65 in 1:08-cv-07355-VM, 164 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 75 in 1:10-cv-04988-VM, 164 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 129 in 1:08-cv-03002-VM, 123 in 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 118 in 1:08-cv-05492-VM, 167 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 104 in 1:08-cv-06304-VM, 75 in 1:10-cv-04990-VM, 124 in 1:10-cv-00630-VM, 107 in 1:08-cv-06342-VM, 173 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 75 in 1:10-cv-00769-VM, 77 in 1:10-cv-04991-VM, 66 in 1:08-cv-07034-VM, 126 in 1:10-cv-00629-VM, 58 in 1:11-cv-00361-VM, 51 in 1:11-cv-00682-VM, 61 in 1:08-cv-06140-VM, 33 in 1:11-cv-01019-VM, 72 in 1:10-cv-08273-VM, 75 in 1:10-cv-04987-VM, 118 in 1:08-cv-05493-VM, 98 in 1:09-cv-01199-VM, 104 in 1:08-cv-06142-VM) MOTION In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order (Dkt. 1565) re: (1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order, Set Deadlines,,. MOTION In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order (Dkt. 1565) re: (1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order, Set Deadlines,,.. Document filed by Mississippi Department of Transportation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Shaw, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (124 in 1:10-cv-00628-VM, 122 in 1:10-cv-00627-VM, 178 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 153 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 1573 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 105 in 1:08-cv-06341-VM, 76 in 1:10-cv-04989-VM, 65 in 1:08-cv-07355-VM, 164 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 75 in 1:10-cv-04988-VM, 164 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 129 in 1:08-cv-03002-VM, 123 in 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 118 in 1:08-cv-05492-VM, 167 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 104 in 1:08-cv-06304-VM, 75 in 1:10-cv-04990-VM, 124 in 1:10-cv-00630-VM, 107 in 1:08-cv-06342-VM, 173 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 75 in 1:10-cv-00769-VM, 77 in 1:10-cv-04991-VM, 66 in 1:08-cv-07034-VM, 126 in 1:10-cv-00629-VM, 58 in 1:11-cv-00361-VM, 51 in 1:11-cv-00682-VM, 61 in 1:08-cv-06140-VM, 33 in 1:11-cv-01019-VM, 72 in 1:10-cv-08273-VM, 75 in 1:10-cv-04987-VM, 118 in 1:08-cv-05493-VM, 98 in 1:09-cv-01199-VM, 104 in 1:08-cv-06142-VM) MOTION In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order (Dkt. 1565) re: (1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order, Set Deadlines,,. MOTION In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order (Dkt. 1565) re: (1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order, Set Deadlines,,.. Document filed by Mississippi Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Shaw, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION In Response to the Court's August 18, 2011 Order (Dkt. 1565) re: (1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1565 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Order, Set Deadlines,,. Document filed by Mississippi Department of Transportation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Shaw, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin James Perra on behalf of MBIA, Inc., MBIA, Inc., MBIA Inc Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Perra, Kevin) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: that the Goldman Sachs Defendants are voluntarily dismissed from these actions without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/19/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al. (ft) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from William Christopher Carmody dated 7/7/2011 re: Class Plaintiffs write to inform the Court that they realized late yesterday that the definition of the class in the settlement agreement is slightly different from the description of the class in the settlement notice. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Class Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/12/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al. (ft) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, by and among Plaintiffs in the Actions and Defendant Rabobank that Rabobank only is voluntarily dismissed from the Actions without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group and Rabobank Group terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/26/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(mro) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that Rabobank's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to a date to be determined by the Court, if necessary, following its consideration of the Stipulations. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby Stipulated and agreed, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41, by and among Plaintiffs in the Actions and Defendant Rabobank that Rabobank only is voluntarily dismissed from the Actions without prejudice, with the parties to bear their on attorneys' fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and Goldman Sachs, subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: Goldman Sachs need not respond to any of the Complaints until August 22, 2011. Goldman Sachs Bank USA answer due 8/22/2011; Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products LP answer due 8/22/2011; The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. answer due 8/22/2011; Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P. answer due 8/22/2011; The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. answer due 8/22/2011; The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. answer due 8/22/2011; Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products LP answer due 8/22/2011; The Goldman Sachs Group Inc. answer due 8/22/2011; Goldman Sachs Group Inc. answer due 8/22/2011; The Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P. answer due 8/22/2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/19/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(pl) Modified on 7/20/2011 (pl).Goldman (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among Plaintiff State of West Virginia, Public Entity Plaintiffs and Rabobank that Rabobank may file its answer or otherwise respond to the complaints on or before July 22, 2011. (Rabobank Group answer due 7/22/2011; Rabobank Group answer due 7/22/2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/8/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al. (djc) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER APPROVING NOTICE PLAN AND FORMS, granting (1492) Motion in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG. It is FURTHER ORDERED as follows: The Court approves the proposed Notice Program, including the Cover Letter, Long Form Notice ("Direct Notice"), the Short Form Notice ("Publication Notice"), and Banner Advertisement attached as Exhibits 3, 4, 5, and 7, respectively, to the Declaration of Katherine Kinsella. The Court finds that the manner of mailing of the Notice set forth below constitutes the best practicable notice under the circumstances as well as valid, due and sufficient notice to all persons entitled thereto and complies fully with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 and the due process requirements of the United States Constitution. On or before July 11, 2011, Class Counsel shall cause the Notice, in substantially the same form as Exhibits 3 and 4 referenced above, to be mailed by first class mail, postage prepaid, to all members of the proposed Settlement Class, including those identified by the Settling Defendants. Class Counsel shall also provide a copy of the Notice to all persons who request it and shall post a copy of the Notice on the Internet at the address identified in the Notice. Class Counsel shall notify counsel for Morgan Stanley of all members of the Settlement Class who elect to opt out of the Settlement Class or object to the Settlement Agreement within five business days of the deadline for same. A hearing (the "Final Fairness Hearing") shall be held by this Court on November 23, 2011 at 9:30 a.m., before the Honorable Victor Marrero at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl St., New York, NY 10007-1312 to make a final determination whether the proposed Settlement Agreement is fair, adequate, and reasonable to the Settlement Class and should be approved by the Court, and whether Morgan Stanley should be released from all claims, as provided in the Settlement Agreement. The Court may adjourn this Final Fairness Hearing without further notice to members of the Class. Class Counsel shall file with the Court their motion for final approval of the Proposed Settlement Agreement within 10 days prior to the date of the Final Fairness Hearing. The litigation against Morgan Stanley is stayed except as otherwise required by the Settlement Agreement. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/29/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(pl) Modified on 6/30/2011 (pl). (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER APPROVING NOTICE PLAN AND FORMS: The Court approves the proposed Notice Program,as set forth in this Order. On or before July 11, 2011, Class Counsel shall cause the Notice, in substantially the same form as Exhibits 3 and 4 referenced above, to be mailed by first class mail, postage prepaid, to all members of the proposed Settlement Class, including those identified by the Settling Defendants. A hearing (the Final Fairness Hearing) shall be held by this Court on November 23, 2011 at 9:30 am, before Judge Victor Marrero, as set forth in this Order.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/29/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Kenneth I. Schacter dated 6/6/11 re: counsel for Defendant Royal Bank of Canada ("RBC") write to respond briefly to the June 2, 2011 letter submitted by theCotchett Plaintiffs in response to the Court's endorsed Order dated May 26, 2011,directing Plaintiffs to show cause why their claims against RBC should not be dismissedas barred by the statute of limitations. For these reasons and those set forth in RBC's May 26, 2011 letter, the Cotchett Complaints are time-barred and should be dismissed. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Defendant Royal Bank of Canada ("RBC"). (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/6/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(pl) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          PUBLIC ENTITY PLAINTIFFS' ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: The withdrawal of appearance of Stuart G. Gross is hereby GRANTED; and the Court further directs the Clerk to remove Stuart G. Gross from the docket in the above noted cases. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(tro) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            PUBLIC ENTITY PLAINTIFFS' ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: It is hereby ordered that the withdrawal of appearance of Stuart G. Gross is hereby GRANTED; and the Court further directs the Clerk to remove Stuart G. Gross from the docket in the above noted cases. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Megan E. Jones dated 6/6/2011 re: Counsel for the Class Plaintiffs writes to inform the Court that Defendant Bank of America has not produced its customer address list. Therefore, Class Plaintiffs request that the deadline for notice of the Morgan Stanley Settlement, be extended accordingly. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. Defendant Bank of America is directed to produce the customer address list described herein by 6/10/2011 or to show cause by that date why it has failed to produce such list. The deadline for notice of the Morgan Stanley Settlement is extended to a date ten days from the receipt by Class Plaintiffs of the list in question. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/6/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al. (ab) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alden Lewis Atkins on behalf of First Southwest Company. New Address: Vinson & Elkins LLP, 2200 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Suite 500 - West, Washington, DC, USA 20037, 202-639-6613. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Atkins, Alden) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re: (1295 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,, (1310 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,, (1296 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,, (1297 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,, (1292 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,, (1308 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,, (1301 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,, (1306 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,, (1299 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,, Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant MBIA Inc. to the Captioned Complaints. Document filed by MBIA, Inc., MBIA, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Rauchberg, Ronald) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re: (1295 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,, (1297 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,, (1292 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,, (1296 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,, (1308 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,, (1301 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,, (1306 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,, (1299 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Amended Complaint,,,,,,, - Answer of JPMorgan Chase & Co. and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC to the Captioned Amended Complaints (with Certificate of Service). Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by First Southwest Company.(Atkins, Alden) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS: It is hereby Stipulated and agreed that Rabobank may file its answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 6/24/11. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/27/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER: As stated at a conference held on May 11, 2011, plaintiffs are directed to provide their comments to Judge Marrero on the proposed notice concerning the settlement agreement between Bank of America and the Attorneys General within one week of their receipt of the class list that is being provided by the New York State Attorney General. Defendants are to submit any response to those comments within one week thereafter. As part of their submission to Judge Marrero, plaintiffs are free to note that the undersigned declined to order certain discovery sought by plaintiffs (on burdensomeness, confidentiality and privilege grounds), and to argue that they require such discovery in order to submit additional comments on certain topic areas. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Seth Ard dated 5/9/11 re: UBS AG has acted to circumvent the authority of this Court by purporting to settle municipal derivatives claims against it in an opt in settlement with the Attorneys General of 25 states that compromises the ability of Class Counsel to manage MDL No 1950. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants and interested parties are directed to respond by 5/11/11 to the matters set forth above by class counsel. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/9/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(cd) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alden Lewis Atkins on behalf of First Southwest Company Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Atkins, Alden) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER. With respect to the plaintiffs' request for discovery as described in their letter of April 13, 2011, the Court will benefit from hearing the parties' views as to (1) the burdensomeness of providing on a short timetable the specific information being sought by plaintiffs; and (2) the relevance of the information to the effectuation of Judge Marrero's Order of March 1, 2011. The parties responding to this Order shall submit letters simultaneously on May 3, 2011. Parties may respond to any other parties' letter on or before May 6, 2011. No party's letter to the Court shall be more than five typewritten pages. Oral argument will be held on May 11, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Bank of America shall transmit a copy of this Order to the New York Attorney General's Office, which has leave to submit letters in accordance with this Order. Copies of any letters sent pursuant to this Order shall be sent to that Office. SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 5/11/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/26/11); Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al. (djc) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The letters dated April 13, 14, and 15 regarding plaintiffs' request for discovery do not provide sufficient information for the Court to resolve the discovery dispute reflected therein, which has been referred to the undersigned for resolution. The parties are directed to confer immediately to determine if the dispute can be resolved without Court intervention. If it cannot be so resolved, the parties are directed to write to the Court with either a joint proposal or separate proposals as to how they wish to present the dispute to the Court for resolution whether it be by letter, formal motion or otherwise - and on what timetable. On a separate point, the Court has received no response to the letter dated April 12, 2011 from the Antitrust Division. To the extent any party wishes to be heard on the request contained in the April 12 letter, it shall send a letter to the Court on or before April 27, 2011. The Antitrust Division may reply on or before May 4, 2011. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al. (lnl) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC ENTITY PLAINTIFFS' LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS AND CONCERNING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES THERETO: Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(b) Plaintiffs have leave to file the Amended Complaints. Defendants' previously filed Answers to the complaints of Plaintiffs operative as of the date of this stipulation shall be deemed to apply to the Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs, and Defendants shall not be obligated to Answer the Amended. Complaints except as described herein; Defendants' answers to the applicable new allegations listed in the Correlation Chart of New Allegations,attached hereto as Exhibit A, whether answered as part of a Defendant's answer to the JFSAC or otherwise answered, shall be deemed to apply to each of the other corresponding paragraphs of the Amended Complaints, as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that No Defendant need answer or otherwise respond to the above captioned Complaints until 30 days following a ruling by the MDL 1950 Court on the motions to dismiss currently pending in State of West Virginia v. Bank of America, N.A., et al., No. 10-cv-769, as set forth in this stipulation. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/4/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING CLASS PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS MORGAN STANLEY'S ADDENDUM TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: The terms of the August 27, 2010 Settlement Agreement, as modified by the Addendum, are hereby preliminarily approved as being fair, reasonable, and adequate to the Settlement Class, subject to the fairness hearing described in the Court's January 14, 2011 Order Granting Preliminary Approval. All deadlines in this Court's January 14, 2011 Order Granting Preliminary Approval of the Settlement between Class Plaintiffs and Morgan Stanley are hereby extended by 30 calendar days. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/4/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Richardson on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminister Bank, PLC, National Westminster Bank, Plc, National Westministerbank PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank, PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminister Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank Plc, National Westminster Bank plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Richardson, Mark) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Everett Swartz on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminister Bank, PLC, National Westminster Bank, Plc, National Westministerbank PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank, PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminister Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank Plc, National Westminster Bank plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Swartz, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The stay reflected in the May 27, 2010 Order remains in effect, with the following modifications: Plaintiffs and defendants in any of the Consolidated Cases may seek to depose on any topic related to this case of the approximately 100 individuals who are identified on the Department of Justice, Antitrust Division's ("The Division") List of Permitted Deponents. The Division shall provide the list to counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants within two days of the entry of this Order. the list shall not be disclosed to anyone other than internal and external counsel for the parties. All other provisions as further set forth in this order. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM DECISION: The Government has made an application to extend the stay of discovery in this matter. Having considered the briefing and having applied the factors relevant to this determination the Government's application is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in a separate Order being issued today. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSES TO CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS: Goldman Sachs need not respond to any of the Complaints until June 6, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/15/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Councel of Stuart G. Gross. Document filed by City Of San Jose, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Los Angeles, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Sacramento Suburban Water District, San Jose Redevelopment Agency, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Nishimura, Nanci) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSES TO COMPLAINTS: Defendants need not respond to the New or Amended Complaints until 17 days after the date by which all of the Amended Complaints are filed upon filing of a further stipulation in accordance with the Court's ruling at the February 2, 2011 hearing; in the event that any Defendant files a Motion to Dismiss a New or Amended Complaint, opposition papers. This extension and briefing schedule is available to all named Defendants and Plaintiffs without further stipulation. This Stipulation shall not act to shorten the time for response of any Defendant that would otherwise have a longer time to respond to the New and Amended Complaints pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or any applicable local rules, and shall be without prejudice to any Defendant's right to seek an additional extension of time to respond to the New and Amended Complaints. No defense of JPMorgan or any other Defendant to this action is prejudiced or waived by its submission of this stipulation. This Stipulation may be executed in separate counterparts, and counterparts may be executed in facsimile form, each of which shall be an original. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/1/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSES TO COMPLAINTS, that 1. Defendants need not respond to the New or Amended Complaints until 17 days after the date by which all of the Amended Complaints are filed upon filing of a further stipulation in accordance with the Court's ruling at the February 2, 2011 hearing; 2. In the event that any Defendant files a Motion to Dismiss a New or Amended Complaint opposition papers shall be due 60 days after the service of such motion, and reply papers shall be due 30 days after the service of opposition papers. 3. This extension and briefing schedule is available to all named Defendants and Plaintiffs without further stipulation; 4. This Stipulation shall not act to shorten the time for response of any Defendant that would otherwise have a longer time to respond to the New and Amended Complaints pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or any applicable local rules, and shall be without prejudice to any Defendant's right to seek an additional extension of time to respond to the New and Amended Complaints; Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/25/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(pl) Modified on 2/28/2011 (pl). (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Attorney Daniel R. Sterrett is admitted to practice pro has vice as counsel for the above captioned case. Attorney Daniel R. Sterrett for City of Los Angeles, Daniel R. Sterrett for City of Richmond, Daniel R. Sterrett for City of Riverside, Daniel R. Sterrett for City of Stockton, Daniel R. Sterrett for County of Contra Costa, Daniel R. Sterrett for County of San Diego, Daniel R. Sterrett for County of San Mateo, Daniel R. Sterrett for County of Tulare, Daniel R. Sterrett for East Bay Municipal Utility District, Daniel R. Sterrett for Los Angeles World Airports, Daniel R. Sterrett for Peconic Landing at Southhold, Inc.,Daniel R. Sterrett for Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Daniel R. Sterrett for Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Daniel R. Sterrett for Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Daniel R. Sterrett for Sacramento Suburban Water District, Daniel R. Sterrett for The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Daniel R. Sterrett for The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al. (lnl) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Attorney Kirsten E. Schubert for Piper Jaffray & Co.,Kirsten E. Schubert for Piper Jaffray & Co. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Attorney F. Matthew Ralph for Piper Jaffray & Co.,F. Matthew Ralph for Piper Jaffray & Co. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. A conference to discuss the Government's request for an extension of the stay will be held on March 3, 2011, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Only parties that submitted papers to the Court will be heard at the conference. No other party is required to attend. Parties wishing to attend by telephone shall comply with the proceduresoutlined in the July 30, 2010 Order. Liaison counsel for defendants is directed to inform the Government of this Order. (Status Conference set for 3/3/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/17/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(djc) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING AUTHORITY AND JURISDICTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFEREE COURTS TO ENFORCE AND/OR MODIFY THE MASTER PROTECTIVE ORDER. Pursuant to this Court's Order dated November 4, 2010 (Docket # 1177) regarding the Master Protective Order in the above captioned coordinated proceedings (Docket # 296), the Court HEREBY ORDERS: 1. With respect to the issue of which court has jurisdiction to enforce or modify the Master Protective Order following the remand or transfer of an action coordinated under MDL 1950 to another court ("Remand/Transferee Court"), Paragraphs 13 and 20 of the Master Protective Order do not detract from the jurisdiction otherwise held by a Remand/Transferee Court to enforce or modify the terms of that order.2. Accordingly, any challenges concerning the enforcement or modification of the Master Protective Order that arise in an action following its remand or transfer shall be brought in, and heard by, the Remand/Transferee Court in which it is then proceeding. 3. The attached Exhibit A shall replace the existing Exhibit A to the Master Protective Order so that signatories to the Acknowledgment of Protective Order Governing Confidential Material shall consent to the jurisdiction of any transferee or remand Court in addition to this Court to enforce the terms of the Master Protective Order. Any existing signatories of the prior Exhibit A shall sign the attached revised Exhibit A. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/9/11); Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(djc) Modified on 2/22/2011 (djc). Modified on 2/22/2011 (djc). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City Of San Jose, City of Los Angeles, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, Kendal On Hudson, Inc., Los Angeles World Airports, Peconic Landing at Southhold, Inc., Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Los Angeles Unified School District, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Los Angeles World Airports, Active Retirement Community, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Gross, Stuart) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (1160) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG. ENDORSEMENT: Granted without objection. