Murray et al v. CPG International, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-03694
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 17, 2018 at 11:32 AM EDT (7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Judy Murray, Plaintiff
No Logo Leonard, Murray, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William M. Audet +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 waudet@audetlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore H. Chase +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 tchase@audetlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Caleb Ezrin +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 jezrin@audetlaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
Timeline
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:14-cv-02340. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
MDL ORDER (CTO-2) TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of New Jersey. In Re: Azek Building Products, Inc., Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation. MDL No. 2506. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leonard Murray, Judy Murray. Service waived by AZEK Building Products, Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2014, answer due 7/21/2014; CPG International, Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2014, answer due 7/21/2014. (Chase, Theodore) (Filed on 5/22/2014) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against AZEK Building Products, Inc., CPG International, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-8632485.). Filed by Leonard Murray, Judy Murray. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Chase, Theodore) (Filed on 5/20/2014) Modified on 5/22/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 42 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?