Anwar v. Fairfield Greenwich Limited
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 13-1392

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 7:11 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1310506] [13-1289, 13-1392] [Entered: 09/03/2014 11:25 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT, FILED.[1290899] [13-1289, 13-1392] [Entered: 08/08/2014 04:11 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
      NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[1290256] [13-1289, 13-1392] [Entered: 08/08/2014 09:34 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
        OPINION, affirming the judgment of the distirct court, by RDS, DC, CFD, FILED.[1290255] [13-1289, 13-1392] [Entered: 08/08/2014 09:33 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Julia Anwar and Pasha S. Anwar in 13-1289, FILED. Service date 07/02/2014 by CM/ECF. [1263416] [13-1289, 13-1392] [Entered: 07/02/2014 04:06 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
            REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from KIRKLAND & ELLIS, with fee, RECEIVED.[1092952] [13-1392, 13-1289]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
              ORDER, dated 09/27/2013, GRANTING permission for a Court reporter to be present for oral argument., FILED.[1053221] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, RECEIVED. Service date 09/17/2013 by CM/ECF.[1043974] [13-1392]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                  ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1032738] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                    LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, RECEIVED. Service date 07/17/2013 by CM/ECF.[992893] [13-1392]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                      FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 06/28/2013, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, RECEIVED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978656] [13-1392]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                        ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. David J. Sheehan, Esq. for Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 06/13/2013 by CM/ECF. [964784] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                          ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Stuart H. Singer, Esq. for Appellee St. Stephen's School, Pacific West Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Martin and Shirley Bach Family Trust, Natalia Hatgis, Securities and Investment Company Bahrain and Dawson Bypass Trust in 13-1289, Attorney Mr. Stuart H. Singer, Esq. for Appellee Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., St. Stephen's School, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd. and Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust in 13-1392, FILED. Service date 06/13/2013 by CM/ECF. [964782] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mark G. Cunha for Appellee Charles Murphy, Andrew Smith, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Philip Toub, Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Santiago Reyes, Amit Vijayvergiya, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda), Yanko della Schiava, Daniel E. Lipton and Maria Theresa Pulido Mendoza in 13-1289, Attorney Mark G. Cunha for Appellee Charles Murphy, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Group, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Philip Toub, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Vianney D'hendecourt, Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, David Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Santiago Reyes, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Daniel Lipton and Jacqueline Hararay in 13-1392, FILED. Service date 06/13/2013 by CM/ECF. [964492] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                              REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 06/13/2013 by CM/ECF. [964217] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                ORDER, directing appeals 13-1289 (L) and 13-1785 to be heard in tandem, FILED.[963480] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MOTION ORDER, granting motion to assign to same panel [114] filed by Appellee St. Stephen's School, Pacific West Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Martin and Shirley Bach Family Trust, Natalia Hatgis, Securities and Investment Company Bahrain and Dawson Bypass Trust in 13-1289, by SLC, Circuit Judge; FILED. [963476][140] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                    REPLY TO OPPOSITION [125], [122], on behalf of Appellee Dawson Bypass Trust, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Natalia Hatgis, Martin and Shirley Bach Family Trust, Pacific West Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Securities and Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1289, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1392, FILED. Service date 06/07/2013 by CM/ECF.[959207][134] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                      CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda), Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel E. Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Theresa Pulido Mendoza, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko della Schiava, Andrew Smith, Philip Toub and Amit Vijayvergiya in 13-1289, Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Hararay, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava and Philip Toub in 13-1392, FILED. Service date 06/06/2013 by CM/ECF. [957985] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                        OPPOSITION TO MOTION to assign to same panel [114], on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [954182][125] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                          OPPOSITION TO MOTION to assign to same panel [114], on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 05/31/2013 by CM/ECF. [953499][122] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                            BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Dawson Bypass Trust, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Natalia Hatgis, Martin and Shirley Bach Family Trust, Pacific West Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Securities and Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1289, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1392, FILED. Service date 05/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [952217] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                              BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda), Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel E. Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Theresa Pulido Mendoza, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko della Schiava, Andrew Smith, Philip Toub and Amit Vijayvergiya in 13-1289, Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Hararay, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Walter M. Noel, Jr., Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava and Philip Toub in 13-1392, FILED. Service date 05/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [952194] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Jennifer Thompson, ASSIGNED.