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/2/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (1161) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/2/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to the Government's Motion for an Order Extending the Provisions of the Stay Order and Protective Order. Document filed by Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: That W. Perry Brandt is permitted to appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants George K. Baum & Co., George K. Baum & Co., and George K. Baum & Company in these actions. ORDER granting (1186) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG; granting (97) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-03002-VM; granting (85) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05492-VM; granting (86) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05493-VM; granting (38) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06140-VM; granting (70) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06142-VM; granting (72) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06304-VM; granting (91) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06340-VM; granting (73) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06341-VM; granting (73) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06342-VM; granting (43) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-07034-VM; granting (42) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-07355-VM; granting (129) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10350-VM; granting (125) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10351-VM; granting (118) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01196-VM; granting (118) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01195-VM; granting (118) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01197-VM; granting (66) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01199-VM; granting (104) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-10102-VM; granting (76) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00627-VM; granting (75) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00628-VM; granting (78) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00629-VM; granting (75) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00630-VM; granting (36) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00769-VM; granting (29) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04987-VM; granting (29) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04988-VM; granting (30) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04989-VM; granting (29) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04990-VM; granting (29) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04991-VM; granting (14) Motion for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-08273-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/13/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(db) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. That Christopher C. Javillonar is permitted to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants George K. Baum & Co., George K. Baum & Co., and George K. Baum & Company. ORDER granting (1187) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG; granting (98) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-03002-VM; granting (86) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05492-VM; granting (87) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05493-VM; granting (39) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06140-VM; granting (71) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06142-VM; granting (73) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06304-VM; granting (92) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06340-VM; granting (74) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06341-VM; granting (74) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06342-VM; granting (44) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-07034-VM; granting (43) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-07355-VM; granting (130) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10350-VM; granting (126) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10351-VM; granting (119) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01196-VM; granting (119) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01195-VM; granting (119) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01197-VM; granting (67) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01199-VM; granting (105) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-10102-VM; granting (77) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00627-VM; granting (76) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00628-VM; granting (79) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00629-VM; granting (76) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00630-VM; granting (37) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00769-VM; granting (30) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04987-VM; granting (30) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04988-VM; granting (31) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04989-VM; granting (30) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04990-VM; granting (30) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-04991-VM; granting (15) Motion for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-08273-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/13/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(db) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Gordon Biggers on behalf of George K. Baum & Co. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Biggers, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Christopher C. Javillonar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by George K. Baum & Co., George K. Baum & Co., George K. Baum & Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(mro) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for W. Perry Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by George K. Baum & Co., George K. Baum & Co., George K. Baum & Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(mro) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: John V. McDermott, New Attorney: Michael G. Biggers. Document filed by George K. Baum & Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Biggers, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: In sum, plaintiffs' motion to modify the existing confidentiality order (Docket # 1086) is denied except that plaintiffs and defendants shall attempt to agree on the text of a stand-alone order to be issued by the Court that would make clear that transferee courts and remand courts will make any rulings regarding the confidentiality order following transfer or remand. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/4/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1101 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Borerenleenbank,B.A. improperly named as "Rabobank Group". DEFENDANT RABOBANKS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Document filed by Rabobank Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter dated October 18, 2010, from the "Public Entity Plaintiffs." To the extent that these plaintiffs wish to oppose the pending motion of West Virginia to file documents under seal, they shall consult with the parties and the Department of Justice, and send a letter the Court containing a briefing schedule consistent with the procedures contained in paragraph 2.B of this Court's Individual Practices. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/20/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG et al.(jfe) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawl of Counsel of Joseph F. Wayland. Document filed by Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Inc., JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co, Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Zelig, Peri) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas C. Rice on behalf of Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Coyne Thomas on behalf of Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Thomas, Peter) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 9/14/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(cd) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eugene A. Spector on behalf of City Of San Jose, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, Washington County, Tennessee, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Charleston County School, District South Carolina, City of Fall River, Massachusetts, Fairfax County, Virginia, State of Mississippi, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, Central Bucks School District, City of Baltimore, Maryland, City of Fresno, California, City of Los Angeles, City of Oakland, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Alameda, County of Alameda, California, County of San Diego, County of Tulare, Fresno County Financing Authority, Haywood County, Tennessee, Hinds County, Mississippi, Los Angeles World Airports, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, Darrell V. McGraw, Jr, Mississippi Department of Transportation, Sacramento Suburban Water District, State of West Virginia, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, University of Mississippi, University of Mississippi Medical Center, University of Southern Mississippi, City of Richmond, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Central Buck School District, City of Oakland, California, Berkeley County, South Carolina, Charleston County School District, South Carolina, City of Chicago, Illinois, Contra Costa County, Plaintiff Class, State of West Virginia, Los Angeles World Airports, Haywood County, Tennessee, Darrell V. McGraw, Jr, Central Bucks School District Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE Answer To Plaintiffs Redevelopment Agency of The City and County of San Francisco's Complaint. Document filed by Citibank, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Lutz, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE Answer to Plaintiff East Bay Municipal Utility Districts