USA v. Searcy
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:11-cr-10263
District Judge Indira Talwani, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 17, 2016 at 11:09 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Justin Searcy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Behzad Mirhashem +1 617 223 8061 behzad_mirhashem@fd.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Christopher S. Skinner +1 617 223 8061 christopher_skinner@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Justin Searcy. The court orders defendant remain under current conditions of release with the imposition of a curfew from 8pm to 6am with electronic monitoring. The court Orders a warrant be held in abeyance. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani:Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Justin Searcy held on 6/4/2014, (Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 6/11/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani.) (Attorneys present: Levitt for the government, Skinner for the defendant, Paiva for Probation Dept.) Court has colloquy with counsel regarding violations. Defendant is prepared to stipulate to violations at a final revocation to be set by the court. Govt recommends detention in intervening period, defendant requests to remain on current conditions. The court orders defendant remain under current conditions of release with the imposition of a curfew from 8pm to 6am with electronic monitoring. The court Orders a warrant be held in abeyance.Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom (cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net). (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 69 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
      Summons Issued as to Justin Searcy. Initial Revocation set for 6/4/14 at 11:00 am, courtroom 17, 5th floor before the Honorable Indira Talwani (Nicewicz, Craig) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Notice of Reassignment as to Justin Searcy. Judge Indira Talwani added. Judge Joseph L. Tauro no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ENDORSED ORDER entered as to Justin Searcy re 63 Probation Request. The Court Orders: " The Modifications as Noted Aboved. " (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
            Request from Probation/Boston regarding Request for Modification of Conditions as to Justin Searcy. Requested action: Y (Paiva, Lisa) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
              Docket sheet sent as to Justin Searcy (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                Letter/Non- Motion regarding copies of pleadings as to Justin Searcy (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Case as to Justin Searcy no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORIGINAL JUDGMENT entered as to Justin Searcy (1), Count(s) 1, ORIGINAL JUDGMENT as to Justin Searcy: Court imposed sentence as follows: One year and one day to be served concurrent with present state sentence; 6 years supervised release; $100 special assessment, no fine. Standard, as well as, special conditions of supervised release imposed. Defendant advised of right to appeal. REVOCATION JUDGMENT as to Justin Searcy: Defendant admits to violations 2,3,4, and 5. Court sentences defendant to 44 days-DEEMED AS SERVED. Six ( 6) years supervised release. All previously imposed conditions, including special conditions shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED.REVOCATION JUDGMENT: Five (5) months custody; 6 years years supervised release. Previously imposed special conditions to continue with the exception of the curfew effective May 28, 2013. Defendant shall self report to the U.S. Marshal by 9:00 a.m. May 28,2013. SO ORDERED (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Joseph L. Tauro:Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Justin Searcy held on 5/23/2013. Defendant admits to violations. Court imposed sentence as follows:Five (5) months custody; 6 years years supervised release. Previously imposed special conditions to continue with the exception of the curfew effective May 28, 2013. Defendant shall self report to the U.S. Marshal by 9:00 a.m. May 28,2013. SO ORDERED. An Order will issue. (Attorneys present: Wortmann,AUSA; Skinner,deft.. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Carol Scott (617-330-1377). (Lovett, Zita) Modified on 5/24/2013 (Lovett, Zita). (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Case as to Justin Searcy no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Justin Searcy Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 5/23/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORIGINAL re 48 Summons for Appearance on Revocation Proceedings set for 5/22/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. Mailed to Justin Searcy, 442 River Street, Apt. 21, Mattapan, MA 02126 on 5/13/2013 by Certified Mail 7004 1160 0001 5658 5249. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Justin Searcy: Appearance on Revocation Proceedings set for 5/22/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORIGINAL JUDGMENT entered as to Justin Searcy (1), Count(s) 1 : Court imposed sentence as follows: One year and one day to be served concurrent with present state sentence; 6 years supervised release; $100 special assessment, no fine. Standard, as well as, special conditions of supervised release imposed. Defendant advised of right to appeal. REVOCATION JUDGMENT entered as to Justin Searcy: Defendant admits to violations 2,3,4, and 5. Court sentences defendant to 44 days-DEEMED AS SERVED. Six (6) years supervised release with Electronic Monitoring. Defendant shall reside at mother's house and shall abide by the curfew imposed: 9:00PM until 7:00AM at home. All previously imposed conditions, including special conditions shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Joseph L. Tauro:Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Justin Searcy held on 4/11/2013. Defendant admits to violations 2,3,4, and 5. Court sentences defendant to 44 days-DEEMED AS SERVED. Six ( 6) years supervised release. All previously imposed conditions, including special conditions shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Attorneys present: Wortman,AUSA; Skinner,deft.. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Carol Scott (617-330-1377). (Lovett, Zita) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/2/2013 as to Justin Searcy. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler:Initial Appearance re Revocation of probation as to Justin Searcy held on 4/2/2013. Government seeks detention, defendant agrees to an order of voluntary detention without prejudice and waives PC. Defendant remanded to the USMS. ( Final Probation Revocation Hearing set for 4/11/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro.) (Attorneys present: Wortmann for the Government. Skinner for the defendant.. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ENDORSED ORDER entered as to Justin Searcy re 34 Probation Memoramdum. The Court Orders: " The Court authorizes the Probation Office to monitor the defendants curfew via electronic monitoring. The requirement for the defendant to pay for cost of the electronic monitoring is waived by the Court ". (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                          Memorandum from Probation/Boston regarding Classification of Special Condition as to Justin Searcy. Requested action: Y (Paiva, Lisa) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Justin Searcy (1), Count(s) 1, Court Imposed Sentence as Follows: One year and one day to be served concurrent with present state sentence; 6 years supervised release; $100 special assessment, no fine. Standard, as well as, special conditions of supervised release imposed. Defendant advised of right to appeal. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Justin Searcy. Time excluded from 6/21/2012 until 7/9/2012. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                Assented to MOTION to Continue Sentencing to date convenient for the Court on or after June 1, 2012 as to Justin Searcy by USA. (Wortmann, John) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Justin Searcy for 1/18/2012 (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Justin Searcy. Time excluded from 12/8/11 until the first appearance before the District Judge. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. REPORT AND ORDER on Final Status Conference as to Justin Searcy (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from December 8, 2011 to First Appearance in District Court as to Justin Searcy by USA. (Wortmann, John) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Assented to MOTION for Rule 11 Hearing and to Send the Case to the District Court as to Justin Searcy by USA. (Wortmann, John) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Justin Searcy. Time excluded from 11/1/11 until 12/8/11. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from November 1, 2011 to December 8, 2011 as to Justin Searcy by USA. (Wortmann, John) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 116.5(C) as to Justin Searcy (Wortmann, John) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BEHZAD MIRHASHEM as to Justin Searcy. (Mirhashem, Behzad) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher S. Skinner appearing for Justin Searcy. Type of Appearance: FEDERAL DEFENDER. (Skinner, Christopher) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Justin Searcy. Time excluded from 9/13/11 until 11/1/11. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from September 13, 2011 to November 1, 2011 as to Justin Searcy by USA. (Wortmann, John) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          JOINT MEMORANDUM of the parties re initial status conference by Justin Searcy (Wortmann, John) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER PROGRAM as to Justin Searcy (Adam, Lucien) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/5/11 as to Justin Searcy. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Justin Searcy for 8/5/11. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Justin Searcy (1) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Cummings, Mary) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 4 Motion to Unseal Case as to Justin Searcy (1) (Garvin, Brendan) [1:11-mj-02041-MBB] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Unseal Case as to Justin Searcy by USA. (Garvin, Brendan) [1:11-mj-02041-MBB] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler as to Justin Searcy. (Gawlik, Cathy) [1:11-mj-02041-MBB] (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          SEALED COMPLAINT as to Justin Searcy (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 JS45)(Gawlik, Cathy) [1:11-mj-02041-MBB] (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Case as to Justin Searcy by USA. (Gawlik, Cathy) [1:11-mj-02041-MBB] (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 521 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?