[952071] [13-1392, 13-1289]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION, to assign to same panel, on behalf of Appellee Dawson Bypass Trust, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Natalia Hatgis, Martin and Shirley Bach Family Trust, Pacific West Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Securities and Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1289, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1392, FILED. Service date 05/23/2013 by CM/ECF. [946768] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellee Dawson Bypass Trust, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Natalia Hatgis, Martin and Shirley Bach Family Trust, Pacific West Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Securities and Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1289, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1392, FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [945885] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                      ORDER, dated 05/06/2013, adjourning oral argument, FILED.[928821] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1392, Appellee Dawson Bypass Trust, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Natalia Hatgis, Martin and Shirley Bach Family Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Securities and Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1289, FILED. Service date 05/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [925068] [13-1392, 13-1289]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1392, Appellee Dawson Bypass Trust, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Natalia Hatgis, Martin and Shirley Bach Family Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Securities and Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1289, FILED. Service date 05/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [925062] [13-1392, 13-1289]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cornelis Boele, FILED. Service date 05/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[924793] [13-1392, 13-1289]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Robert Blum and David Horn, FILED. Service date 05/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[924539] [13-1392]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Hararay, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava and Philip Toub in 13-1392, Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda), Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel E. Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Theresa Pulido Mendoza, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko della Schiava, Andrew Smith, Philip Toub and Amit Vijayvergiya in 13-1289, FILED. Service date 05/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[924394] [13-1392, 13-1289]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Amit Vijayvergiya in 13-1289, FILED. Service date 05/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [924309] [13-1392, 13-1289]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, FILED. Service date 05/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [924043] [13-1392]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, FILED. Service date 05/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [924022] [13-1392]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, FILED. Service date 05/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[924009] [13-1392]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1501-1576), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 04/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[923557] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 04/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[923555] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 04/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[923547] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 04/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[923524] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 04/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[923513] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 04/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[923481] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 04/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[922874] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, 13-1392, FILED. Service date 04/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[922799] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          CAPTION, appellees from consolidated appeal added to lead appeal, AMENDED.[922107] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite appeal [920271-2] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, granting motion to expedite appeal [43] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1392, by GEL, Circuit Judge; FILED. [921777][58] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1289, FILED. Service date 04/29/2013 by CM/ECF. [921407] [13-1289, 13-1392]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1392, Appellee Dawson Bypass Trust, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Natalia Hatgis, Martin and Shirley Bach Family Trust, Pacific West Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Securities and Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School in 13-1289, FILED. Service date 04/26/2013 by CM/ECF.[920732] [13-1392, 13-1289]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals [42] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard in 13-1392, FILED. [920716][51] [13-1392, 13-1289]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 04/26/2013 by CM/ECF. [920275] [13-1392]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 04/26/2013 by CM/ECF. [920269] [13-1392]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Irving H. Picard Brief due date as 04/30/2013; Joint Appendix due date as 04/30/2013, FILED.[919943] [13-1392]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, informing Court of proposed due date 04/30/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 04/25/2013 by CM/ECF.[919489] [13-1392]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Walter M. Noel, Jr., FILED. Service date 04/23/2013 by CM/ECF. [916763] [13-1392]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Walter M. Noel, Jr., FILED. Service date 04/23/2013 by CM/ECF.[916762] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CAPTION, spelling of appellant's name corrected, AMENDED.[916057] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Gay, ASSIGNED.[915753] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail.[915448] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF.[915445] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF. [915424] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF. [915414] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF. [915410] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF. [915404] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail. [915400] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail. [915397] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail. [915394] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF. [915386] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. Service date 04/22/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF.[915378] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Gregory Bowes, FILED. Service date 04/19/2013 by CM/ECF.[914071] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[911026] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/25/2013, RECEIVED.[911017] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/15/2013, RECEIVED.[911008] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/08/2013, RECEIVED.[911000] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Pickard, FILED. [910897] [13-1392]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?