Complaint. Document filed by Citibank, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Lutz, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE Answer to Plaintiff City of Redwood City's Complaint. Document filed by Citibank, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Lutz, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE Answer to Plaintiff City of Richmond's Complaint. Document filed by Citibank, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Lutz, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE Answer to Plaintiffs City of San Jose and the San Jose Redevelopment Agency's Complaint. Document filed by Citibank, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Lutz, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. A conference to discuss the discovery dispute raised in the letter from Seth Ard dated July 21, 2010, will be held on August 5, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Only parties that submitted letters to the Court will be heard at the conference. No other party is required to attend. (Conference set for 8/5/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/30/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. The Court is in receipt of a letter dated July 20, 2010, from Mr. Stuart Gross. Mr. Gross should make all efforts appropriate to confer with other counsel regarding the requested relief as required by paragraph 2.A of this Court's Individual Practices. Once he has done so, and if no resolution has been reached, he has leave to make an appropriate motion. The pre-motion conference requirement for the motion is waived. Briefing on the motion shall be in accordance with paragraph 2.B of this Court's Individual Practices. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. A conference will be held regarding the various proposals for a protective order on Thursday, July 22, 2010, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 17-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Only parties that submitted letters to the Court will be heard at the conference. No other party is required to attend. (Conference set for 7/22/2010 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/15/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to the Third Amended Complaint filed by City of Stockton. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Securities, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:08-cv-10350-VM(Wayland, Joseph) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by First Southwest Company.(Robison, Brian) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re: (736 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand. Document filed by Piper Jaffray & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Serivce)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Jackson, J) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re: (748 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 99 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM) Stipulation and Order with Jury Demand. Document filed by Piper Jaffray & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:08-cv-10350-VM(Jackson, J) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by UBS AG, UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC.(Smallwood, Jesse) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING MORVILLO, ABRAMOWITZ, GRAND, IASON, ANELLO & BOHRER, P.C.'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT MERRILL LYNCH & CO., INC. The Motion to Substitute Attorney (Doc. No. 792 in Case No. 08-2516) is Granted. Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, P.C. may withdraw and hereby does withdraw from the representation of Defendant Merrill Lynch, and King & Spalding LLP is substituted as counsel for Merrill Lynch; and the Court further directs the Clerk to remove Edward M. Spiro and Sarah Jean North of Morvillo, Abramowitz from the Court's docket in the entitled matters. granting (792) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Kevin R. Sullivan for Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. Attorney Sarah Jean North and Edward M. Spiro terminated in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/24/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM ENDORSEMENT re: WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. Kindly withdraw my appearance as as counsel for plaintiff Fairfax County, Virginia in the above-captioned matter. granting (435) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 435 herein and on the motions report. Attorney Arnold Levin terminated in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/16/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Because of the large number of parties to this suit, the Court directs that Michael D. Hausfeld, Esq. determine the position of all plaintiffs on this question and directs that Evan A. Davis, Esq. determine the position of all defendants on this question. Mr. Hausfeld and Mr. Davis may use any reasonable means for making this determination. They should then send a joint letter to the Court stating whether, on behalf of the plaintiffs and on behalf of the defendants, the parties agree that I should not be disqualified. If they so state, the Court will continue to hear the matter. If they do not so state, another United States Magistrate Judge will be randomly assigned to this matter. The letter should not disclose the position of any party on this question. Mr. Hausfeld and Mr. Davis shall provide the letter on or before June 30, 2010, unless they require additional time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/15/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CDR.Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Beckler, Richard) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard William Beckler on behalf of CDR Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Beckler, Richard) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. As discussed today at a proceeding on the record, the application of the Antitrust Division of the Department of Justice ("the Government") to intervene pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b) is granted for the limited purpose of moving to stay discovery. The Government's application to stay discovery is granted in part and denied in part. The following types of discovery shall not be stayed: (1) requests (including subpoenas) for documents and other tangible things (including but not limited to electronically stored information and tape recordings), (2) interrogatories pursuant to Local Civil Rule 33.3(a), (3) interrogatories seeking the identities of speakers, transactions and other summary information relating to tape recordings, and (4) depositions of custodians of documents concerning matters relating to the production of documents. All other discovery is stayed until February 1, 2011. The Government has leave to move to extend the stay, provided its application is filed no later than December 31, 2010. Prior to filing any such application, however, the Government shall confer with the parties to determine if an agreement can be reached with respect to its request to extend the stay. The Government shall be informed in advance of any deposition. Any tape recordings shall be disclosed only pursuant to the terms of a protective order. The parties and the Government shall attempt to agree on the terms of such an order. If they are unable to do so, the disagreement may be presented to the Court by letter. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/27/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Oral argument on the motion of the Antitrust Division of the Department of Justice to intervene and for a stay of discovery shall take place on May 27, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/20/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION FOR PUBLIC ENTITY PLAINTIFF TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, as attached hereto as Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/20/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:08-cv-10350-VM(cd) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Friedrich on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi, State of Mississippi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Hoke on behalf of George K. Baum & Co. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Antitrust Division of the Department of Justice has written to the Court asking to intervene in this action for the purpose of seeking a limited stay of discovery. The pre-motion conference requirement is waived. The motion shall be filed on or before April 27, 2010. Briefing thereafter shall proceed in accordance with paragraph 2.B of this Court's Individual Practices. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/20/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(jpo) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank plc., National Westminster Bank Plc, National Westminster Bank, PLC, National Westminster Bank, Plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Davis, Harry) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Natixis S.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, National Westminster Bank PLC, MBIA, Inc., Financial Security Assurance Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., Societe Generale SA, CDR Financial Products, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., UBS AG, AIG Financial Products Corp., Winters & Co. Advisors LLC, Wachovia Bank N.A., George K. Baum & Co., PFM Asset Management LLC, Rabobank Group, Assured Guaranty US Holdings Inc., Dexia S.A., Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Natixis Funding Corp., XL Life and Annuity Holding Company, Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, First Southwest Company, George K. Baum & Co., Sound Capital Management, Inc., XL Capital Ltd., XL Asset Funding Co. I LLC, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Trinity Funding Company, LLC, XL Life Insurance & Annuity Company, CDR Financial Products Inc, George K. Baum & Company, AIG Financial Products Corp, etc, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., National Westminster Bank plc., Societe Generale S.A., CDR Financial Products Inc., Natxis Funding Corp., MBIA, Inc., Trinity Funding Co. LLC, National Westminster Bank Plc, Natixis, S.A., Societe Generales SA, UBS, AG, UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Bayerische Landesbank Gironzentrale, Wachovia Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Dexia S.A., National Westminster Bank, PLC, General Electric Capital Corporation, XL Asset Funding I, LLC, Winters & Co., Advisors, LLC, National Westminster Bank, Plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Wayland, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COTCHETT COMPLAINTS. Document filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Gupta, Rachel) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Hellerer, Mark) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. The Cotchett Complaints. Document filed by Rabobank Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Turner, Lee) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Societe Generale SA. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Ware, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Notice of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Rabobank Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Turner, Lee) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by JPMorgan Securities, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Inc., Bear Stearns & Co, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co.,, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Bear, Stearns & CO., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Zelig, Peri) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Anthony Kane on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Securities, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., Bear Stearns & Co, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co.,, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Bear, Stearns & CO., Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear Stearns & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Kane, Ryan) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (53 in 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 591 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 20 in 1:08-cv-07034-VM, 19 in 1:08-cv-07355-VM, 26 in 1:09-cv-01199-VM) MOTION to Dismiss., (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Morgan Stanley. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Goldfein, Shepard) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth D. Ard on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Ard, Seth) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memoranda in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss served on ALL PARTIES on 3/26/10. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM) MOTION to Dismiss., (587 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Opposition to Joint and Several Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (587 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Syncora Guarantee, Inc. and Syncora Holdings, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Societe Generale S.A.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., aka Rabobank Group's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant PFM Asset Management LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Natixis S.A.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Natixis Funding Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant National Westminster Bank, Plc's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Morgan Stanley's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant MBIA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (580 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Goldman Sachs Bank USA, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., and Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants General Electric Capital Corporation, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, and Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant First Southwest Company's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Financial products, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Dexia S.A.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant AIG Financial Products Corp's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECISION AND ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 484) of Wachovia Bank N.A.; Wells Fargo & Co., Inc.; Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc.; Natixis S.A.; JP Morgan Chase & Co.; Piper Jaffray & Co.; Societe Generale SA; UBS AG; Morgan Stanley; National Westminster Bank PLC; Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc.; CDR Financial Products; Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC; George K. Baum & Co.; and Sound Capital Management, Inc. to dismiss the second consolidated amended class action complaint is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties are directed to appear at a pretrial conference on April 30, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. and, in preparation for that conference, to confer and propose an agreed upon Case Management Plan in the form provided by the Court. (Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/25/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Quincy M. Crawford, III is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for the above-named defendants in the above-captioned MDL proceedings pending in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. granting (637) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG; granting (148) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-md-01950-VM; granting (61) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10350-VM; granting (58) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10351-VM; granting (49) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01196-VM; granting (49) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01195-VM; granting (49) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01197-VM; granting (37) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-10102-VM; granting (10) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-10103-VM; granting (8) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00627-VM; granting (8) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00628-VM; granting (8) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00629-VM; granting (8) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00630-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Allison Gupta on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Gupta, Rachel) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Henry A. Cirillo of the law firm of Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP hereby appears as counsel for Plaintiff Fairfax County Virginia in the above-captioned action. Filed by Henry A. Cirillo on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. the Cotchett Complaints. Document filed by First Southwest Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Robison, Brian) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Arak Freedman on behalf of Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Freedman, John) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. the Cotchett Complaints. Document filed by Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Hellerer, Mark) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth. Document filed by Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of Laura Cofer Taylor. Document filed by Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Douglas L. Wald. Document filed by Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC.Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig A. Stewart on behalf of Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (53 in 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 591 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 20 in 1:08-cv-07034-VM, 19 in 1:08-cv-07355-VM, 26 in 1:09-cv-01199-VM) MOTION to Dismiss., (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Morgan Stanley. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Goldfein, Shepard) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank plc., National Westminster Bank Plc, National Westminster Bank, PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Davis, Harry) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. the Cotchett Complaints. Document filed by Societe Generale SA, Societe Generale S.A., Societe Generales SA, Societe Generale. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Ware, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Rabobank Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Turner, Lee) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. the Cotchett Complaints. Document filed by Natixis S.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., National Westminster Bank PLC, MBIA, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., Societe Generale SA, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., UBS AG, Winters & Co. Advisors LLC, Wachovia Bank N.A., PFM Asset Management LLC, Rabobank Group, Assured Guaranty US Holdings Inc., XL Asset Funding Company LLC, Dexia S.A., Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, XL Life Insurance & Annuity, Inc., Natixis Funding Corp., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., CDR Financial Products, Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, First Southwest Company, George K. Baum & Co., Financial Security Assurance Inc., Sound Capital Management, Inc., AIG Financial Products Corp., XL Capital Ltd., XL Asset Funding Co. I LLC, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Trinity Funding Company, LLC, XL Asset Funding LLC, XL Life Insurance & Annuity Company, George K. Baum & Company, AIG Financial Products Corp, etc, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., National Westminster Bank plc., Societe Generale S.A., Natxis Funding Corp., Wachovia Bank, National Association, MBIA, Inc., Trinity Funding Co. LLC, XL Asset Funding, LLC, National Westminster Bank Plc, Natixis, S.A., Societe Generales SA, UBS, AG, UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Bayerische Landesbank Gironzentrale, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Wachovia Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Dexia S.A., National Westminster Bank, PLC, General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, XL Asset Funding I, LLC, XL Life and Annuity Holding Company, Winters & Co., Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Jackson, J) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Cotchett Complaints. Document filed by Natixis S.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., National Westminster Bank PLC, MBIA, Inc., Societe Generale SA, CDR Financial Products, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., AIG Financial Products Corp., Piper Jaffray & Co., UBS AG, Winters & Co. Advisors LLC, Wachovia Bank N.A., PFM Asset Management LLC, Rabobank Group, Assured Guaranty US Holdings Inc., XL Asset Funding Company LLC, Dexia S.A., Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, Natixis Funding Corp., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., First Southwest Company, George K. Baum & Co., Financial Security Assurance Inc., Sound Capital Management, Inc., XL Capital Ltd., GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., XL Life Insurance & Annuity Company, George K. Baum & Company, AIG Financial Products Corp, etc, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., National Westminster Bank plc., Societe Generale S.A., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, Natxis Funding Corp., MBIA, Inc., Trinity Funding Co. LLC, National Westminster Bank Plc, Natixis, S.A., Societe Generales SA, UBS, AG, UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Bayerische Landesbank Gironzentrale, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Wachovia Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Dexia S.A., National Westminster Bank, PLC, General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, XL Life and Annuity Holding Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Jackson, J) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Nanci E. Nishimura dated 1/28/10 re: Pursuant to the Court's Minute Entry of January 26, 2010, extending the page limit for Defendants Omnibus Brief to 50 pages in response to the Los Angeles Plaintiffs Complaints, this is to confirm that the page limit for Los Angeles Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition is also extended to 50 pages. ENDORSEMENT: The understanding of plaintiffs set forth above regarding the page limitations applicable to the briefing of the omnibus motion to dismiss and related accurately states the Courts instructions. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/2/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Turner on behalf of Rabobank Group Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Turner, Lee) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rabobank Group.Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Randall Neuwirth on behalf of Rabobank Group (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DOCUMENT FILED IN CLOSED CASE - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Feld Winters Financial LLC, Feld Winters Financial, LLC. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Gross, Stuart) Modified on 2/5/2010 (dt). (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse T. Smallwood on behalf of UBS Securities LLC, UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Smallwood, Jesse) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying UBS AG as Corporate Parent. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC, UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC.Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Manning, Christopher) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Nicholas Manning on behalf of UBS Securities LLC, UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Manning, Christopher) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Errata re Second Amended Complaint re: (482 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) Amended Complaint. Document filed by City of Stockton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:08-cv-10350-VM(Gross, Stuart) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO EXTEND LIMITED STAY OF DISCOVERY: That the provisions of the STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LIMITED STAY OF DISCOVERY entered on June 24, 2009 be continued pending resolution of Defendants' motions to dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint in this case. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/22/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(tve) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peri Lauren Zelig on behalf of JPMorgan Securities, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., Bear Stearns & Co, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co.,, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Bear, Stearns & CO., Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase & Co. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Zelig, Peri) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER EXPENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' ANSWER OR RESPONSIVE MOTIONS; The deadline for Defendants to file answers or motions in response to the amended complaints filed by Los Angeles et at. Plaintiffs on September 15, 2009, the complaints filed by SMUD and Riverside on November 12, 2009, and any complaints filed by entities represented by Los Angeles et al. Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel on or before December 10, 2009 that are transferred to this Court for coordinated pretrial proceedings in MDL. No. 1950 shall be extended to 1/15/2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/7/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(tve) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DOCUMENT FILED IN CLOSED CASE - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) FSA Capital Services LLC, FSA Capital Management Services LLC. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Gross, Stuart) Modified on 11/3/2009 (dt). (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 3. The Court is in receipt of several letters from the parties, dated between October 12 and October 21, 2009, regarding the deadline for responding to the amended complaints filed in what have been referred to as the "California Actions." See Case Management Order No. 2, filed July 31, 2009 (Docket # 474) (Exhibit A). The Court does not believe that the time to respond to the complaints in the California Actions should be stayed until the disposition of the pending motion to dismiss the Second Class Action Complaint. While the Court recognizes that this course of action represents a burden to the defendants, that burden is outweighed by the importance of not unduly delaying the progress of this case. Moreover, to the extent there are substantial similarities between the Second Class Action Complaint and the complaints in the California Actions, it will be of relatively little burden to defendants to repeat arguments related to these similarities or to incorporate them by reference. To the extent there are substantial differences, these differences will raise issues that would have to be briefed anyway. That being said, the Court sees great value in having a briefing schedule in which all defendants named in the California Actions may participate and coordinate their responses in a single timetable. Accordingly, inasmuch as not all defendants in the California Actions have been served to date (a circumstance not contemplated by the Court at the July 17 conference), the Court does not see the point in having multiple briefing schedules for various defendants depending on the date of their service. Accordingly, the time for defendants to move or answer with respect to the California Actions is stayed until 45 days after the California plaintiffs inform defendants that all defendants to the California Actions have been served (or that plaintiffs are stipulating to any unserved defendant's dismissal).' In the event any defendant moves to dismiss, opposition papers will be due 45 days thereafter. Any reply papers will be due 21 days after service of opposition papers. The defendants that are named only in the California Actions have made a request for a stay of discovery beyond the stay provided in Case Management Order No. 2. The Court will defer any ruling on that request until after Judge Marrero decides the motions to dismiss the Second Class Action Complaint. The request should be discussed by the parties following that decision and may be raised again by letter. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. The following deadlines are entered in the Consolidated Class Actions (identified in Exhibit A hereto) for the briefing related to the motions to dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint: Motions filed on or before September 18, 2009. Responses filed on or before October 18, 2009. Replies filed on or before November 18, 2009. The following deadlines are entered for the filing and response to amended complaints in the California Actions (identified in Exhibit A hereto): The Plaintiffs in the California Actions shall file amended complaints on or before September 15, 2009. Subsequent to the filing of amended complaints in the California Actions, Defendants in such complaints who are also named in the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint will meet and confer with Plaintiffs in the California Actions to arrange a. briefing schedule. and will either submit a Stipulation and Proposed Order, or will submit separate letter briefs outlining their respective proposals... and as further set forth. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2009. Motions due by 9/18/2009. Responses due by 10/18/2009. Replies due by 11/18/2009. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/31/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Imtiaz A. Siddiqui on behalf of City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Siddiqui, Imtiaz) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven N. Williams on behalf of City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG et al.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSES TO THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs, defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. and defendant Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: No defendant need respond to the complaint in this action before September 18, 2009; No defendant shall use the fact of this extension as a justification for a delay of discovery in this matter; No rights or objections of any party with respect to discovery are otherwise prejudiced or waived by the submission of this Stipulation; This extension is available, without further stipulation with counsel for Plaintiffs, to all named defendants; and No defense of JPMorgan Chase & Co., Bear, Steams & Co., Inc., or any other defendant to this action is prejudiced or waived by its submission of this Stipulation. So Stipulated and Agreed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/10/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy E. Hoeffner on behalf of Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Hoeffner, Timothy) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy E. Hoeffner on behalf of Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-DCF et al.(Hoeffner, Timothy) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) Cain Brother & Co LLC, Cain Brother & Company, LLC, Cain Brothers & Company, LLC, Cain Brothers & Co. LLC. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-DCF et al.(Liang, Aron) Modified on 6/11/2009 (dt). (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) Pakerkiss Securities, Inc, Packerkiss Securities, Inc.. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM et al.(Liang, Aron) Modified on 5/19/2009 (ml). (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECISION AND ORDER. It is hereby Ordered that the motion (Docket No. 277) to dismiss the consolidated amended class action complaint (CAC) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 275) to dismiss the CAC is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs Fairfax County, Virginia, the State of Mississippi, the City of Baltimore, Maryland, the Central Bucks School District, and the Bucks County Water and Sewer Authority are granted leave to file a second amended complaint repleading claims against the Joint Defendants based upon: (1) allegations that specific individuals employed by Joint Defendants engaged in communications in furtherance of any alleged antitrust violation, and (2) claims of fraudulent concealment, provided that such amended complaint shall be filed within twenty days of this Order. The Court will also consider future requests for leave to replead based upon discovery conducted with defendants not affected by these motions to dismiss. granting (275) Motion to Dismiss; granting (277) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/29/09). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL by Sylvia Sokol on behalf of City of Oakland, California, County of Alameda, California, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE. Pursuant to the Orders signed on July 15, 2008 and July 17, 2008 by the Honorable Victor Marrero, please enter the appearance of Michael P. Lehmann pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff Fairfax County, Virginia in this matter. Attached hereto please find a Certificate of Good Standing for Mr. Lehmann. This Document Relates to All Actions. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael P. Lehmann on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jmi) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bear Sterns Companies, Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Rizzi, Annette) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westministerbank PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC., ONLY. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM et al.(db) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 1-73 from the United States District Court - Northern District of California (San Francisco). Case Number: 3:08-cv-4060 (MMC), MDL Number: 08-MD-1950, (rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2009: # 1 Document, # 2 Document, # 3 Document, # 4 Document, # 5 Document, # 6 Document, # 7 Document, # 8 Document, # 9 Document, # 10 Document, # 11 Document, # 12 Document, # 13 Document, # 14 Document, # 15 Document, # 16 Document, # 17 Document, # 18 Document, # 19 Document, # 20 Document, # 21 Document, # 22 Document, # 23 Document, # 24 Document, # 25 Document, # 26 Document, # 27 Document, # 28 Document, # 29 Document, # 30 Document, # 31 Document, # 32 Document, # 33 Document, # 34 Document, # 35 Document, # 36 Document, # 37 Document, # 38 Document, # 39 Document, # 40 Document, # 41 Document, # 42 Document, # 43 Document, # 44 Document, # 45 Document, # 46 Document, # 47 Document, # 48 Document, # 49 Document, # 50 Document, # 51 Document, # 52 Document, # 53 Document, # 54 Document, # 55 Document, # 56 Document, # 57 Document, # 58 Document, # 59 Document, # 60 Document, # 61 Document, # 62 Document, # 63 Document, # 64 Document, # 65 Document, # 66 Document) (rdz). (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT FINANCIAL GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY WITHOUT PREJUDICE CLASS ACTION Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Financial Guaranty Insurance Company, ONLY. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/10/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM et al.(db) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Aron K. Liang for City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/9/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Nanci E. Nishimura for City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/9/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Corrected Withdrawal Of Appearance re: (66 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) Notice (Other). Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Genworth Financial Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Magda M. Jimenez dated 12/16/08 re: request that Plaintiffs be permitted to file under seal certain of the exhibits cited in our papers in opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, which will be filed and served on 12/22/08. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. Plaintiffs are authorized to file under seal their opposition papers to defendants' motion to dismiss with a redacted set filed electronically in the public docket. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/16/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PACKERKISS SECURITIES, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Packerkiss Securities, Inc., Pakerkiss Securities, Inc, only. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/16/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT FELD WINTERS FINANCIAL LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Feld Winters Financial LLC, only. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/16/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia L. Maher on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Securities, LLC (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon M. Kasley on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Securities, LLC (Kasley, Shannon) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin R. Sullivan on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Securities, LLC (Sullivan, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin R. Sullivan on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. et al. (Sullivan, Kevin) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Upon review of the complaints and other papers filed with the Court in connection with the three cases captioned above, the Court notes that the complaints describe the same or substantially similar underlying events and operative facts, and assert claims arising out of the same or substantially similar actions against all or most of the same defendants and that the cases were transferred to this Court by the Multidistrict Litigation Panel as part of 08 MDL 1950 for consolidation and coordination of pretrial proceedings. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate the two cases captioned above for all pretrial purposes; and it is further ORDERED that all filings in connection with the consolidated action be docketed against the remaining lower number case, 08 Civ. 2516; and its finally ORDERED that the Clerk of Court close the referenced higher numbered cases, 08 Civ. 10350 and 08 Civ. 10351, as a separate actions and remove them from the Court's database of open cases. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/4/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM, 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 1:08-cv-10351-VM(db) Modified on 12/10/2008 (db). (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring this action from the United States District Court - Northern District of California, Case Number: 3:08-cv-4060, MDL Number: 08-md-1950. (Signed by MDL Panel on 11/26/2008) (mbe) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?